California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:22-cv-02900
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 16, 2022
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Nov 12, 2022 1:18 AM PST
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
Represented By
Mariam Chamilova
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Stephen M Copenhaver
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Sara T. Schneider
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Thomas Crispi
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Defendant
Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Luxshare-ICT, Inc.
Represented By
Ellen Lynn Darling
K & L Gates LLP
contact info
Damon M. Pitt
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Caitlin Comstock Blanche
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
B.G.
Represented By
Grigory Rchtouni
Callahan & Blaine, Aplc
contact info
Richard Collins
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP
contact info
Richard Thomas Collins
Callahan & Blaine, Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Gordoa
Represented By
Tej Paranjpe
Paranjpe & Mahadass LLP
contact info
Robert L. Horn
Pmr Law
contact info
Grigory Rchtouni
Callahan & Blaine, Aplc
contact info
William Haacker
Pmr Law - Paranjpe Mahadass Ruemke LLP
contact info
Richard Collins
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP
contact info
Brent Phelps
Pmr Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Ariani Reyes
Represented By
Grigory Rchtouni
Callahan & Blaine, Aplc
contact info
Richard Collins
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP
contact info
Richard Thomas Collins
Callahan & Blaine, Aplc
contact info

GPO Oct 21 2022
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 45 Motion to Dismiss. Amended complaint due by November 4, 2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
GPO Nov 17 2022
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/17/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2024 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 4/8/2024 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2024 to 4/19/2024 at 8:30 a.m. (10-days) in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
GPO Mar 12 2024
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2024)
GPO Apr 08 2024
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT LETTER. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/8/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2024)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
227 227 order Judgment Mon 04/28 3:26 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/28/2025. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
226 226 15 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 04/28 3:25 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 196 Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 201 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
225 225 3 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mon 04/28 3:22 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
224 224 misc Transcript Order Mon 04/28 6:53 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/17/2025 before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ariani Reyes, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Paranjpe, Tej)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
223 223 misc Transcript Sun 04/27 10:57 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/17/2025, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CCG CSR No. 12219, telephone number ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov/(415)336-5223. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (rre, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 222 Transcript Order (s)222
Monday, April 21, 2025
222 222 misc Transcript Order Mon 04/21 5:38 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 17, 2025 before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Apple, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Schneider, Sara)
Related: [-]