California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:22-cv-03243
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2022
Terminated:Nov 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 08, 2022 12:57 AM PST
Defendant
Guadalupe Carrasco Cardona
Represented By
Mark A Kleiman
Kleiman Rajaram
contact info
Mark A. Kleiman
Kleiman Rajaram
contact info
Defendant
Los Angeles Unified School District
Represented By
Michele M Goldsmith
Bdg Law Group
contact info
George G Romain
Bdg Law Group, Aplc
contact info
Marina Melikyan
Bdg Law Group Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
United Teachers of Los Angeles
Represented By
Adam Isaac Kornetsky
Bush Gottlieb Alc
contact info
Ira Lawrence Gottlieb
Bush Gottlieb Alc
contact info
Lisa C Demidovich
Bush Gottlieb Alc
contact info
Defendant
Liberated Ethnic Studies Model Curriculum Consortium
Represented By
Mark A Kleiman
Kleiman Rajaram
contact info
Mark A. Kleiman
Kleiman Rajaram
contact info
Defendant
Theresa Montano
Represented By
Mark A Kleiman
Kleiman Rajaram
contact info
Mark A. Kleiman
Kleiman Rajaram
contact info
Defendant
Cecili Myart-Cruz
Represented By
Adam Isaac Kornetsky
Bush Gottlieb Alc
contact info
Ira Lawrence Gottlieb
Bush Gottlieb Alc
contact info
Lisa C Demidovich
Bush Gottlieb Alc
contact info
Plaintiff
Concerned Jewish Parents and Teachers of Los Angeles
Represented By
Robert Patrick Sticht
Judicial Watch Inc
contact info
Lori Lowenthal Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Jerome M. Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe
Represented By
Robert Patrick Sticht
Judicial Watch Inc
contact info
Lori Lowenthal Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Jerome M. Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 5
Represented By
Robert Patrick Sticht
Judicial Watch Inc
contact info
Lori Lowenthal Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Jerome M. Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 4
Represented By
Robert Patrick Sticht
Judicial Watch Inc
contact info
Lori Lowenthal Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Jerome M. Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 3
Represented By
Robert Patrick Sticht
Judicial Watch Inc
contact info
Lori Lowenthal Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Jerome M. Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 2
Represented By
Robert Patrick Sticht
Judicial Watch Inc
contact info
Lori Lowenthal Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Jerome M. Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 1
Represented By
Robert Patrick Sticht
Judicial Watch Inc
contact info
Lori Lowenthal Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info
Jerome M. Marcus
The Deborah Project
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
171 171 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 05/19 11:13 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motions for Attorneys Fees155 and156 are taken off the 5/22/2025 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 5/22/2025. An order with the court's rulings will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
170 170 misc Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued Mon 05/19 6:25 AM
BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 73.20 in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs154 (cp)
Related: [-]