Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:22-ap-03037
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 12, 2022
Terminated:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Nancy K. Perry Children's Shelter
Represented By
The Nancy K. Perry Children's Shelter
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, June 27, 2024
12 12 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 06/27 8:11 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 06/12 9:21 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, July 24, 2023
10 10 misc Mediator Certification of Compliance Mon 07/24 9:43 AM
Mediator Certification of Compliance filed by Peter M. Pearl of Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC on behalf of Peter M. Pearl, Mediator. (Pearl, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
9 9 answer None Thu 03/09 2:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Eric C. Howlett of Sands Anderson PC on behalf of The Nancy K. Perry Children's Shelter. (Howlett, Eric)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
8 8 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 01/25 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Friday, January 20, 2023
7 7 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Fri 01/20 3:23 PM
Second Alias Summons and notice issued to The Nancy K. Perry Children's Shelter Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Request for Alias Summons filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, January 19, 2023
6 6 misc Request for Alias Summons Thu 01/19 3:44 PM
Second Request for Alias Summons filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
5 5 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 10/13 3:56 PM
Alias Summons and notice issued to The Nancy K. Perry Children's Shelter Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, October 07, 2022
4 4 misc Request for Alias Summons Fri 10/07 3:54 PM
Request for Alias Summons filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Fri 05/13 2:52 PM
Summons and notice issued to The Nancy K. Perry Children's Shelter Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, May 12, 2022
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 05/12 4:18 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-03037 KRH] ) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A34398691, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 05/12 4:13 PM
Adversary case 22-03037 Complaint against The Nancy K. Perry Children's Shelter filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]