Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-06184
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 12, 2022
Terminated:Jul 08, 2022
Last checked: Friday Nov 11, 2022 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ZECHARIAH MOTE
Represented By
TIMOTHY RAY WEST
Bertram & Graf Llc - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/02 9:07 AM
ORDER - Despite the Court's warnings, the 609 plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B have more than one case filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with one another and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 21 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/1/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, July 08, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Fri 07/08 2:45 PM
ORDER granting 3 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's request for a refund of the filing fee is DENIED. See In re 3M Combat Arms Earplug Prods. Liab. Litig., Case No.3:19md2885, ECF No. 2755. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/8/2022. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 07/07 11:16 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:3 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (no response) (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
3 3 motion Dismiss Wed 06/22 11:29 AM
MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by ZECHARIAH MOTE (WEST, TIMOTHY) Modified on 6/22/2022 to correct civil event to motion (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/22 12:42 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/6/2022) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/12 10:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WEST, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/12 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7037671.), filed by ZECHARIAH MOTE. (WEST, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]