Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Emily C Marks
Referred: Stephen Michael Doyle
Case #: 2:22-cv-00287
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Real Property Foreclosure
Case Filed:May 12, 2022
Terminated:Mar 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 08, 2022 3:06 AM CST
Defendant
Bre Leonna Thomason
2220 Lakeshore Ridge
Birmingham, AL 35211
Defendant
Norcisse Prisca Thomason
901 Seibles Road
Montgomery, AL 36116
Defendant
Steven Clayton Thomason
901 Seibles Road
Montgomery, AL 36116
Plaintiff
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By
Timothy Dylan Reeves
Mcglinchey Stafford
contact info
Joseph Ronderos
Mcglinchey Stafford
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
42 42 order Judgment Tue 03/14 10:49 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order entered on this date adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the Court that this case is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/14/2023. (bes, )
Related: [-]
41 41 1 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 03/14 10:45 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that the 39 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and this lawsuit is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; A separate Final Judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/14/2023. (bes, )
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/14 9:13 AM
No Objections received re39 Recommendation. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
40 40 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/13 9:07 PM
NOTICE by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company,36 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bre Leonna Thomason,25 MOTION to Deny a Preliminary and Permanent Inju of No Objection to Recommendation of Magistrate Judge (Ronderos, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
39 39 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 02/27 10:00 AM
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the undersigned Magistrate Judge that this case be DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; The undersigned further RECOMMENDS that the Court vacate the undersigned's previous 28 Recommendation and deny all pending motions as MOOT, as further set out in order; Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2023. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/27/2023. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
38 38 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 02/08 5:20 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re37 Order to Show Cause, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.(Ronderos, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Quitclaim Deed,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Tax Assessment for 2022,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Foreclosure Deed,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Appraisal,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Joseph V. Ronderos
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
37 37 5 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 02/01 1:21 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 2/8/2023, Deutsche Bank shall show cause, if any there be, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/1/2023. (amf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
36 36 motion Summary Judgment Dismiss Wed 01/11 10:46 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and MOTION for Dismissal of Complaint by Bre Leonna Thomason.(bes, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Friday, January 06, 2023
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/06 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Ramey on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Ramey, Shaun)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 01/03 12:57 PM
ORDER granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; The Clerk of Court shall terminate Attorney Reeves as counsel of record for Plf. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/3/2023. (wcl, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 01/03 12:59 PM
***PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S34 ORDER - Attorney Timothy Dylan Reeves terminated. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
33 33 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 12/30 10:20 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Timothy
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
32 32 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/20 12:06 PM
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 9/25/2023; Mediation Notice due by 9/16/2023; Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2023 for PLF and by 2/28/2023 for DFT; Discovery due by 8/28/2023, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/20/2022. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/19 11:29 AM
ORDER denying as moot the 9 Motion for Additional Time due to Covid Sickness & Norcisse & Bre Thomason not Living at Home Residence Now. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/19/2022. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
30 30 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Thu 11/03 12:40 PM
OBJECTION to28 Report and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Ronderos, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 30, 2022
29 29 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Mon 10/31 11:17 AM
OBJECTION to28 Recommendation by Bre Leonna Thomason. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
28 28 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 10/21 12:37 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the undersigned that Deutsche Bank's 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 19 Motion for Permanent Injunction be DENIED as MOOT, as further set out in order; Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/21/2022. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
27 27 motion Discovery Hearing Tue 10/11 3:13 PM
MOTION for Discovery and MOTION for an Evidentiary Hearing of Disputed Facts as Stated by Trustee by Bre Leonna Thomason.(bes, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, September 19, 2022
misc Mail Returned Mon 09/19 4:14 PM
Certified Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of the22 Order sent to Bre Leonna Thomason was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Unclaimed, Unable To Forward." (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
26 26 service Waiver of Service Unexecuted Thu 09/15 12:34 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Norcisse Thomason, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Timothy
Monday, September 05, 2022
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Remand to State Court Hearing Tue 09/06 1:59 PM
MOTION to Deny Preliminary and Permanent Injunctions under Jurisdiction Challenge, and MOTION to Remand this Case to the State Court wherein the Motion to Set Aside the Non-Judicial Foreclosure is Being Reviewed Under State Law, and if the case continues Defendants REQUEST Discovery/Evidentiary Hearing for Undecided Issues that are Raised as Defendant's Defensive to Injunction and or Foreclosure Under State Laws that have not been addressed, by Steven Clayton Thomason.(dmn, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Friday, August 19, 2022
24 24 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 08/19 10:23 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of the22 Order to Show Cause signed by N. Thomason for Steven Clayton Thomason, served on 8/17/2022. (bes, )
Related: [-]
23 23 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 08/19 10:20 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of the22 Order to Show Cause signed by N. Thomason for Norcisse Prisca Thomason, served on 8/17/2022.(bes, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 08/15 2:35 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, by the DFTs, as to why the 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction & 19 Motion for Permanent Injunction should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/15/2022. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/04 12:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Bre Leonna Thomason served on 7/18/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (Ronderos, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
20 20 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support Mon 08/01 12:48 PM
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION for Permanent Injunction from filing future lawsuits without leave of Court filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Ronderos, Joseph)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Permanent Injunction Mon 08/01 12:47 PM
MOTION for Permanent Injunction from filing future lawsuits without leave of Court by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Ronderos, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
18 18 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 07/22 1:52 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 USC 636, this case is REFERRED to the US Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/22/2022. (bes, )
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/22 11:34 AM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Steven Clayton Thomason.(bes, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/22 11:36 AM
NOTICE to District Court of State Court Lawsuit Motion to Set Aside Foreclosure Under Alabama Code Title 6 Civil Practice by Steven Clayton Thomason. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc17 for PDF) (bes, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/21 2:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Steven Clayton Thomason served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022. (Ronderos, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
15 15 service Summons Issued Fri 07/15 3:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Bre Leonna Thomason, Norcisse Prisca Thomason, Steven Clayton Thomason; Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.. (bes, )
Related: [-]
14 14 service Proposed Summons Fri 07/15 12:03 PM
Proposed Summons (Ronderos, Joseph) (Main Document 14 replaced on 7/15/2022 to remove ability to edit PDF and to reflect as alias summons) (bes, ). Modified on 7/15/2022 (bes, )
Related: [-]
13 13 service Proposed Summons Fri 07/15 11:27 AM
Proposed Summons Bre Leonna Thomason(Ronderos, Joseph) (Main Document 13 & Attachment 1 replaced on 7/15/2022 to remove ability to edit PDFs and to reflect as Alias summons) (bes, ). Modified on 7/15/2022 (bes, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Norcisse Thomason
Thursday, July 07, 2022
12 12 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/07 1:18 PM
Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case. (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/06 3:23 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Norcisse Prisca Thomason.(bes, )
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/06 3:22 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Bre Leonna Thomason.(bes, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Mon 06/27 11:00 AM
Clerk will not be entering a Default as service indicated that the certified mail was deliverd with the COVID-19 annotation so it is not considered good service. Pltf's attorney was notified of this upon receipt of the application and indicated he would serve again. (dph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/21 3:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Due to Covid Sickness & Noricisse & Bre Thomason Not Living at Home Residence Now, by Steven Clayton Thomason. (es, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Tue 06/14 10:19 AM
7 &8 Applications & File delivered to Clerk for Review. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
8 8 misc Application to Clerk for Entry of Default Mon 06/13 5:27 PM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company against Bre Leonna Thomason.(Ronderos, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joseph V. Ronderos
7 7 misc Application to Clerk for Entry of Default Mon 06/13 5:24 PM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company against Steven Clayton Thomason.(Ronderos, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joseph V. Ronderos
Monday, May 23, 2022
6 6 service Return Receipt Card Mon 05/23 3:59 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by illegible for Bre Leonna Thomason, Norcisse Prisca Thomason, and Steven Clayton Thomason served on 5/20/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 05/19 1:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Bre Leonna Thomason, Norcisse Prisca Thomason, Steven Clayton Thomason; mailed CMRRR with copy of1 Complaint. (cwl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
4 4 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 05/17 4:02 PM
Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 4602066859. (es, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
3 3 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Fri 05/13 11:41 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (am, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement Thu 05/12 1:41 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/23/2022.(am, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order & Sample
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/12 1:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Bre Leonna Thomason, Norcisse Prisca Thomason, Steven Clayton Thomason, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (No Filing Fee received - will be overnighting it)(am, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 05/12 1:38 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (NO PDF - See doc1 ) (am, )
Related: [-]