Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-30849

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Harlin Dewayne Hale
Case #: 3:22-ap-03050
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 16, 2022
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hunter-Kelsey, LLC
7200 N. MoPac St 120
Austin, TX 78731
Represented By
Howard Marc Spector
Spector & Cox, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Stronghill Texas, LLC
7200 N. MoPac St 100
Austin, TX 78731
Represented By
Stronghill Texas, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC
111615 Forest Central Dr.
Dallas, TX 75243
Represented By
Howard Marc Spector
Spector & Cox, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Blount
925 Wood Hollow Way
DeSoto, TX 75115
Represented By
Howard Marc Spector
Spector & Cox, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
court Close adversary case Tue 04/16 12:49 PM
Adversary case 3:22-ap-3050 closed (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2024
32 32 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 03/17 11:15 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order dismissing case without prejudice (related document29 ). Entered on 3/15/2024
Friday, March 15, 2024
31 31 order Dismiss adversary case Fri 03/15 3:36 PM
Order dismissing case without prejudice Related [+]. Entered on 3/15/2024 (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-] 29
Sunday, March 10, 2024
30 30 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Mon 03/11 12:13 AM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 03/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order to appear and show cause why adversary should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 3/12/2024 at 5 PM CST. Show Cause Response due by 3/12/2024. Entered on 3/8/2024
Friday, March 08, 2024
29 29 order Show cause Fri 03/08 3:57 PM
Order to appear and show cause why adversary should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 3/12/2024 at 5 PM CST. Show Cause Response due by 3/12/2024. Entered on 3/8/2024 (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
28 28 court Hearing held Mon 02/26 4:36 PM
Hearing held on 2/26/2024 Related [+] (COURT TO ISSUE SHOW-CAUSE ORDER WHY ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION) (Bergreen, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-03050 Notice of Removal filed by Hunter-Kesley, LLC. Complaint by BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Jonathan Price Blount against Hunter-Kelsey, LLC, Stronghill Texas, LLC
Monday, February 12, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of hearing Mon 02/12 4:18 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendants Hunter-Kelsey, LLC, Stronghill Texas, LLC Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 2/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett. (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Plaintiff Jonathan Blount
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
26 26 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 01/16 11:40 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for defendant. Responses due by 1/26/2024. (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
25 25 order Consolidate Wed 09/13 10:36 AM
Order denying motion to consolidate with member case 3:2022-ap-3050-swe for want of prosecution Related [+] Entered on 9/13/2023. (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, July 27, 2023
24 24 misc Withdrawal Thu 07/27 2:52 PM
Withdrawal filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC Related [+]. (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for leave for Partial Dismissal (JOINT)
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
23 23 motion Leave (Not for Appeal use) Tue 07/25 9:46 AM
Motion for leave for Partial Dismissal (JOINT) filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
22 22 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 06/29 11:15 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for defendant. Responses due by 7/10/2023. (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
21 21 court Hearing held Fri 02/24 11:45 AM
Hearing held on 2/22/2023. Related [+] (STATUS CONFERENCE HELD; MR. SMITH WORKING TO OBTAIN REPLACEMENT COUNSEL; COURT INSTRUCTED COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO ENSURE ALL DEFENDANTS ARE SERVED; MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (7) TO BE HEARD IN RELATED ADVERSARY CASE 22-03053 (Smith, C)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-03050 Notice of Removal filed by Hunter-Kesley, LLC. Complaint by BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Jonathan Price Blount against Hunter-Kelsey, LLC, Stronghill Texas, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). 91 (Declaratory judgment). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Spector, Howard) MODIFIED to show case as Notice of Removal on 5/17/2022 .
20 20 notice Notice of hearing Wed 02/22 11:01 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 2/22/2023 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Everett Ctrm for1 , Status Conference to be held on 2/22/2023 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett. (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-03050 Notice of Removal filed by Hunter-Kesley, LLC. Complaint by BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Jonathan Price Blount against Hunter-Kelsey, LLC, Stronghill Texas, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). 91 (Declaratory judgment). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Spector, Howard) MODIFIED to show case as Notice of Removal on 5/17/2022.
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, February 17, 2023
19 19 court Clerk's correspondence Fri 02/17 12:17 PM
SECOND REQUEST - Clerk's correspondence requesting a notice of hearing from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 2/24/2023. (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to consolidate lead case 22-03049 with member case(s) 22-03050 and 22-03053 filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC
Thursday, January 26, 2023
18 18 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 01/26 3:55 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting a notice of hearing from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 2/6/2023. (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to consolidate lead case 22-03049 with member case(s) 22-03050 and 22-03053 filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC
Monday, September 12, 2022
17 17 court Hearing held Mon 09/12 2:57 PM
Hearing held on 9/12/2022 Related [+] (CONTINUED TO A DATE TO BE DETERMINED; PARTIES TO CONTACT COURTROOM DEPUTY FOR NEW HEARING DATE) (Smith, C) Modified text on 9/13/2022 (Bergreen, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-03050 Notice of Removal filed by Hunter-Kesley, LLC. Complaint by BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Jonathan Price Blount against Hunter-Kelsey, LLC, Stronghill Texas, LLC (STATUS CONFERENCE HELD);7 Motion to consolidate lead case 22-03049 with member case(s) 22-03050 and 22-03053 filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
16 16 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Wed 09/07 4:56 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC Related [+]. (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to consolidate lead case 22-03049 with member case(s) 22-03050 and 22-03053
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
Monday, July 18, 2022
15 15 court Hearing held Fri 07/22 2:11 PM
Hearing held on 7/18/2022 Related [+] (STATUS CONFERENCE HELD) (Smith, C)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-03050 Notice of Removal filed by Hunter-Kesley, LLC. Complaint by BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Jonathan Price Blount against Hunter-Kelsey, LLC, Stronghill Texas, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). 91 (Declaratory judgment). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Spector, Howard) MODIFIED to show case as Notice of Removal on 5/17/2022 .
14 14 notice Notice of hearing Mon 07/18 4:30 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC. Status Conference to be held on 9/12/2022 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett. (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of hearing Wed 07/06 11:07 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 7/18/2022 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett. (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Plaintiff Jonathan Blount
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
12 12 court Hearing held Tue 06/28 2:41 PM
Hearing held on 6/15/2022. Related [+] (STATUS CONFERENCE HELD; PARTIES TO CONFER REGARDING DATE FOR CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE AND CONTACT COURTROOM DEPUTY) (Smith, C)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-03050 Notice of Removal filed by Hunter-Kesley, LLC. Complaint by BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Jonathan Price Blount against Hunter-Kelsey, LLC, Stronghill Texas, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). 91 (Declaratory judgment). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Spector, Howard) MODIFIED to show case as Notice of Removal on 5/17/2022 .
Thursday, June 09, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of hearing Thu 06/09 11:39 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 9/12/2022 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Everett Ctrm for7 , (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to consolidate filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC
Monday, June 06, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of hearing Mon 06/06 3:38 PM
Amended Notice of hearing (status hearing) filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC. Hearing to be held on 6/15/2022 at 09:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett(Spector, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
9 9 notice Notice of hearing Mon 06/06 3:35 PM
Amended Notice of hearing (status conference) filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC. Hearing to be held on 6/15/2022 at 09:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, May 27, 2022
8 8 motion Expedite hearing Fri 05/27 1:38 PM
Motion for expedited hearin Related [+] filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to consolidate
7 7 motion Consolidate Fri 05/27 1:29 PM
Motion to consolidate lead case 22-03049 with member case(s) 22-03050 and 22-03053 filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of hearing Tue 05/17 4:59 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 6/15/2022 at 09:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale. (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Plaintiff Jonathan Blount
5 5 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Tue 05/17 4:58 PM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC Related [+]. (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
4 4 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 05/17 12:53 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Amended Adversary proceeding cover sheet adding Notice of Removal as a nature of suit from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 5/19/2022. (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-03050 Notice of Removal filed by Hunter-Kesley, LLC. Complaint by BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Jonathan Price Blount against Hunter-Kelsey, LLC, Stronghill Texas, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). 91 (Declaratory judgment). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Spector, Howard) MODIFIED to show case as Notice of Removal on 5/17/2022
Monday, May 16, 2022
3 3 notice Notice (generic) Mon 05/16 1:29 PM
STATE COURT PLEADINGS: FILING OF PLEADINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 9027-1(C) filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC Related [+].(Spector, Howard) MODIFIED text on 5/17/2022 (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Plaintiff Jonathan Price Blount
Att: 1 Part 2
Att: 2 Part 3
2 2 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Mon 05/16 11:57 AM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Defendant Hunter-Kelsey, LLC Related [+]. (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/16 11:53 AM
Adversary case 22-03050 Complaint by BAPA Brooklynn 2004, LLC, Jonathan Price Blount against Hunter-Kelsey, LLC, Stronghill Texas, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 14 Related [+]. 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). 91 (Declaratory judgment). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Spector, Howard)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other