Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 4:22-cv-00046
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:May 17, 2022
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 13, 2022 1:27 AM MST
Defendant
New Sound Transportation, LLC
Represented By
John F. Haffey
Haffey Vap PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Laughery
Represented By
John C. Heenan
Heenan & Cook
contact info
James M. Ragain
Ragain Law Firm
contact info
Joseph Patrick Cook
Heenan & Cook
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Wilson-Laughery
Represented By
John C. Heenan
Heenan & Cook
contact info
James M. Ragain
Ragain Law Firm
contact info
Joseph Patrick Cook
Heenan & Cook
contact info


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/20 4:22 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal filed on February 14, 2024, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Complaint in this action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall pay their own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/20/2024. (ACC)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/20 11:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Justin Laughery, Heather Wilson-Laughery. (Cook, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal With Prejudice
12 12 order Order Setting - MT Tue 02/20 10:52 AM
TEXT Order Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Report is due to the Court by 2/27/2024. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/20/2024. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 12/22 9:15 AM
Terminate Deadlines as to11 Motions dll 12/19/23. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 10/23 8:26 AM
Terminate Deadlines as to11 Discovery ddl 10/20/23 (ACC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling Order - SDM Wed 01/04 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2024 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2024 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2023. Discovery due by 10/20/2023. Motions due by 12/19/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2024. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/4/2023. (MMS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
10 10 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Wed 12/28 3:54 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by New Sound Transportation, LLC. (Haffey, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
9 9 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Fri 12/23 11:37 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Justin Laughery, Heather Wilson-Laughery. (Cook, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT Fri 12/23 11:36 AM
STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Justin Laughery, Heather Wilson-Laughery. (Cook, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Joint Discovery Plan - SDM Fri 12/23 11:35 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Justin Laughery, Heather Wilson-Laughery. (Cook, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
6 6 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Mon 11/14 9:52 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/28/2022. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/28/2022. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/28/2022. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/14/2022. (TLO)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/11 2:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Sound Transportation, LLC. (Haffey, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/11 2:52 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by New Sound Transportation, LLC. (Haffey, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed - SDM Wed 08/10 10:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Heather Wilson-Laughery, Justin Laughery. New Sound Transportation, LLC waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Cook, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/17 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to New Sound Transportation, LLC. Counsel directed to download and print Summons for service. (KAH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Tue 05/17 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against New Sound Transportation, LLC, filed by Heather Wilson-Laughery, Justin Laughery. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 05/17 4:16 PM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-2872909 (KAH)
Related: [-]