California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Sheila K Oberto
Case #: 1:22-cv-00593
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 18, 2022
Terminated:Jul 15, 2022
Case in other court:Tulare County Superior Court, VCU287299
Last checked: Monday Nov 14, 2022 1:32 AM PST
Defendant
Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.
a California corporation 9370 Road 234
Terra Bella, CA 93270
Represented By
Ryan William Porte
Mccormick Barstow LLP
contact info
James Daniel Miller
Raimondo | Miller, Alc
contact info
Kevin Barnes Piercy
Raimondo | Miller, Alc
contact info
Anthony Peter Raimondo
Raimondo Miller A Law Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Hester
Represented By
Brittany Lyn Shaw
Lawyers For Justice, PC
contact info
Edwin Aiwazian
Lawyers For Justice, PC
contact info
Tara Zabehi
Lawyers For Justice PC
contact info
Travis Joseph Maher
Lawyers For Justice, PC
contact info

GPO Jul 15 2022
ORDER Remanding Case to State Court, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/15/2022. CASE CLOSED. Certified copy of remand order sent to Tulare County Superior Court. (Maldonado, C)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, July 15, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Remanded Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 07/15 9:53 AM
ORDER Remanding Case to State Court, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/15/2022. CASE CLOSED. Certified copy of remand order sent to Tulare County Superior Court. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation Fri 07/15 8:57 AM
STIPULATION To Remand Case to State Court by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc..(Raimondo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Remand Case to State Court,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Friday, July 01, 2022
order Minute Order Fri 07/01 12:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The Court is presently engaged in a highly-complex, 6-8 week criminal jury trial. Nonetheless, the Court has preliminarily examined the papers filed thus far in connection with the pending motions to remand7 11 , to compel arbitration and stay8 9 , and for administrative relief12 13 . Although the Court expresses no opinion on the merits of the pending motions at this time, two things suggest informal resolution of this matter among the parties may save considerable time and resources for all involved: (1) the Supreme Court's recent decision in Viking River Cruises, Inc. v. Moriana , 142 S. Ct. 1906 (2022); and (2) the fact that this Court must first resolve whether it has jurisdiction over this case before addressing any substantive motions (such as a motion to compel arbitration). Although the parties appear to have been in communication about the pending motions, it is unclear whether a meaningful and earnest meet-and-confer has yet taken place. Therefore, within fourteen days of the date of this minute order, the parties are directed to meet and confer as to all of the pending motions. In an effort to provide some breathing room for that process to take place, all deadlines in this case are likewise continued by fourteen days. The parties are reminded once again that pursuant to the undersigned's standing order2 -1, all civil motions will be decided on the papers without oral argument signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on July 1, 2022. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/30 4:21 PM
AMENDED MOTION re12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Raimondo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 06/29 3:03 PM
MOTION Alternative Briefing Schedule by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Raimondo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of James D. Miller In Support of Motion for Administrative Relief of Defendant for Alternative Briefing Schedule,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Administrative Relief of Defendant for Alternative Briefing Schedule,
Att: 3 Proof of Service for Notice and Motion, Declaration, and Proposed Order
11 11 motion Remand Wed 06/29 11:39 AM
AMENDED MOTION to REMAND amending7 Motion to Remand, by Justin Hester. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Shaw, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
order Minute Order Fri 06/24 4:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to the undersigned's standing order and Local Rule 230(g), the recently filed motion to remand; motion to compel arbitration; motion to stay7 8 9 will be decided on the papers. No hearing will be calendared. Local Rule 230, as revised March 1, 2022, will govern the filing of oppositions and replies. The parties are further informed that as a result of the judicial resource emergency described in this Court's standing order re judicial emergency, more than 80 motions remain under submission in the caseload recently re-assigned to the undersigned. Although the Court has begun the process of working through this significant backlog, it may still be many months until the motion in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that magistrate judge consent may alleviate some of the delays caused by the resource emergency signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on June 24, 2022. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
9 9 motion Compel Thu 06/23 10:20 AM
AMENDED MOTION to COMPEL amending8 Motion to Compel,, Arbitration and to Stay This Action by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Raimondo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service for Amended notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay This Action
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
8 8 motion Compel Tue 06/21 12:06 PM
MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and to Stay this Action by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Raimondo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 3 Declaration JDM Declaration iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 4 Declaration Janice Fowler Declaration iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 6 Proof of Service Proof of Service of All Related Documents iso Motion
Friday, June 17, 2022
7 7 motion Remand Fri 06/17 5:00 PM
MOTION to REMAND by Justin Hester. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Shaw, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Of Brittany L. Shaw In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, May 23, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/23 5:16 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Travis Joseph Maher on behalf of Justin Hester. Attorney Maher, Travis Joseph added. (Maher, Travis)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/23 4:05 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Brittany Lyn Shaw on behalf of Justin Hester. Attorney Shaw, Brittany Lyn added. (Shaw, Brittany)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/23 3:20 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tara Zabehi on behalf of Justin Hester. Attorney Zabehi, Tara added. (Zabehi, Tara)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Related Case Mon 05/23 3:13 PM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:19-cv-00959-JLT by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.. (Raimondo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for JLT Thu 05/19 11:34 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2022 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Jessen, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number VCU287299 by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10238238)(Raimondo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet for Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Kevin B. Piercy iso Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Lee Cohen iso Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Certificate of Record Certification of Interested Entities or Persons