Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:22-cv-01301
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity: Forcible Detainer
Case Filed:May 13, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 09, 2022 2:29 AM CST
Defendant
AmeriPride Services, LLC
Represented By
Mark A Jacobson
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Michael B. DE Leeuw
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
John Joseph Sullivan
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Cassandra Jacobsen
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
Cake Love Co.
Represented By
Melissa S. Weiner
Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP
contact info
Mark Potashnick
Mark Potashnick, P.C.
contact info
Douglas Gregory Blankinship
Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber, LLP
contact info
Chantal Khalil
Finkelstein Blankinship Frei-Pearson & Garber LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Aramark
Terminated: 09/26/2022
Represented By
Mark A Jacobson
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Michael B. DE Leeuw
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
John Joseph Sullivan
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Cassandra Jacobsen
Cozen O'Connor
contact info

GPO May 04 2023
ORDER denying 83 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/4/2023. (SK)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, January 30, 2025
206 206 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Thu 01/30 4:35 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re202 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Service Awards) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
205 205 misc Meet and Confer Statement Thu 01/30 4:34 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re202 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
204 204 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 01/30 4:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re202 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Service Awards) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
203 203 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 01/30 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION202 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Service Awards) : Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2025 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
202 202 motion Attorney Fees Thu 01/30 4:29 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees (Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Service Awards) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc.. (Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
201 201 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Thu 01/30 4:27 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re193 MOTION for Approval of Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
200 200 misc Meet and Confer Statement Thu 01/30 4:25 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re193 Motion for Approval of Settlement filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
199 199 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/30 4:24 PM
Declaration of Steven Weisbrot, Esq. in Support of193 MOTION for Approval of Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-CAFA Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B-Supplemental CAFA Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C-Email Notice of Settlement,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D-Mail Notice of Settlement,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E-Long Form Notice,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F-Payment Election Form
198 198 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/30 4:10 PM
Declaration of Mark Potashnick in Support of193 MOTION for Approval of Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-Litigation Expenses
197 197 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/30 4:05 PM
Declaration of Melissa S. Weiner in Support of193 MOTION for Approval of Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-Pearson Warshaw Firm Resume,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B-Litigation Expenses
196 196 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/30 4:02 PM
Declaration of G. Greg Blankinship in Support of193 MOTION for Approval of Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber, LLP Firm Resume,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B-Litigation Expenses
195 195 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 01/30 3:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re193 MOTION for Approval of Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc..(Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
194 194 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 01/30 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION193 MOTION for Approval of Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement) : Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2025 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
193 193 motion Approval of Settlement Thu 01/30 3:53 PM
MOTION for Approval of Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement) filed by Cake Love Co., Q-Mark Manufacturing, Inc.. (Weiner, Melissa)
Related: [-]