Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Anita L Shodeen
Case #: 3:22-bk-00493
Case Filed:May 10, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Jun 21, 2022
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025

Debtor
Enhanced Homes Property Management LLC
3532 Jersey Ridge Rd
Davenport, IA 52807-2223
Represented By
H J Dane
Kstt Place
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Robert G Schlegel
112 South Avenue B PO Box 929
Washington, IA 52353
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Federal Bldg, Room 793 210 Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50309


Docket last updated: 05/11/2022 12:01 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
crditcrd none Tue 05/10 1:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 22-00493 7] ) [court,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4463262. Fee amount 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 court Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Tue 05/10 1:52 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 338 Filed by Enhanced Homes Property Management LLC. (Dane, H)
Related: [-]
2 2 court 341 Meeting - Ch7 -No Asset-Bus Tue 05/10 2:26 PM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 7 Business No Asset 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/21/2022 at 12:00 PM at Telephone Conference Call. (mcn)
Related: [-]