Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:22-cv-00670
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:May 17, 2022
Terminated:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 13, 2022 12:41 AM PST
Defendant
John Shearer
Represented By
Joseph A Hamell
Montgomery Purdue PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Shearer Painting LLC
Represented By
Joseph A Hamell
Montgomery Purdue PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By
Michael Urban
The Urban Law Firm
contact info
Wesley J. Smith
Christensen James & Martin
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust
Represented By
Michael Urban
The Urban Law Firm
contact info
Wesley J. Smith
Christensen James & Martin
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund
Represented By
Michael Urban
The Urban Law Firm
contact info
Wesley J. Smith
Christensen James & Martin
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative
Represented By
Michael Urban
The Urban Law Firm
contact info
Wesley J. Smith
Christensen James & Martin
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust
Represented By
Michael Urban
The Urban Law Firm
contact info
Wesley J. Smith
Christensen James & Martin
contact info
Plaintiff
International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5
Represented By
Michael Urban
The Urban Law Firm
contact info
Wesley J. Smith
Christensen James & Martin
contact info
Plaintiff
Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association
Represented By
Michael Urban
The Urban Law Firm
contact info
Wesley J. Smith
Christensen James & Martin
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, October 07, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10/07 11:08 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case without Prejudice. The Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
22 22 misc Response (non motion) Thu 10/03 9:54 AM
RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs re21 Minute Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, (Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
21 21 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/13 12:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs filed a notice of Defendants' bankruptcy petitions in September 2023. Dkt. No.17 . The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than 10/4/2024, advising the Court on the status of those proceedings, and whether a case schedule should be entered in this matter. The parties' report should also address whether an updated version of the report provided in February 2023 (Dkt. No.16 ) would be useful for purposes of setting a case schedule, if one is requested. Authorized by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
20 20 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Fri 12/15 2:43 PM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Thu 11/09 8:00 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Michael Urban. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
18 18 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Tue 09/26 2:39 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
17 17 7 pgs notice Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Fri 09/08 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by All Plaintiffs. (Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned to Judge Thu 09/07 11:43 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K Evanson. Judge Ricardo S. Martinez no longer assigned to the case. (LC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
16 16 7 pgs misc Joint Status Report Thu 02/09 8:11 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association.(Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/22 9:24 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,,, by John Shearer, Shearer Painting LLC.(Hamell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
14 14 misc Notice to Withdraw Pending Motion Mon 12/12 4:28 PM
NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re10 MOTION for Default against Shearer Painting LLC and John Shearer, ; by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association. (Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs respm Declaration Mon 12/12 12:17 PM
DECLARATION of Joseph Hamell filed by Defendants John Shearer, Shearer Painting LLC re10 MOTION for Default against Shearer Painting LLC and John Shearer, (Hamell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 12/12 12:15 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants John Shearer, Shearer Painting LLC, to10 MOTION for Default against Shearer Painting LLC and John Shearer,. (Hamell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Declaration Mon 12/12 10:12 AM
DECLARATION of Michael A. Urban filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association re10 MOTION for Default against Shearer Painting LLC and John Shearer, (Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Default Mon 12/12 10:11 AM
MOTION for Default against Shearer Painting LLC and John Shearer,, filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association. Noting Date 12/12/2022, (Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed Clerk's Default
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
9 9 misc Stipulation Tue 10/11 11:58 AM
STIPULATION to Extend the Deadline for Defendants to File The Answer (Third) by parties (Hamell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Tue 09/27 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Michael Urban. Filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association. (Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
7 7 misc Stipulation Thu 09/08 2:05 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE THE ANSWER (SECOND) by parties (Hamell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/24 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph A Hamell on behalf of Defendants John Shearer, Shearer Painting LLC. (Hamell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
5 5 order RSM - Joint Status Report Order (FORM) Wed 06/08 11:47 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/6/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/13/2022. (LC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
4 4 service Waiver of Service Tue 06/07 11:29 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant John Shearer mailed on 5/25/2022; Shearer Painting LLC mailed on 5/25/2022 (Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/18 5:59 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) John Shearer, Shearer Painting LLC. (RE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 05/18 5:53 PM
Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
2 2 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/17 4:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association (Urban, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/17 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) John Shearer, Shearer Painting LLC Related [+] Attorney Michael Urban added to party Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Urban added to party Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Urban added to party Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Urban added to party Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Urban added to party Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Urban added to party International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Urban added to party Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association (pty:pla), filed by Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund.(Urban, Michael)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7557174
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons