Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:22-cv-01149
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause05:0702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 18, 2022
Terminated:Jul 29, 2022
Last checked: Monday Nov 14, 2022 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
Lloyd Austin, III
Represented By
Michael Patrick Clendenen
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amy Powell
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Rochelle Walensky
Represented By
Michael Patrick Clendenen
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amy Powell
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Christine Wormuth
Represented By
Michael Patrick Clendenen
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amy Powell
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Janet Woodcock
Represented By
Michael Patrick Clendenen
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amy Powell
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Frank Kendall
Represented By
Michael Patrick Clendenen
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amy Powell
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Del Toro
Represented By
Michael Patrick Clendenen
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amy Powell
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
Represented By
Michael Patrick Clendenen
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amy Powell
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Wine
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
David Calger
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerardo Rodriguez
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Parker Schnetz
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Shaffer
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Shour
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremiah Snyder
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
David Troyer
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Seth Weaver
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Randy Pogue
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Withers
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Barfield
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Wronski
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry Young
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Israel Alvarado
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Hirko
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Cox
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Brown
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacob Eastman
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Fussell
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathanael Gentilhomme
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Doyle Harris
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremiah Henderson
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Rick Pak
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Krista Ingram
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Jackson
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Walter Brobst
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Layfield
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
James Lee
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Brad Lewis
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Nelson
Represented By
J. Andrew Meyer
Finn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Arthur A. Schulcz
Law Office Of Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
contact info
Brandon Johnson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 04, 2022
utility Acknowledgment - Transferred Case Opened Thu 08/04 3:48 PM
Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Eastern District of Virginia - as case 1:22-cv-00876, filed 08/04/2022. (JNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Fri 07/29 4:40 PM
ENDORSED ORDER terminating 31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/29/2022. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
transfer District Transfer Out Fri 07/29 5:01 PM
CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Virginia. (AG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
49 49 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case Wed 07/27 4:33 PM
ORDER granting 46 unopposed Motion to Transfer Case and directing Clerk in accordance with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/27/2022. (CCB)
Related: [-]
48 48 respoth Brief - Defendant Wed 07/27 4:08 PM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF re45 Motion Hearing filed by Lloyd Austin, III, Xavier Becerra, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Rochelle Walensky, Janet Woodcock, Christine Wormuth. (Clendenen, Michael)
Related: [-]
47 47 respoth Brief - Plaintiff Wed 07/27 3:52 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re45 Motion Hearing filed by Israel Alvarado, Steven Barfield, Walter Brobst, Justin Brown, David Calger, Mark Cox, Jacob Eastman, Thomas Fussell, Nathanael Gentilhomme, Doyle Harris, Jeremiah Henderson, Andrew Hirko, Krista Ingram, Ryan Jackson, Joshua Layfield, James Lee, Brad Lewis, Robert Nelson, Rick Pak, Randy Pogue, Gerardo Rodriguez, Parker Schnetz, Richard Shaffer, Jonathan Shour, Jeremiah Snyder, David Troyer, Seth Weaver, Justin Wine, Thomas Withers, Matthew Wronski, Jerry Young. (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
46 46 motion Change Venue / Transfer Case Wed 07/27 11:03 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Virginia by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
45 45 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 07/25 11:28 AM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: MOTION HEARING held on 7/25/2022 re31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Israel Alvarado, Thomas Fussell, Jonathan Shour, Justin Brown, Thomas Withers, Parker Schnetz, Joshua Layfield, Nathanael Gentilhomme, Walter Brobst, Justin Wine, Jerry Young, James Lee, Rick Pak, Mark Cox, Brad Lewis, David Troyer, Richard Shaffer, Ryan Jackson, Matthew Wronski, Jacob Eastman, Andrew Hirko, Krista Ingram, Robert Nelson, Gerardo Rodriguez, David Calger, Seth Weaver, Jeremiah Henderson, Jeremiah Snyder, Doyle Harris, Randy Pogue, Steven Barfield. Court Reporter: Tracey Aurelio (CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
44 44 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/22 3:32 PM
NOTICE by Israel Alvarado, Steven Barfield, Walter Brobst, Justin Brown, David Calger, Mark Cox, Jacob Eastman, Thomas Fussell, Nathanael Gentilhomme, Doyle Harris, Jeremiah Henderson, Andrew Hirko, Krista Ingram, Ryan Jackson, Joshua Layfield, James Lee, Brad Lewis, Robert Nelson, Rick Pak, Randy Pogue, Gerardo Rodriguez, Parker Schnetz, Richard Shaffer, Jonathan Shour, Jeremiah Snyder, David Troyer, Seth Weaver, Justin Wine, Thomas Withers, Matthew Wronski, Jerry Young Errata to Reply Exhibit 6 (Schulcz, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
42 42 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 07/19 12:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 07/19 2:40 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants' response due 8/5/2022. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/19/2022. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 07/18 7:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Israel Alvarado, Steven Barfield, Walter Brobst, Justin Brown, David Calger, Mark Cox, Jacob Eastman, Thomas Fussell, Nathanael Gentilhomme, Doyle Harris, Jeremiah Henderson, Andrew Hirko, Krista Ingram, Ryan Jackson, Joshua Layfield, James Lee, Brad Lewis, Robert Nelson, Rick Pak, Randy Pogue, Gerardo Rodriguez, Parker Schnetz, Richard Shaffer, Jonathan Shour, Jeremiah Snyder, David Troyer, Seth Weaver, Justin Wine, Thomas Withers, Matthew Wronski, Jerry Young.(Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Affidavit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
notice Notice of hearing on motion Wed 07/13 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Rescheduled Hearing on31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (previously scheduled for 7/20/2022). Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2022 at 9:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Judge William F. Jung. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/12 10:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lloyd AustinIIIXavier BecerraCarlos Del ToroFrank KendallRochelle WalenskyJanet WoodcockChristine Wormuth.(ClendenenMichael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Table,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Maj. Scott Stanley,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Col. Tanya Rans,
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Colonel Kevin J. Mahoney, with attached Army Policies (Army),
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Admiral William Merz (Navy),
Att: 6 Exhibit Navy Policies with Index,
Att: 7 Exhibit Declaration of Lieutenant General David Furness (USMC),
Att: 8 Exhibit Marine Corps Policies,
Att: 9 Exhibit Declaration of Rear Admiral Eric Jones (USCG) and attached Coast Guard Policies,
Att: 10 Exhibit Declaration of Commander William P. Jones (Navy) re: Plaintiff Cox,
Att: 11 Exhibit AF COVID-19 Mandatory Vaccination Implementation Guidance,
Att: 12 Exhibit Declaration of Col. Artemio C. Chapa (AF),
Att: 13 Exhibit Declaration of Maj. Matthew Streett (AF),
Att: 14 Exhibit Declaration of Lt. Col. Nekitha Little (AF),
Att: 15 Exhibit Declaration of Lt. Col. Justin L. Long (AF),
Att: 16 Exhibit Declaration of Maj. Gen. Sharon R. Bannister (AF),
Att: 17 Exhibit Declaration of Col. Elizabeth Hernandez (AF),
Att: 18 Exhibit Declaration of Col. Ashley Heyen (AF),
Att: 19 Exhibit Declaration of Col. Maureen A. Farrell (AF),
Att: 20 Exhibit Dunn v. Austin, No. 22-cv-00288, Tr. (E.D. Cal. Feb. 22, 2022),
Att: 21 Exhibit Air Force Religious Freedom Training Course Description,
Att: 22 Exhibit Declaration of Lt. Col. Joshua J. Wolfram (AF) re: Plaintiffs Barfield, Fussell, Layfield, Ingram & Rodriguez,
Att: 23 Exhibit Barfield RAR Working File,
Att: 24 Exhibit Fussell RAR Working File,
Att: 25 Exhibit Layfield RAR Working File,
Att: 26 Exhibit Declaration of Maj. Gen. Jeffrey Pennington (AF) re: Plaintiff Brobst,
Att: 27 Exhibit Brobst RAR Working File,
Att: 28 Exhibit Declaration of Lt. Col. Shawn M. Schulz (AF) re: Plaintiff Henderson,
Att: 29 Exhibit Henderson RAR Working File,
Att: 30 Exhibit Declaration of Col. Daniel C. Diehl (AF) re: Plaintiff Jackson,
Att: 31 Exhibit Jackson RAR Working File,
Att: 32 Exhibit Declaration of Capt. Keith M. Donohue (USCG) re: Plaintiff Brown,
Att: 33 Exhibit Brown RAR Working File,
Att: 34 Exhibit Gentilhomme RAR Working File,
Att: 35 Exhibit Alvarado RAR Working File
38 38 notice Notice of appearance Tue 07/12 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Clendenen on behalf of Lloyd Austin, III, Xavier Becerra, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Rochelle Walensky, Janet Woodcock, Christine Wormuth (Clendenen, Michael)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice of appearance Tue 07/12 6:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Powell on behalf of Lloyd Austin, III, Xavier Becerra, Carlos Del Toro, Rochelle Walensky, Janet Woodcock, Christine Wormuth (Powell, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/01 9:23 PM
NOTICE by Israel Alvarado, Steven Barfield, Walter Brobst, Justin Brown, David Calger, Mark Cox, Jacob Eastman, Thomas Fussell, Nathanael Gentilhomme, Doyle Harris, Jeremiah Henderson, Andrew Hirko, Krista Ingram, Ryan Jackson, Joshua Layfield, James Lee, Brad Lewis, Robert Nelson, Rick Pak, Randy Pogue, Gerardo Rodriguez, Parker Schnetz, Richard Shaffer, Jonathan Shour, Jeremiah Snyder, David Troyer, Seth Weaver, Justin Wine, Thomas Withers, Matthew Wronski, Jerry Young Errata for Plaintiffs' PI(Schulcz, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 Corrected PI pages 44-46,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 PI with Corrected page nos
35 35 service Proof of service Fri 07/01 12:52 PM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 06/29 3:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Injunction , enlargement of time, 2 hrs & 34 minutes by All Plaintiffs. (Schulcz, Arthur)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 06/29 2:33 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs.(Schulcz, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1, Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 2016 NDAA,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3, 2018 NDAA,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex 4, Prop Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex 5 DoDI 1300.17,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex 6 Pls 533 injuries,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex 7 Pls Decls,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex 8 CDC emails,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex 9 Mandate as religion,
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of hearing on motion Wed 06/29 11:18 AM
NOTICE of hearing on31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2022 at 9:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Judge William F. Jung. (CCB)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 06/29 5:08 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 33 Motion. The Motion for preliminary injunction is deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/29/2022. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/28 3:50 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Set Briefing Schedule by All Plaintiffs. (Schulcz, Arthur)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Tue 06/28 8:57 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Motion to File Excess Pages: no more than 45 pages for the motion, 40 pages for the response, and 15 pages for the reply. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/28/2022. (CCB)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/28 5:40 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 29 Motion to set briefing schedule. Plaintiffs' motion is due 6/28/2022, Defendants' opposition is due 7/12/2022, and Plaintiffs' reply due 7/18/2022. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/28/2022. (CCB) Modified on 6/28/2022 (CCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
27 27 motion File Excess Pages Mon 06/27 10:46 PM
Joint MOTION to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Schulcz, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
26 26 service Proof of service Tue 06/07 10:03 AM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Proof of service Tue 06/07 10:02 AM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Proof of service Tue 06/07 10:02 AM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Proof of service Tue 06/07 10:01 AM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Proof of service Tue 06/07 10:01 AM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Proof of service Tue 06/07 10:00 AM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Proof of service Tue 06/07 9:59 AM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Proof of service Tue 06/07 9:59 AM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Proof of service Tue 06/07 9:58 AM
PROOF of service by Israel Alvarado (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/02 5:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Israel Alvarado, Steven Barfield, Walter Brobst, Justin Brown, David Calger, Mark Cox, Jacob Eastman, Thomas Fussell, Nathanael Gentilhomme, Doyle Harris, Jeremiah Henderson, Andrew Hirko, Krista Ingram, Ryan Jackson, Joshua Layfield, James Lee, Brad Lewis, Robert Nelson, Rick Pak, Randy Pogue, Gerardo Rodriguez, Parker Schnetz, Richard Shaffer, Jonathan Shour, Jeremiah Snyder, David Troyer, Seth Weaver, Justin Wine, Thomas Withers, Matthew Wronski, Jerry Young. (Meyer, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
16 16 3 pgs notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 05/31 4:42 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Israel Alvarado, Steven Barfield, Walter Brobst, Justin Brown, David Calger, Mark Cox, Jacob Eastman, Thomas Fussell, Nathanael Gentilhomme, Doyle Harris, Jeremiah Henderson, Andrew Hirko, Krista Ingram, Ryan Jackson, Joshua Layfield, James Lee, Brad Lewis, Robert Nelson, Rick Pak, Randy Pogue, Gerardo Rodriguez, Parker Schnetz, Richard Shaffer, Jonathan Shour, Jeremiah Snyder, David Troyer, Seth Weaver, Justin Wine, Thomas Withers, Matthew Wronski, Jerry Young. Related case(s): Yes (Schulcz, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
misc Pay Fee Thu 05/26 11:57 AM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19613952 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr., Esq.. (Meyer, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 05/25 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by J. Andrew Meyer on behalf of Doyle Harris, Andrew Hirko, Krista Ingram, Ryan Jackson, Joshua Layfield, James Lee, Brad Lewis, Robert Nelson, Rick Pak, Randy Pogue, Gerardo Rodriguez, Parker Schnetz, Richard Shaffer, Jonathan Shour, Jeremiah Snyder, David Troyer, Seth Weaver, Justin Wine, Thomas Withers, Matthew Wronski, Jerry Young. Lead Counsel: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.. (Meyer, J.)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 05/25 10:31 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 05/25 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/24 3:03 PM
ENDORSED ORDER re: Plaintiffs' 9 [Second] Motion for Special Admission as to Brandon Johnson, Esq. In light of the Court's Order granting Plaintiffs' [First] Motion for Special Admission as to Brandon Johnson, Esq. ( 8 ), this second such motion is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/24/2022. (WFM)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/24 3:03 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 8 [First] Motion for Special Admission as to Brandon Johnson, Esq. If counsel has not already done so, within fourteen (14) days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration (more information available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/24/2022. (WFM)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/24 12:57 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 7 Motion for Special Admission as to Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr., Esq. If counsel has not already done so, within fourteen (14) days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration (more information available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/24/2022. (WFM)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/24 10:02 AM
MOTION for Brandon Johnson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19603035 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/20 5:34 PM
MOTION for Brandon Johnson to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Meyer, J.)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/20 5:31 PM
MOTION for Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr. to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Meyer, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 05/19 3:48 PM
NOTICE to counsels Arthur A. Schulcz, Jr. and Brandon Johnson of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 05/19 3:47 PM
NOTICE to Counsels of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued as to USA Thu 05/19 3:38 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Lloyd Austin, III, Xavier Becerra, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Rochelle Walensky, Janet Woodcock, Christine Wormuth, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BD)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed summons Thu 05/19 1:23 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Israel Alvarado, Steven Barfield, Walter Brobst, Justin Brown, David Calger, Mark Cox, Jacob Eastman, Thomas Fussell, Nathanael Gentilhomme, Doyle Harris, Jeremiah Henderson, Andrew Hirko, Krista Ingram, Ryan Jackson, Joshua Layfield, James Lee, Brad Lewis, Robert Nelson, Rick Pak, Randy Pogue, Gerardo Rodriguez, Parker Schnetz, Richard Shaffer, Jonathan Shour, Jeremiah Snyder, David Troyer, Seth Weaver, Justin Wine, Thomas Withers, Matthew Wronski, Jerry Young. (Meyer, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/19 8:19 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:22-cv-1149-WFJ-CPT. (SJB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
1 1 126 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/18 6:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number BFLMDC-19586535) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Meyer, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 2),
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 2),
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8