Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:22-cv-00490
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 19, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 15, 2022 2:44 AM CST
Defendant
DCOMM, Inc.
Represented By
Alicia R. Duleba
Jackson, Walker, LLP
contact info
Lionel M. Schooler
Jackson Walker, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ricardo Maisonet Mendez
Represented By
William Clifton Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Alan Clifton Gordon
contact info
Carter T. Hastings
contact info
Austin W. Anderson
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Lauren E. Braddy
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Burns
Represented By
William Clifton Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Carter T. Hastings
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
46 46 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/28 11:55 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
45 45 misc Proposed Order Tue 02/27 1:09 PM
Proposed Order to43 Stipulation of Dismissal by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
44 44 notice Notice Tue 02/06 4:31 PM
NOTICE Joint Request for Status Conference by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez re43 Stipulation of Dismissal (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
43 43 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/07 8:46 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
42 42 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 09/22 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Neema Amini (Amini, Neema)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
41 41 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 09/13 8:27 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
40 40 notice Notice of Filing Fri 09/08 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Hakeem Guidry
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/05 9:27 AM
Text Order GRANTING39 Joint Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that, in light of the parties' ongoing discussions, the deadline to send notice shall be September 8, 2023. Pursuant to the parties' agreement, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the statute of limitations shall continue to be tolled for all persons who become members of any putative class or collective from January 9, 2023, until September 8, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
39 39 misc Status Report Fri 08/25 3:44 PM
STATUS REPORT by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
38 38 misc Status Report Fri 08/04 5:33 PM
STATUS REPORT by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
37 37 misc Status Report Thu 06/01 3:15 PM
STATUS REPORT by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
36 36 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 05/12 1:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Docket II - Austin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
35 35 3 pgs misc Status Report Wed 04/26 2:34 PM
STATUS REPORT by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
34 34 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/20 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily R. Linn on behalf of DCOMM, Inc.. Attorney Emily R. Linn added to party DCOMM, Inc.(pty:dft) (Linn, Emily)
Related: [-]
33 33 3 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/20 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly R. Miers on behalf of DCOMM, Inc.. Attorney Kimberly R. Miers added to party DCOMM, Inc.(pty:dft) (Miers, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
32 32 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/20 4:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING30 Stipulation filed by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
31 31 misc Proposed Order Wed 03/15 12:32 PM
Proposed Order to30 Stipulation by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
30 30 misc Stipulation Tue 03/14 10:05 AM
STIPULATION Regarding Certification and Notice by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit Proposed Notice and Consent Form
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
29 29 2 pgs misc Status Report Wed 02/15 12:02 PM
STATUS REPORT by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
28 28 misc Status Report Wed 02/08 9:16 PM
STATUS REPORT by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 02/06 3:43 PM
ORDER GRANTING26 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to JARED A. GREATHOUSE and withdrawing Lionel M. Schooler, Michael Drab, and Alicia Duleba. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
26 26 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 02/02 12:13 PM
Agreed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by DCOMM, Inc..(McKinney, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
25 25 misc Status Report Wed 02/01 5:00 PM
STATUS REPORT by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
24 24 order Status Report Order Mon 01/23 2:33 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER, due by 2/1/2023. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Case Mon 11/07 12:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING22 Joint MOTION to Stay Case and Stipulation Regarding Tolling of the Statute of Limitations. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
22 22 motion Stay Case Thu 11/03 5:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case and Stipulation Regarding Tolling of the Statute of Limitations by Anthony Burns.(Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Filing Tue 10/18 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join of Isaiah Zertuche
Thursday, October 06, 2022
20 20 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 10/06 3:42 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by DCOMM, Inc.. (Duleba, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
19 19 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 10/05 7:59 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Anthony Burns, Ricardo Maisonet Mendez.(Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated August 23, 2022,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated August 30, 2022,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 2, 2022,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 2, 2022,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 12, 2022,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 19, 2022,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 20, 2022,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 21, 2022,
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 22, 2022,
Att: 10 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 22, 2022,
Att: 11 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 26, 2022,
Att: 12 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated September 27, 2022,
Att: 13 2 pgs Exhibit Email dated October 4, 2022
Monday, October 03, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Filing Mon 10/03 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Filing Consent of Francisco J. Zuniga by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez(Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Consent of Francisco J. Zuniga
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Wed 09/14 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Andrew Ball
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
16 16 notice Notice Tue 08/16 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Benjamin Fisher
Monday, August 15, 2022
15 15 notice Notice Mon 08/15 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Michael Blanchard
Friday, August 12, 2022
14 14 notice Notice Fri 08/12 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Frank Neal
Thursday, August 11, 2022
13 13 notice Notice Thu 08/11 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Michael Koleff-Brady,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent of Brandon Stiles,
Att: 3 Exhibit Consent of Chike Obi,
Att: 4 Exhibit Consent of Ray Sanchez,
Att: 5 Exhibit Consent of Darnell Williams
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 08/03 6:03 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint by DCOMM, Inc..(Duleba, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 07/22 10:30 AM
ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/13 9:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DCOMM, Inc. amending, filed by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez, Anthony Burns.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
9 9 motion Dismiss Wed 06/29 3:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by DCOMM, Inc.. (Duleba, Alicia)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/29 3:19 PM
Defendant DCOMM, Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint by DCOMM, Inc..(Duleba, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/24 2:56 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/23 4:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DCOMM, Inc..(Duleba, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Thu 06/23 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Anthony Burns,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent of Marion Mercado Torres
Thursday, June 02, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/02 4:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. DCOMM, Inc. served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/20 9:03 AM
Summons Issued as to DCOMM, Inc.. (dl)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/19 1:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/19 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16051741), filed by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Ricardo M. Mendez,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/20 9:02 AM
Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Fri 05/20 9:02 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (dl)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Fri 05/20 9:03 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ricardo Maisonet Mendez. (dl)
Related: [-]