California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:22-cv-00812
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:May 13, 2022
Terminated:Sep 28, 2022
Case in other court:San Joaquin County, STK-CV-UBC-20-04861
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 09, 2022 1:13 AM PST
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Kevin Tully
Law Offices Of Kevin J. Tully
contact info
Defendant
Roush Industries, Inc.
Represented By
John William Myers
Beatty & Myers, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Roush Performance, Inc.
Represented By
John William Myers
Beatty & Myers, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christian Life Center, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Michael Wirtz
Wirtz Law Apc
contact info
Amy Rebecca Rotman
Wirtz Law, Apc
contact info

GPO Sep 28 2022
E CLOSED. (cc Financial). (Rodriguez, E) Modified on 9/28/2022 (Rodriguez, E).ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 09/27/2022 REMANDING CASE to San Joaquin Superior Court. SANCTIONING Plaintiff's counsel in the amount of $150 to be paid within 5 days. Certified copy of Remand Order sent to other court. CAS

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
misc CAED Receipt Wed 10/05 9:23 AM
RECEIPT number #CAE200123274 $150.00 fbo Christian Life Center, Inc. by Wirtz Law APC on 10/5/2022. (Spichka, K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
21 21 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Remanded Order on Motion to Remand Wed 09/28 1:00 PM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 09/27/2022 REMANDING CASE to San Joaquin Superior Court. SANCTIONING Plaintiff's counsel in the amount of $150 to be paid within 5 days. Certified copy of Remand Order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (cc Financial). (Rodriguez, E) Modified on 9/28/2022 (Rodriguez, E)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
19 19 misc Request for Telephonic Appearance Wed 08/17 9:02 AM
REQUEST FOR REMOTE APPEARANCE at the Motion Hearing re Plaintiff's13 Motion to Remand set for 8/23/2022 by Roush Performance, Inc. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Wed 08/17 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/17/2022: The motion now calendared for 8/23/2022 is SUBMITTED without appearance and without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on said motion is VACATED. If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. The parties'18 ,19 Requests for Remote Appearance are DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
18 18 misc Request for Telephonic Appearance Tue 08/16 1:42 PM
REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 8/23/2022 Motion to Remand hearing by Ford Motor Company.(Tully, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
order Minute Order Wed 07/13 10:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/13/2022: The parties are ORDERED to file an updated Joint Status Report pursuant to the provisions of F.R.Cv.P. 16 and 26, in accordance with Local Rule 240 and the Court's Order Requiring Service of Process and Joint Status Report, within thirty (30) days after the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's pending13 Motion to Remand. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
16 16 misc Status Report Tue 07/12 3:24 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Christian Life Center, Inc.. (Rotman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 07/07 5:53 PM
REPLY by Christian Life Center, Inc. to RESPONSE to13 Motion to Remand,. (Rotman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
14 14 respm Opposition to Motion Mon 06/27 10:32 AM
OPPOSITION by Roush Industries, Inc. to13 Motion to Remand,. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
13 13 motion Remand Mon 06/13 12:20 PM
MOTION to REMAND by Christian Life Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Rotman, Amy) Modified on 6/13/2022 (Kaminski, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Amy Rotman,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 02, 2022
12 12 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 06/02 12:40 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Certificate / Proof of Service Thu 06/02 11:25 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Roush Industries, Inc. re5 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
order Clerk's Decline of Entry of Default Thu 05/26 8:54 AM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Roush Performance, Inc. The clerk hereby declines to enter6 Request for Entry of Default, filed by Christian Life Center, Inc., due to filing of8 Answer by Roush Performance, Inc. (TEXT ONLY) (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/24 12:33 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Kovington Performance Holdings, Inc.. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/24 12:24 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Kovington Performance Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Myers, John William added.(Myers, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/24 12:19 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Roush Industries, Inc..(Myers, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
6 6 misc Request for Entry of Default Mon 05/23 5:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kovington Performance Holdings, Inc. by Christian Life Center, Inc.. Attorney Rotman, Amy Rebecca added.(Rotman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Amy Rotman,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Friday, May 13, 2022
5 5 misc Civil New Case Documents for JAM Fri 05/13 2:12 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 Order re Filing Requirements,
Att: 3 VDRP
4 4 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/13 12:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Roush Industries, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal.(Myers, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/13 11:40 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Roush Industries, Inc.. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/13 11:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Roush Industries, Inc. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 57 pgs notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/13 11:35 AM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UBC-2020-0004861 by Roush Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10229580)(Myers, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties