CARRERAS v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-06097 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 10, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:22-cv-01071 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 06, 2022 4:06 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
SAMUEL CARRERAS, SR.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK on behalf of SAMUEL CARRERAS, SR (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) |
|
10 | 10
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand - Per PTO 17 against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETLY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, filed by SAMUEL CARRERAS, SR. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 5/31/2022 .) (djb) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-01071. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/10/2022.] | |
5 | 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Bryan F. Aylstock as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/10/2022.] | |
4 | 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-1071 (JRT/TNL). (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/10/2022.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |