New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 1:22-cv-00515
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 17, 2022
Terminated:Nov 14, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 13, 2022 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
Cassandra Anne Kazukenus, Esq.
Defendant
Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP
Plaintiff
Eric F. Wright
1038 Regent Street
Schenectady, NY 12309

GPO Jul 19 2022
ORDER and REPORT-RECOMMENDATION re 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright filed by Eric Wright, 4 Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Eric Wright. filed by Eric Wright, 1 Complaint filed by Eric Wright, 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright filed by Eric Wright. ORDERED that Plaintiffs amended application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. 6) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. 2) is DENIED as moot; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for ECF login and password (Dkt. No. 4) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to assign Plaintiff an ECF login and password; and it is further respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO REPLEAD Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) to the extent that it asserts claims pursuant to Title VII against Defendant MHM because they fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B); and it is further respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO REPLEAD Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) to the extent that it asserts claims pursuant to Title VII against Defendant Kazukenus because they fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B); and it is further respectfully ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order Report- Recommendation on Plaintiff, along with copies of the unpublished decisions cited herein in accordance with the Second Circuits decision in Lebron v. Sanders, 557 F.3d 76 (2d Cir. 2009) (per curiam). Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2022 Case Review Deadline 8/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/19/2022. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment - Case Law)(Copy served via regular mail)(khr)
GPO Apr 12 2023
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 7 Report and Recommendations: The Court hereby ORDERS that Magistrate Judge Lovric's Order and Report- Recommendation (Dkt. No. 7) is ADOPTED in its entirety for the reasons set forth herein; and the Court further ORDERS that the claims against Defendant Kazukenus are DISMISSED with prejudice; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Kazukenus is DISMISSED from this action; and the Court further ORDERS that the claims against Defendant MHM are DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to replead within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this Order; and the Court further ORDERS that if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of this Order, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case, without further order of this Court; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 04/12/2023. (Copy served via rCM/ECF NEF)(ban) Modified on 4/12/2023 - corrected service to reflect that the plaintiff was electronically notified (ban).
GPO Nov 14 2023
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 21) is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendant's favor and close this case; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum- Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 11/14/23. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(ban)
GPO May 23 2024
ORDER denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 5/23/2024. (Copy served via regular mail)(khr)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
38 38 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 04/03 1:06 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to36 Notice of Appeal filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that Appellant's requests for consolidation and recusal are DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it "lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact." It is further ORDERED that Appellant's request to file an oversized brief is DENIED as moot. (ham)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 04/03 1:04 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1722 for36 Notice of Appeal filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. (ham)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
37 37 appeal Electronic Notice and Certification to USCA of Appeal Tue 01/28 3:18 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION sent to US Court of Appeals re36 Amended Notice of Appeal. (ham)
Related: [-]
36 36 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 01/28 2:55 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to25 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and31 Order denying27 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. Modified on 1/28/2025 (ham)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Tue 01/28 3:17 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re36 Notice of Appeal: Clerk edited docket text in36 Amended Notice of Appeal to indicate both items being appealed. (ham)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
35 35 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 06/25 9:51 PM
TEXT ORDER denying as moot32 Letter request to appeal IFP. In a letter received on June 24, 2024, Plaintiff asks this Court permission to proceed on appeal IFP. Since this Court previously granted Plaintiff permission to proceed IFP and that permission was not revoked and his appeal was not certified to be without merit, Plaintiff does not need to again seek permission to proceed IFP for purposes of his appeal. Accordingly, Plaintiffs letter motion is denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 6/26/24. (ban) Modified on 6/25/2024 (ban)
Related: [-]
34 34 appeal Electronic Notice and Certification to USCA of Appeal Tue 06/25 2:10 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION sent to US Court of Appeals re33 Notice of Appeal. (ham)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Tue 06/25 12:42 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The Letter Motion at Docket #32 was corrected to reflect that it is a Motion for leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, and the Notice of Appeal attached to the motion for IFP was re-filed as a separate docket entry at Docket #33 using the correct event so that the Notice of electronic filing will be sent to the Court of Appeals. (lmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
33 33 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 06/25 12:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to31 Order denying #27 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. (lmw) (Notice of Appeal originally filed with Motion for IFP at Docket #32 and was refiled as its own docket entry for purposes of transmitting to Court of Appeals)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Letter Request/Motion Mon 06/24 11:48 PM
Letter Motion from Eric Wright for Eric F. Wright, Sr requesting IFP Notice of Appeal submitted to Judge Mae A D'Agostino .(Wright, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application
Monday, March 25, 2024
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/25 11:58 PM
ORDER denying27 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 5/23/2024. (Copy served via regular mail)(khr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Mon 02/26 1:47 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY. Per Management - Deleted Dkt. # 31 . Filed incorrectly in this case. Direct assigned a new case (#1:24-cv-275 MAD/ML) (khr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
30 30 5 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 01/02 11:43 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 MOTION for New Trial filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr.,28 MOTION to Amend/Correct27 MOTION for New Trial filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. MOTION Reconsideration of Memorandum-Decision Order dated November 14, 2023 filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. (Wright, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
29 29 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law Mon 12/18 2:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re27 Motion for New Trial,, Motion for Reconsideration, IN OPPOSITION filed by Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP.(Doherty, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
28 28 motion Amend/Correct Miscellaneous/Other Relief Tue 11/28 1:18 AM
EXHIBITS to27 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr., (Wright, Eric) Modified on 11/28/2023 (ban)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 11/28 11:34 AM
Judge D'Agostino's chambers will be handling Motion27 Motion for NEw Trial nad28 Motion to Amend/Correct27 . (jdc )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
27 27 motion New Trial Reconsideration Mon 11/27 11:59 PM
MOTION for New Trial filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr.(. Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/26/2023 ), MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2023 (Wright, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affirmation,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s),
Att: 4 Exhibit(s)
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
26 26 order Judgment Tue 11/14 7:09 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP against Eric F. Wright, Sr. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff) (ban)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Notice
25 25 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/14 6:59 PM
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 21) is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendant's favor and close this case; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum- Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 11/14/23. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(ban)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
24 24 1 pgs respm Response to Motion Wed 08/30 10:36 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP. Motion returnable before Judge Mae M. D'Agostino filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. (Wright, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
23 23 notice Notice - Other Tue 08/29 1:50 PM
NOTICE to pro se plaintiff: Response to re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is due by 9/18/2023. (khr)(Mailed copy to pro se plaintiff on 8/29/2023)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 08/29 8:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Motion to Dismiss21 , the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 10/24/2023 before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric and all conference related deadlines are all STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/29/2023. (Copy Served on Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail) (jdc )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
21 21 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/28 2:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP. Motion returnable before Judge Mae M. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 9/18/2023. Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/25/2023 (Doherty, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Statement of Material Facts,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 9 Notification of the Consequences of Failing to Respond,
Att: 10 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 11 Appendix Case Law
Thursday, July 13, 2023
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/13 9:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP. Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP waiver sent on 7/13/2023, answer due 9/11/2023. (Doherty, Glen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
notice Notice - Other Wed 06/28 7:59 AM
TEXT NOTICE : Initial Conference set for 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, in Person, at 15 Henry Street, 1st Floor Courtroom, Binghamton NY. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/17/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (Served on Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail) (jdp )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
19 19 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Tue 06/27 12:56 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/24/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/17/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued Tue 06/27 12:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP. (khr)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Tue 06/27 12:09 PM
TEXT ORDER directing the issuance of summons: The Clerk is hereby directed to issue summons and General Order 25 in this case as to defendant Martin, Harding, and Mazzotti. As counsel for defendant, Martin, Harding, and Mazzotti has already filed a notice of appearance in this case on 4/12/23 [Dkt. No. 10], counsel for the defendant should inform the Court if they will waive formal service of the Amended Complaint waiver/status report due by 7/14/23. The amended complaint [Dkt. No. 14] was filed in this case on 6/16/23. Counsel for the defendant received a copy of the amended complaint via notice of electronic filing on the same date. It is further ORDERED that the answer deadline is stayed pending the submission of a waiver of service or status report by the defendant, on or before 7/14/23. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 06/27/2023. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(ban)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 06/27 12:13 PM
***Answer due date terminated (ban)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
16 16 order Order on Letter Request Mon 06/26 11:01 AM
TEXT ORDER denying15 Letter Request, Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP: It is hereby ORDERED that the defendants request for the Court to reject the late filings of the plaintiffs amended complaint [Dkt. no. 14] and further requesting that the Court enter judgment in defendant's favor, is DENIED. The Plaintiffs amended complaint [Dkt. no. 14] is Accepted as filed. The defendant may file their answer, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before 7/11/23. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 06/26/2023. (ban)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
15 15 2 pgs motion Letter Request/Motion Tue 06/20 8:37 AM
Letter Motion from Glen P. Doherty, Esq. for Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP requesting Enter Judgment/Close Case submitted to Judge Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino . (Doherty, Glen)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
14 14 95 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/16 11:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr.(Wright, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Order on Letter Request Mon 05/15 8:26 AM
TEXT ORDER: Motion11 is GRANTED and Motion12 is DENIED, insofar as and to the extent that the deadline for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint pursuant to Order9 is extended to 6/12/2023. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 5/15/2023. (Copy served on Plaintiff via CM/ECF) (jdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
12 12 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 05/12 9:41 AM
Letter Motion from Glen Doherty, Esq. for Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP requesting Extension limited to Seven (7) Days submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino . (Doherty, Glen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to Amend Thu 05/11 1:57 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint filed by Eric F. Wright, Sr. Response to Motion due by 6/1/2023 Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Wright, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/12 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Glen P. Doherty on behalf of Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP (Doherty, Glen)
Related: [-]
9 9 5 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 04/12 2:34 PM
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re7 Report and Recommendations: The Court hereby ORDERS that Magistrate Judge Lovric's Order and Report- Recommendation (Dkt. No. 7) is ADOPTED in its entirety for the reasons set forth herein; and the Court further ORDERS that the claims against Defendant Kazukenus are DISMISSED with prejudice; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Kazukenus is DISMISSED from this action; and the Court further ORDERS that the claims against Defendant MHM are DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to replead within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this Order; and the Court further ORDERS that if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of this Order, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case, without further order of this Court; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 04/12/2023. (Copy served via rCM/ECF NEF)(ban) Modified on 4/12/2023 - corrected service to reflect that the plaintiff was electronically notified (ban)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/12 2:39 PM
Set Deadlines: Notice of Compliance Deadline 5/12/2023, Case Review Deadline 5/17/2023 (ban)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Wed 08/03 9:33 AM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY. Corrected Text to Dkt. No.8 to reflect Objections to Order on Report-Recommendation7 . Not an appeal to the Magistrate (khr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
8 8 motion Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court Tue 08/02 11:56 PM
First APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Eric F. Wright . Response to Motion due by 8/23/2022. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/30/2022 (Wright, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
7 7 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 07/19 8:41 AM
ORDER and REPORT-RECOMMENDATION re6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright filed by Eric Wright,4 Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Eric Wright. filed by Eric Wright,1 Complaint filed by Eric Wright,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright filed by Eric Wright. ORDERED that Plaintiffs amended application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. 6) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. 2) is DENIED as moot; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for ECF login and password (Dkt. No. 4) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to assign Plaintiff an ECF login and password; and it is further respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO REPLEAD Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) to the extent that it asserts claims pursuant to Title VII against Defendant MHM because they fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B); and it is further respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO REPLEAD Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) to the extent that it asserts claims pursuant to Title VII against Defendant Kazukenus because they fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B); and it is further respectfully ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order Report- Recommendation on Plaintiff, along with copies of the unpublished decisions cited herein in accordance with the Second Circuits decision in Lebron v. Sanders, 557 F.3d 76 (2d Cir. 2009) (per curiam). Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2022 Case Review Deadline 8/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/19/2022.(Copy served via regular mail)(khr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Case Law
Friday, July 08, 2022
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Fri 07/08 2:57 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Redacted copy of the Amended In Forma Pauperis has been uploaded and attached to Docket #6 . The unredacted copy of the In Forma Pauperis is now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 5.2 and NYND Local Rule 5.2 (khr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
misc Text Notice of Filing Deficiency Tue 07/05 8:17 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Eric Wright regarding the6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Pro Se Party has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2. This document has been temporarily restricted. Pro Se Party is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced document and forward the redacted document to the Clerks office within 7 days of this notice. Failure to file a redacted document by the deadline will result in the unredacted document referenced above being unrestricted. Pro Se Party is cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. The name of the children are listed on the document Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 7/11/2022 (khr)(Mailed copy to pro se plaintiff on 7/5/2022
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 07/05 8:15 AM
AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (khr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
5 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (khr)(Mailed copy to pro se plaintiff on 5/18/2022)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot (Text-Only) Wed 05/18 8:31 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (khr)(Mailed copy to pro se plaintiff on 5/18/2022)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
4 4 motion Pro Se Motion to Obtain ECF Login and Password Wed 05/18 8:30 AM
Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Eric Wright. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (khr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pro Se CM/ECF Registration Form
3 3 misc Pro Se Handbook and Notice Issued Wed 05/18 8:27 AM
PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained to Eric Wright at time complaint was filed on May 17, 2022. (khr)(Provided copies of documents, pro se hand book and local rules on 5/17/2022 to pro se plaintiff)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/18 8:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (khr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons as to Cassandra Anne Kazukenus,
Att: 2 Proposed summons as to Martin, Harding & Mazzotti
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/18 8:23 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cassandra Anne Kazukenus, Esq., Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP filed by Eric Wright.(khr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet