North Dakota District Court
Judge:Daniel L Hovland
Case #: 1:22-cv-00086
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 18, 2022
Terminated:Feb 15, 2024
Case in other court:Morton County Court, None assigned
Last checked: Monday Nov 14, 2022 3:27 AM CST
Defendant
AJ Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Courtney A. Presthus
Ebeltoft Sickler Lawyers PLLC
contact info
Joy Victoria Fears
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips
contact info
Byron A. Bowles, Jr
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Represented By
Courtney A. Presthus
Ebeltoft Sickler Lawyers PLLC
contact info
Joy Victoria Fears
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips
contact info
Byron A. Bowles, Jr
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Hashi Shire
Represented By
Courtney A. Presthus
Ebeltoft Sickler Lawyers PLLC
contact info
Joy Victoria Fears
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips
contact info
Byron A. Bowles, Jr
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Antonina Walden
Represented By
Jason Harmon
Lowe Law Group
contact info
Zachary Peter Lowe
Lowe Law Group
contact info
Eric Hinckley
Lowe Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Walden
Represented By
Jason Harmon
Lowe Law Group
contact info
Zachary Peter Lowe
Lowe Law Group
contact info
Eric Hinckley
Lowe Law Group
contact info

GPO Aug 10 2022
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
GPO Sep 07 2022
ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
GPO Sep 07 2022
ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
GPO Nov 18 2022
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
GPO Oct 10 2023
ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 12/28/2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Jury Trial REset for 1/8/2024 at 9:00 AM before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days). By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (FPT and Jury Trial previously set for 11/21/2023 and 12/04/2023) (BG)
GPO Nov 17 2023
ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (JO)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 15, 2024
83 83 1 pgs order Order Adopting Stipulation Thu 02/15 11:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting82 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.(JO)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/15 11:23 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
82 82 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/14 12:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Presthus, Courtney)
Related: [-]