New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:22-cv-02879
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 16, 2022
Terminated:May 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 12, 2022 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
CAROL BERLEN
Represented By
JOHN T. BAZZURRO
Law Offices Of John T. Bazzurro, LLC
contact info
Defendant
STEVEN BORACCHIA
Represented By
JOHN T. BAZZURRO
Law Offices Of John T. Bazzurro, LLC
contact info
Defendant
BOROUGH OF ATLANTIC HIGHLANDS
Represented By
JOHN T. BAZZURRO
Law Offices Of John T. Bazzurro, LLC
contact info
Defendant
JAMES BUTLER
Represented By
JOHN L. BONELLO
contact info
Defendant
MARTHA DIAZ-VERSON
Represented By
JOHN L. BONELLO
contact info
Defendant
ADAM HUBENY
Represented By
JOHN T. BAZZURRO
Law Offices Of John T. Bazzurro, LLC
contact info
Defendant
RICHARD LEAHEY
Represented By
JOHN L. BONELLO
contact info
Defendant
SCOTT REINHART
Represented By
CHARLES JOHN ULIANO
Chamlin, Rosen, Uliano & Witherington, PC
contact info
Defendant
DAVID ROSSBACH
Represented By
CHARLES JOHN ULIANO
Chamlin, Rosen, Uliano & Witherington, PC
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS STONE
Represented By
CHARLES JOHN ULIANO
Chamlin, Rosen, Uliano & Witherington, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GEORGE S RUSH
56 SECOND AVENUE
ATLANTIC HIGHLANDS, NJ 07716


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, May 25, 2023
37 37 order Stipulation and Order Thu 05/25 4:31 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 5/25/2023. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/24 3:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by GEORGE S RUSH. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jal, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LETTER
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
35 35 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Wed 05/17 11:49 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/17/2023. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 5/17/23. (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
34 34 misc Letter Wed 05/17 11:31 AM
Letter to Judge Singh from GEORGE S RUSH. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
33 33 misc Letter Fri 04/21 4:41 PM
Letter from Charles Uliano, Esq.. (ULIANO, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Order Fri 04/21 12:59 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF by no later than 5/19/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 4/21/2023. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
31 31 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/05 8:26 AM
ORDER granting the deadline for Defendant's Borough of Atlantic Highlands, Adam Hubeny, Steven Boracchia, and Carol Berlen to file a Motion for a Protective Order until 4/18/2023. The request by Defendant's Martha Diaz-Verson, Richard Leahey, and James Butler for an extension of time to respond to outstanding discovery requests from Plaintiff George S. Rush is hereby Granted, responses to those discovery requests by no later than 5/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 4/5/2023. (kht, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
30 30 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 04/04 4:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 4/4/2023. Order to be entered. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
29 29 misc Letter Mon 04/03 2:52 PM
Letter from John Bazzurro, Esq. forwarding Joint Status letter. (BAZZURRO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
28 28 misc Letter Fri 03/24 3:45 PM
Letter to Judge Singh from GEORGE S. RUSH. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
27 27 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/01 4:37 PM
LETTER ORDER granting request for extension of time to file Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/1/2023. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
26 26 misc Letter Fri 02/24 1:30 PM
Letter from John Bazzurro, Esq. requesting extension of time to file Motion. (BAZZURRO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/15 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by GEORGE S. RUSH. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
24 24 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Fri 01/06 12:53 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 1/5/2023. (jdg, )
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/06 10:07 AM
ORDER that, to the extent the parties seek competing terms in the Discovery Confidentiality Order to govern this matter, those requests are Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 1/5/2023. (jdg)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 01/06 9:51 AM
ORDER granting defendants leave to file a motion for a Protective Order by 2/24/2023; Telephone Status Conference set for 4/4/2023 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 1/5/2023. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
21 21 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 01/05 4:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held regarding discovery on 1/5/2023. Order to be entered. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
20 20 misc Letter Wed 01/04 11:55 AM
Letter from John Bazzurro, Esq. supplementing Plaintiff's status update to Judge Singh. (BAZZURRO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
19 19 misc Letter Tue 01/03 2:50 PM
Letter to Judge Singh with status update for the court from GEORGE S. RUSH. Related [+] (mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
Friday, December 23, 2022
18 18 misc Letter Fri 12/23 3:34 PM
Letter to Judge Singh regarding discovery issues from GEORGE S. RUSH. Related [+] (mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/04 1:46 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be with leave of Court and filed no later than 1/3/2023. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 3/31/2023. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/4/2022. (jal, )
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 10/04 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Initial Pretrial Conference via zoom held on 10/4/2022. (mm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/29 2:24 PM
LETTER ORDER granting request to have the 10/4/2022 rule 16 conference be held via Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 9/29/2022. (jal, )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Thu 09/29 10:04 AM
Letter from John Bazzurro, Esq. regarding request for virtual hearing. (BAZZURRO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
13 13 misc Letter Thu 09/08 3:53 PM
Letter to the court withdrawing his request for default from GEORGE S RUSH. (jal, )
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Thu 09/08 10:37 AM
Letter from John Bazzurro, Esq. regarding Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default. (BAZZURRO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
qc QC - Improper Default Request Wed 09/07 10:11 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Default submitted by GEORGE S. RUSH on 9/6/2022 cannot be granted as requested because the named defendants have responded to the complaint. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
11 11 misc Request for Default Wed 09/07 9:30 AM
Request for Default by GEORGE S RUSH against Borough of Atlantic Highlands, Adam Hubeny, Martha Diaz-Verson, Richard Leahey, Steven Boracchia, Carol Berlen and James Butler.(jal, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Cover letter,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Envelope
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/03 9:29 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CAROL BERLEN, STEVEN BORACCHIA, BOROUGH OF ATLANTIC HIGHLANDS, ADAM HUBENY.(BAZZURRO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/26 3:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JAMES BUTLER, MARTHA DIAZ-VERSON, RICHARD LEAHEY.(BONELLO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
8 8 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 07/15 9:58 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/14/2022. (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/14 11:11 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SCOTT REINHART, DAVID ROSSBACH, THOMAS STONE.(ULIANO, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/14 10:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond K. Dash STEVEN BORACCHIA served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; BOROUGH OF ATLANTIC HIGHLANDS served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; JAMES BUTLER served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; MARTHA DIAZ-VERSON served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; RICHARD LEAHEY served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; SCOTT REINHART served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (jal, )
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/14 10:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond K. Dash. ADAM HUBENY served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022; DAVID ROSSBACH served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022; THOMAS STONE served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022. (jal, )
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Thu 07/14 9:59 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Raymond K. Dash as to CAROL BERLEN. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/06 10:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Non-Prisoner Pro Se Filers Wed 05/18 11:43 AM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (kht, ) Modified on 5/18/2022 (kht, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 05/18 8:52 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAROL BERLEN, STEVEN BORACCHIA, BOROUGH OF ATLANTIC HIGHLANDS, JAMES BUTLER, MARTHA DIAZ-VERSON, ADAM HUBENY, RICHARD LEAHEY, SCOTT REINHART, DAVID ROSSBACH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/18 8:48 AM
COMPLAINT against CAROL BERLEN, STEVEN BORACCHIA, BOROUGH OF ATLANTIC HIGHLANDS, JAMES BUTLER, MARTHA DIAZ-VERSON, ADAM HUBENY, RICHARD LEAHEY, SCOTT REINHART, DAVID ROSSBACH ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number TRE126568) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEORGE S RUSH.(kht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 1 pgs Letter,
Att: 3 Receipt,
Att: 4 Envelope