Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan M Brnovich
Referred: Deborah M Fine
Case #: 2:22-cv-00785
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 09, 2022
Terminated:Oct 04, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
15 15 order Clerks Judgment Tue 10/04 1:17 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed October 4, 2022, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice (REK)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Tue 10/04 1:14 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Complaint12 is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 10/04/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/30 12:38 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul Penzone, Maricopa, County of filed by Michael Roy Turney. (6 pages) (WLP)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Withdraw Tue 08/30 12:35 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Complaint by Michael Roy Turney. (4 pages) (WLP)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Mon 08/29 9:33 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's document titled "Preliminary Injunction Relief"10 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/29/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
10 10 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 08/19 9:09 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Roy Turney. (2 Pages) (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
9 9 14 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 08/16 12:37 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify Filings6 is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse7 is denied as moot. The Complaint1 is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/16/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Forms Packet
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 08/03 2:28 PM
ORDER reassigning this case to Judge Brnovich for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the following case caption: CV 22-00785 PHX-SMB(DMF). Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/03/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
7 7 motion Recusal Tue 06/07 12:24 PM
MOTION to Recuse Federal District Judge Susan R. Bolton by Michael Roy Turney. (2 Pages) (REK)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/07 12:22 PM
MOTION to Clarify Filings by Michael Roy Turney. (1 Page) (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
5 5 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 06/01 9:30 AM
Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number PHX237973. PAID IN FULL. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
4 4 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/16 3:34 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis2 is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/16/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment Tue 05/10 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (LAD)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/10 2:59 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Michael Roy Turney. (LAD) (2 pages)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/10 2:57 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Michael Roy Turney. (LAD) (6 pages)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope