New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:22-cv-04010
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:May 16, 2022
Terminated:Aug 01, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Nov 12, 2022 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
John Does 1-2
Defendant
Pixeline Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Adam Lewis Pollock
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Max Ephraim Rodriguez
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elad Rosanski
Represented By
Adam Lewis Pollock
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Max Ephraim Rodriguez
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bizzabo Ltd.
Represented By
David Hillel Kupfer
Cooley LLP
contact info
Emily Born
Cooley Llp - Library
contact info
John Hemann
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bizzabo, Inc.
Represented By
David Hillel Kupfer
Cooley LLP
contact info
Emily Born
Cooley Llp - Library
contact info
John Hemann
Cooley LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, July 29, 2022
47 47 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/29 3:23 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski, John Does 1-2 and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rodriguez, Max)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/27 12:02 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Max Rodriguez. RE-FILE Document No. 46 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the individual party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were not selected; (2) the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
46 46 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/26 1:51 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rodriguez, Max)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
45 45 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Fri 07/08 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a DECISON proceeding held on 6/27/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
44 44 misc Transcript Fri 07/08 2:41 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: DECISION held on 6/27/2022 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2022..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
43 43 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/27 6:24 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record today, the Court denied plaintiffs' motion to convert the temporary restraining order, Dkt. 13, into a preliminary injunction, based on the forum selection clause in the parties' contract. The Court further ordered that the TRO be maintained for 72 hours, until 1 p.m. Eastern time on June 30, 2022, to allow plaintiffs to seek emergency relief in a proper forum. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/27/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
minutes Show Cause Hearing Tue 06/28 10:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/27/2022. Court reporter present. (ajs)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 26, 2022
42 42 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 06/26 6:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max Ephraim Rodriguez on behalf of Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski..(Rodriguez, Max)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
41 41 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 06/03 6:09 PM
ORDER granting38 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The hearing previously scheduled for June 6, 2022 at 11 a.m. is hereby adjourned until June 27, 2022 at 12 p.m. The temporary restraining order, Dkt. 13, is extended on consent until that time, with the modification/clarification that the relevant documents may be submitted as part of the current injunction proceedings being brought in Israel, as proposed by defendants. Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended as requested until three weeks following the Court's preliminary injunction decision See Dkt. 38. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at docket 38. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/3/2022) (ks)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Letter Fri 06/03 5:04 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David H. Kupfer dated June 3, 2022 re: Parties Joint Response to Court's Order (Dkt. No. 39). Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/03 6:20 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 06/02 6:27 PM
ORDER with respect to38 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint. The Court is prepared to grant this motion, although due to scheduling constraints the prior week, the hearing currently scheduled for June 6, 2022 at 11 a.m. would have to be adjourned until June 27, 2022 at 12 p.m. Before resolving the application for an adjournment, the Court seeks clarification on the status of the temporary restraining order the Court entered on May 17, 2022, see Dkt. 13. Because no party has mentioned otherwise in their extension requests, see Dkts. 18, 22, 35, 38, the Court assumes that the parties have jointly agreed to extend the TRO until the date to which the hearing is adjourned. The parties are to confirm such by joint letter on the docket submitted by tomorrow, June 3, 2022. Upon such confirmation, the Court will grant the requested adjournment. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/2/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 06/02 4:00 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David H. Kupfer dated June 2, 2022. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 05/31 11:46 AM
ORDER granting35 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference to be held via zoom on the same date, or in-person on a later date, due to the Court's covid protocols. The hearing previously scheduled for June 1, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. is hereby adjourned until June 6, 2022 at 11 a.m. It will take place in Courtroom 1305 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square. The Court wishes counsel and his family good health. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/31/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Letter Tue 05/31 9:54 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam Pollock dated May 31, 2022 re: Exhibit H (to provide the Court with the complete exhibit from which Plaintiffs included only one email from the email chain). Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski..(Pollock, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit H
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/31 11:47 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 30, 2022
35 35 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 05/30 1:57 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference to be held via zoom on the same date, or in-person on a later date, due to the Court's covid protocols addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam Pollock dated May 30, 2022. Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski..(Pollock, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
34 34 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 05/27 5:10 PM
DECLARATION of Oded Porath in Support re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
33 33 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 05/27 5:08 PM
DECLARATION of Simone Astuni in Support re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 05/27 5:06 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Goncalves in Support re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 05/27 5:03 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Letter Fri 05/27 4:49 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam Pollock dated May 27, 2022 re: new lawsuit in Israel filed by Pixeline. Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski..(Pollock, Adam)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Fri 05/27 3:22 PM
ORDER granting28 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/27/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
28 28 motion File Excess Pages Thu 05/26 6:06 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David H. Kupfer dated May 26, 2022. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/26 10:22 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pixeline Technologies Ltd. for Pixeline Technologies, Inc.. Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski..(Pollock, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
26 26 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/23 4:47 PM
DECLARATION of Rajeev Surati (expert) in Opposition re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski..(Pollock, Adam)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/23 4:45 PM
DECLARATION of Elad Rosanski in Opposition re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski..(Pollock, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Draft Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Main Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - March 2022 email chain,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - June 2020 extension,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - May 2021 agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - March 2022 email chain,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - May 2022 email chain
24 24 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/23 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski..(Pollock, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 05/20 12:42 PM
ORDER granting22 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and schedule for the preliminary injunction motion. Granted. The Court thanks the parties for their collegiality. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/20/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 05/20 11:47 AM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and schedule for the preliminary injunction motion addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David H. Kupfer dated May 20, 2022. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/20 12:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 5/23/2022, Replies due by 5/27/2022. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/19 6:22 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting16 Motion for John H. Hemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for John H. Hemann, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is GRANTED. As further set forth by this Order.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/19/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/19 6:20 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Emily J. Born to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/19/2022) (ate)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/19 4:42 PM
ORDER denying18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; denying18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re18 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (consent letter motion for two-day adjournment of all OTSC dates) addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam Pollock dated May 19, 2022. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam Pollock dated May 19, 2022. The Court regretfully cannot grant the request for these adjournment dates due to scheduling constraints. If the parties jointly request for an adjournment of the hearing until 8:30 a.m on June 1; 5 p.m. on June 1; or 3 p.m. on June 3, the Court will grant it and adjourn the deadlines for the parties' submissions accordingly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/19/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Adjourn Conference Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/19 1:25 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (consent letter motion for two-day adjournment of all OTSC dates) addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam Pollock dated May 19, 2022., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam Pollock dated May 19, 2022. Document filed by Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski..(Pollock, Adam)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 05/19 3:56 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for John H. Hemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26167025. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 05/19 3:56 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 17 MOTION for Emily J. Born to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26167061. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/18 7:35 PM
MOTION for Emily J. Born to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26167061. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Born, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Emily J. Born in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/18 6:51 PM
MOTION for John H. Hemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26167025. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Hemann, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit /Declaration of John H. Hemann In Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vic
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 05/18 1:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Elad Rosanski served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service was accepted by Shahaf "Doe", wife of Elad Rosanski. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd.; Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 05/18 12:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Pixeline Technologies, Inc. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service was accepted by Vcorp Services, Inc., Registered Agent. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd.; Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
13 13 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 05/17 1:56 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby: ORDERED, that the Defendants Pixeline Technologies, Inc., also known as Pixeline Technologies Ltd., and Elad Rosanski "(Defendants") show cause on the 24th day of May, 2022 at 9 am in Courtroom 1305 of the Thurgood Marshall United State Courthouse, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 should not be issued, pending determination of the above-captioned litigation: ORDERED that, pending a hearing on Plaintiffs' application for a preliminary injunction, Plaintiffs' application for Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED. Specifically, Defendants are hereby restrained, enjoined and ordered, as prescribed above in Sections 1 and 2(a); the Court declines to direct Defendants to take the actions set forth in Section 2(b), 2(c) and 3 without input from defense counsel. ORDERED, that Defendants shall serve a copy of their opposition papers, if any, by electronic filing using the Court's ECF system no later than Friday May 20, 2022 at 5 p.m. ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of their reply papers, if any, by electronic filing using the Court's ECF system no later than Monday, May 23, 2022 at 12 noon. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that service of a copy of this Order and the papers upon which it is granted shall be accomplished further by all effective means, and shall be deemed good and sufficient service if made by hand delivery to the parties, ECF, and by electronic mail to Pixeline Technologies, Inc.'s outside corporate counsel in Israel, on or before 5pm on 17th day of May, 2022. Proof of service shall be filed with the Court within one (1) day of entry of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Show Cause Hearing set for 5/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.), Motions terminated:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Bizzabo, Inc., Bizzabo Ltd.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/17/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 05/17 9:01 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elad Rosanski. (vf)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 05/17 9:00 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pixeline Technologies, Inc.. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 05/17 8:50 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 05/17 8:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/17 8:50 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/16 8:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elad Rosanski, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/16 8:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pixeline Technologies, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/16 8:27 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bizzabo Ltd. for Bizzabo, Inc.. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/16 8:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Hillel Kupfer on behalf of Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 29 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 05/16 8:23 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 05/16 8:22 PM
DECLARATION of Simone Astuni in Support re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality and Proprietary Rights Undertaking
4 4 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 05/16 8:19 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Goncalves in Support re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Mon 05/16 8:18 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ., MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David) ( Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing. )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of David H. Kupfer Certifying Compliance with Local Civil Rule 6.1(d)
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/16 8:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/16 8:09 PM
COMPLAINT against John Does 1-2, Pixeline Technologies, Inc., Elad Rosanski. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26153624)Document filed by Bizzabo Ltd., Bizzabo, Inc...(Kupfer, David)
Related: [-]