Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-06397
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 16, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Nov 12, 2022 4:19 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
GEORIC HUDSON
Represented By
DANIEL JOHN HARRISON
Pogust Millrood Llc - Conshohocken Nj
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
5 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel Re:1 Complaint filed by GEORIC HUDSON does not have a signature block. See N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(D). Please include a signature block in all future filings. (djb)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case transferred in from Tallahassee Division Division on 05/17/2022 Case Number 4:22-cv-192. (djb)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/17 7:55 AM
ORDER - The Clerk is hereby directed to assign all actions filed in, removed to, or transferred to this district which relate to, or seek damages from use of, the 3M Combat Arms Earplugs to the undersigned in the Pensacola Division. re 1 Complaint filed by GEORIC HUDSON. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
2 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re1 Complaint filed by GEORIC HUDSON Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET (rcb)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 05/17 7:51 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re1 Complaint filed by GEORIC HUDSON Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET (rcb)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 05/17 8:01 AM
Case transferred in from Tallahassee Division Division on 05/17/2022 Case Number 4:22-cv-192. (djb)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 05/17 9:16 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel Re:1 Complaint filed by GEORIC HUDSON does not have a signature block. See N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(D). Please include a signature block in all future filings. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
1 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7065236.), filed by GEORIC HUDSON. (HARRISON, DANIEL) Modified to edit title on 5/17/2022 (rcb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet