Foxmind Canada Enterprises LTD. v. Badouyu Intelligent Iot Technology et al.(Suzhou) Co., Ltd.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00885 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 01, 2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Badouyu Intelligent Iot Technology (Suzhou) Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Changsha Fusheng Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Changsha Runfeng Electronic Commerce Co., Limited
|
|
Defendant
Changzhou Xichen Diao Textile Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chengdu Lanpinsheng International Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chongqing Mengyigou Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chongqing Zhengfeng Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Cutiecare Store
|
|
Defendant
Dong Guan Boutique Living Product Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Bogao Silicone Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan City Rewin Gift Company Limited
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Lucky Goldjyx Company Limited
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Meinuo Crafts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Qiaotou Dongshang Silicone Rubber Mold Products Factory
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Sancai Paper Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Shengdao Silicone Rubber Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Shero Sports Goods Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan T-Nice Silicone Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Tianwei Precise Silicone Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Ustar Gifts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Wellfine Silicone Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Xinyue Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Youhang Rubber & Plastic Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Zhencai Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongyang Ruifeng Commodity Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Foshan City Camping Technology Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Foshan Janmart Decoration Materials Company Limited
|
|
Defendant
Foshan Lqjp Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Foshan Quzhongdai Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Fujian Tuojiang IOT Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Rhing Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Sunup Houseware Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Yimai Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Haining Hongmo Technology Co.,ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Haining Jinhu Import & Export Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hangzhou Dongwang Technology Co., LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Hangzhou Tonghe Toys Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hangzhou Watersy Houseware Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hangzhou Yishang Clothing Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hangzhou Zhulianbihe Cross Border E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hangzhou Zirui Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Henan 1st Century Robot Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Huizhou Dingli Silicone Rubber Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Huizhou Huayusi Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Huizhou Suan Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
INO Technology (Xiamen) Co.,Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ji'an Zhicai Packing Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Jiangxi Ruida Shangdian Garment Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Jinhua Suoyi E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Jinhua Yifan Arts And Crafts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Jinjiang Oden Import&Export Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Kunshan Chuangheshuang Automation Equipment Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Mystical wisdo Store
|
|
Defendant
Nanjing Litamei Environmental Protection Equipment Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Nantong You And Me International Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ningbo Beilun Happyfoam Craft Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ningbo Seasons Import And Export Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ningbo Vancham Bags & Gifts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ningbo Yinzhou Yuanjun Imp. & Exp. Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
No Stress Store
|
|
Defendant
Pingyang Hanchuan Household Goods Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Pop it officiaI Store
|
|
Defendant
Popfidget Toy Store
|
|
Defendant
Protect Healthy Store
|
|
Defendant
Quality boutique Store
|
|
Defendant
Quanzhou Numberone Textile Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Quanzhou Qianpin Trade Co.,Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Quanzhou Riquan Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shandong Runyang Supply Chain Management Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Shangcheng County Haibaoda Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shanghai Qichang Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shanghai Yexiang Network Technology Limited Company
|
|
Defendant
Shantou Chenghai Haipengda Plastic Toys Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shantou City Chenghai Area Yicheng Toys Factory
|
|
Defendant
Shantou City Longhu District I Want To Play Toy Wholesale Department
|
|
Defendant
Shantou Hongtian Environmental Protection Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shantou Qilong Toys Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shantou Shengying Toys Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shantou Sunyok Toys Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Cymay Gifts & Packaging Factory
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Demeng Toy Design Development Co., Limited
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Dihao Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Fandtai Technology Company Limited
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Futian District Yidetong Trade Firm
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Guangming Qiyehe Trading Firm
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Hanwan Foreign Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Haodaxin Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Heng Yi Xin Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Heng You Feng Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Jing Tian Household Commodity Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Kaichuangtong E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Konsda Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Laudtec Electronics Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Lengthkey Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Merrycoo Industrial Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Pipibailv Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Saiouer Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Shengke Automation Equipment Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Smartibm Industry Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Taijixiang Technology Company Limited
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen UMKU Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Xingfuming Silicone Co., Limited
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Xintu Silicone Rubber Products Co.,Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Xiuwai Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Yiyue Industry And Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Youweiyoupin Tech Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Zhizhi Brand Incubation Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shijiazhuang Cearth Imp & Exp Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shijiazhuang Youen Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shop4426029 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5132075 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop911134294 Store
|
|
Defendant
Spec-Tech (Xiamen) Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Suzhou Oqixin Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Taizhou Fu San Shu Handicraft Co.,ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Utiller (Xiamen) Imp.&Exp. Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Weiqu Tongxun (Guangzhou) E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Wenzhou Times Arts&Crafts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Wuhan Xingbo Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Wuxi CHRT Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen 10trees Network Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Aijin Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Gexuan Supply Chain Management Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Goepp Network Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Hipie Industrial Co.,Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Lvbike Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen My-Gift Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Sunglan Imp. & Exp. Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Tintop Industrial Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Xinxiang Hiton Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xinxiang Quchuang Toys Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xuzhou Zifeiyu Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
YINIJIN Store
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Baige Crafts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Chuangyu Arts And Crafts Co.,ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Hongxin Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Jin'an E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Leading Import And Export Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Lixun Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Qingran Children's Product Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Qiuwei Artware Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Shuolong Import And Export Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Wuqiu Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Zhuoxuan Plastic & Silicone Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Zhaoqing Zhuoxing Silicone Product Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Zhejiang Multistay Industry Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Zhongshan MX Silicone Rubber Model Factory
|
|
Defendant
i am groot Store
|
|
Defendant
kezan Store
|
|
Defendant
xiamen gaoxincheng silicone company
|
|
Plaintiff
Foxmind Canada Enterprises Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 05/13/2022
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Mydear Silicone Product Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 07/14/2022
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Shanggu E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 07/14/2022
|
|
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 05/13/2022
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
97 | 97
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:96 Letter filed by Foxmind Canada Enterprises Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/4/2025) (tg) |
|
Monday, March 03, 2025 | ||
96 | 96
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Gabriela N. Nastasi dated March 3, 2025 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Foxmind Canada Enterprises Ltd...(Nastasi, Gabriela) |