Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:22-cv-01938
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:May 16, 2022
Terminated:Jun 23, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Nov 12, 2022 4:42 AM EST
Defendant
Extremely Clean Floor Services, Inc.
Represented By
Charles L. Bachman, Jr.
Gregory, Doyle, Calhoun & Rogers, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Southern Maintenance Services, Inc.
Represented By
Charles L. Bachman, Jr.
Gregory, Doyle, Calhoun & Rogers, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Roland
Represented By
Gordon Van Remmen
Hall & Lampros, LLP
contact info
Christopher Baker Hall
Hall & Lampros, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, June 23, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Thu 06/23 2:22 PM
ORDER granting7 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' settlement is approved, and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs except as otherwise stipulated between the parties pursuant to their agreement. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/23/2022. (ane)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion For Settlement Thu 06/23 12:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of FLSA Claims with Brief In Support by Jennifer Roland.(Van Remmen, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement and Release fully executed,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Van Remmen Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/23 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Bachman, Jr on behalf of Extremely Clean Floor Services, Inc., Southern Maintenance Services, Inc. (Bachman, Charles)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 06/23 2:29 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Tue 05/17 3:59 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/17/22. (ceo)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/17 1:05 PM
NOTICE by Jennifer Roland re1 Complaint, Filing of Corrected Civil Cover Sheet (Van Remmen, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 05/17 12:44 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Southern Maintenance Services, Inc. (tas)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 05/17 12:44 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Extremely Clean Floor Services, Inc. (tas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/17 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jennifer Roland. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11804769)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 5/17/2022 to edit file date(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration and Consent of Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet