Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Matthew W Mcfarland
Case #: 1:22-cv-00272
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 19, 2022
Re-opened:Mar 28, 2024
Terminated:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 15, 2022 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
Miami University
501 East High St.
Oxford, OH 45056
Represented By
Alessandro Botta Blondet
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Patricia Anderson Pryor
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Setser
6195 Fairfield Rd., Unit # 17
Oxford, OH 45056
Represented By
Marc D. Mezibov
Mezibov Butler
contact info
Marc David Mezibov
Mezibov Butler
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/09 11:30 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Katherine Setser. (Mezibov, Marc)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 05/09 2:32 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per19 Stipulation of Dismissal. (kev)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 02/24 11:49 AM
NOTATION ORDER: For good cause, the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Doc.18 ) is GRANTED. The Calendar Order (Doc.6 ) is AMENDED as follows: Discovery due by April 16, 2025. Dispositive motions due by June 16, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 02/24/2025. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/13 2:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 4/16/2025. by Plaintiff Katherine Setser. (Mezibov, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
17 17 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/01 9:43 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to15 Complaint Supplemental filed by Miami University. (Pryor, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines Fri 09/27 10:07 AM
CALENDAR ORDER: For good cause, Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Doc.16 ) is GRANTED. The Calendar Order (Doc.6 ) is AMENDED as follows: Discovery due by February 16, 2025. Dispositive motions due by April 16, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 09/27/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 09/25 10:35 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 2/16/2025. by Plaintiff Katherine Setser. (Mezibov, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
15 15 12 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/17 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Miami University, filed by Katherine Setser. (Mezibov, Marc)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 09/17 3:02 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENT AL COMPLAINT (Doc.13 ): Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint (Doc.13 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff SHALL FILE her first Supplemental Complaint within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 09/17/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
13 13 4 pgs motion Leave to File Document Thu 05/23 4:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to File to File Supplemental Complaint by Plaintiff Katherine Setser. (Pomeranz, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Supplemental Complaint
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/23 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Amaya Pomeranz for Plaintiff Katherine Setser (Pomeranz, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 04/15 10:17 AM
NOTATION ORDER: This matter is before is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Proposed Calendar Order (Doc.11 ). The Court hereby SETS the following deadlines: Discovery Deadline: 10/16/2024; Dispositive Motion Deadline: 12/12/2024. The Court will schedule the final pretrial conference and jury trial if necessary after resolution of dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 04/15/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 04/11 12:47 PM
STIPULATION Proposed Calendar Order by Defendant Miami University. (Pryor, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Thu 03/28 9:27 AM
NOTATION ORDER: This Matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen. Because the conditions of the Court's Dismissal Order were not met, the Motion (Doc.10 ) is GRANTED, and the case is hereby REOPENED. The parties are directed to submit a proposed calendar order within 14 days of the entry of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 03/28/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
10 10 2 pgs motion Reopen Case Wed 02/28 11:30 AM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Plaintiff Katherine Setser. (Mezibov, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/14 3:21 PM
CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/14/2023. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
8 8 16 pgs order Order Wed 10/18 2:55 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 10/18/2023. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 08/17 10:34 AM
AMENDED CALENDAR ORDER: For good cause, the Court GRANTS the7 joint motion to amend the calendar order. The Court VACATES the remaining deadlines in the Calendar Order and SETS the following amended deadlines: Discovery deadline: October 31, 2023; Dispositive motion deadline: December 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 08/17/2023. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Mon 08/07 2:08 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Preliminary Pretrial Order,, by Defendant Miami University. (Pryor, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
6 6 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Tue 10/25 4:00 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 11/15/2022. Motions to amend pleadings/add parties due by 12/9/2022. Settlement Demand due by 12/9/2022. Response to Settlement Demand due by 1/11/2023. Motions related to pleadings due by 1/11/2023. Plaintiff's Experts due by 3/15/2023. Defendant's Experts due by 5/15/2023. Rebuttal Experts due by 6/15/2023. Non-Expert (Fact) Witnesses due by 7/14/2023. Discovery due by 8/14/2023. Dispositive motions due by 10/20/2023. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 10/25/2022. (kaf)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 10/25 3:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Matthew W. McFarland: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/25/2022. Present by phone were Attorney Marc Mezibov, counsel for Plaintiff, and Attorney Alessandro Botta Blondet, counsel for Defendant. The Court discussed the status of the case with counsel. Calendar Order to follow. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
5 5 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 10/07 10:21 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT (Joint) by Defendant Miami University. (Pryor, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/26 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandro Botta Blondet for Defendant Miami University (Botta Blondet, Alessandro)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
3 3 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/18 2:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Miami University. (Pryor, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 07/01 3:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Miami University on 5/19/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Mezibov, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/19 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8872142), filed by Katherine Setser. (Mezibov, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Docket Annotation Thu 05/19 4:24 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kl)
Related: [-]