New York Northern District Court
Judge:Brenda K Sannes
Referred: Christian F Hummel
Case #: 1:22-cv-00482
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2022
Terminated:May 24, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Nov 05, 2022 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Jane Doe # 1-5
Defendant
John Doe # 1-5
Defendant
Frank Lee
Defendant
Rain Albany LLC
Plaintiff
Xue Fang Huang
Represented By
Jin Huang
Law Offices Of Jin Huang
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 23, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/23 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Xue Fang Huang (Huang, Jin)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/23 4:55 PM
TEXT ORDER: On May 9, 2022, Plaintiff commenced this action. On 5/10/2022 the Clerk issued a Notice of Filing Deficiency and directed Counsel to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. To date, Plaintiff has not provided the Clerk with proposed summonses for issuance. Plaintiff is hereby directed to provide the Clerk with proposed summonses for issuance, using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event, on or before 5/27/2022. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/23/2022. (tab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
2 2 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Tue 05/10 11:17 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/8/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
Related: [-]
misc Text Notice of Filing Deficiency Tue 05/10 11:26 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Xue Fang Huang NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 5/13/2022 (hmr)
Related: [-]
notice Text Notice Regarding John Doe Defendant (Text-Only) Tue 05/10 11:27 AM
TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe and Jane Doe defendant(s) in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summons(es) for service of process on a John Doe or Jane Doe defendant(s) at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe or Jane Doe defendant(s), plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant(s) pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons(es) will be issued at that time. (hmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/10 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jane Doe # 1-5, John Doe # 1-5, Frank Lee, Rain Albany LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5898189) filed by Xue Fang Huang.(hmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet