New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:22-cv-03795
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 09, 2022
Terminated:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 05, 2022 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
New York University Stern School of Business
Represented By
Joseph James DiPalma
Jackson Lewis P.C. (wp)
contact info
Poonam Sethi
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Attorney Kissinger N Sibanda
PO Box 714
Livingston, NJ 07039
Plaintiff
Karim Annabi


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Saturday, April 12, 2025
86 86 misc Letter Mon 04/14 6:23 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Karim Annabi dated 4/12/2025 re: Recusal Motion Letter. Document filed by Karim Annabi.(jjc)
Related: [-]