Donovan v. General Motors, LLC
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:14-md-02543
Lead case: 1:14-md-02543
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-04142 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332mv Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 20, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 16, 2022 4:18 AM EST |
Defendant
General Motors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Andrew Donovan
Terminated: 11/09/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff, ANDREW DONOVAN, by and through his undersigned counsel, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Confidential Master Settlement Agreement entered into by the parties, hereby gives notice of the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of all of Plaintiff's actions, claims, and causes of actions against General Motors LLC and all other Defendants. Court approval was not required for this Plaintiff. Costs taxed as paid. General Motors LLC has no objection and consents to the dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiff's action. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this in 14-MD-2543 and 22-CV-4142, The Clerk is further directed to terminate Andrew Donovan as Plaintiff in 14-MD-2543 and 22-CV-4142. SO ORDERED., (Andrew Donovan terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/9/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF (yv) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice. Document filed by Andrew Donovan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF.(Willis, Matthew) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL... It is ORDERED that 22-CV-4142 be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within sixty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, requests to extend the deadline to reopen are unlikely to be granted. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 5.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close 22-CV-4142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/14/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF (yv) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wendy L. Bloom dated October 6, 2022 re: Donovan Status Update. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF.(Bloom, Wendy) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8773 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 12 in 1:22-cv-04142-JMF) Letter filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to return the executed settlement papers to counsel for Defendant on or before October 6, 2022. The Clerk of Court shall docket this Order in 14-MD-2543 and 22-CV-4142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/7/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF (kv) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wendy L. Bloom dated September 6, 2022 re: Donovan Status Update. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF.(Bloom, Wendy) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (10 in 1:22-cv-04142-JMF, 8767 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF) Letter : Donovan Status Update filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to file a joint status update by September 6, 2022. The Clerk of Court shall docket this Order in 14-MD-2543 and 22-CV-4142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/23/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF (yv) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wendy L. Bloom dated August 22, 2022 re: Donovan Status Update. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF.(Bloom, Wendy) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8 in 1:22-cv-04142-JMF, 8762 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF) Letter filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to file a joint status update by August 22, 2022. The Clerk of Court shall docket this Order in Case Nos. 14-MD-02543 and 22-CV-4142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/10/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF (ate) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wendy L. Bloom dated August 9, 2022 re: Donovan Status Update. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF.(Bloom, Wendy) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8755 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 6 in 1:22-cv-04142-JMF) Letter Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff A. Donovan filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT : Application GRANTED. By August 9, 2022, the parties shall file a status update. The Clerk of Court shall docket this Order in Case Nos. 14-MD-02543 and 22-CV-4142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/9/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF (yv) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wendy L. Bloom dated June 8, 2022 re: Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff A. Donovan. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF.(Bloom, Wendy) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8748 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 4 in 1:22-cv-04142-JMF) Letter Proposed Next Steps in Donovan v. General Motors LLC, filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT : Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 6/10/2022., Responses due by 7/25/2022, Replies due by 8/24/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/24/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF (yv) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wendy L. Bloom dated May 24, 2022 re: Proposed Next Steps in Donovan v. General Motors LLC. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF.(Bloom, Wendy) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER: This case has been severed from Adesanya v. General Motors LLC et al., 16-CV-925. By May 31, 2022, the parties shall confer and file a joint letter proposing next steps in this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/23/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:22-cv-04142-JMF (kv) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() COMPLAINT - (ORIGINAL FILED IN CASE 16-CV-925 DOCUMENT #60) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 59 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, against General Motors, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Ashley Melche , Cody Hummel, Gwen Anthony, LaDonna Baile, Sharon Davi, Khadija Ahma, Roberto Sanz, Anise Collins, Sherry Alvey, Anthony Markle, Gloria Adesanya, Yamilet Padilla, Alesha Savoy, Chantel Roger, Genita McKnight, Reginald Derrickson, Janelle Vanschuyve, Jaunee Snear, Jerome Howard, Crystal Perkins, Robert Bailey, Carolyn Boyd, Carolyn boy, Richard A Smith, Ajmal Razaq, Patrice Perry, Marty Vanschuyve, Tosha Murphy, James R. Moore, Kaii Almeida-Falcones, Martha Jean-Claude, Jonathan Howard, Sharla Williams, Craig Dempsey, Kimberly Pittman, Ruby McClain, Ronisha Doty, Jessica Pawlicki, Felisa Long, Ladonna Bailey(As a Representative of the Estate of Kirkline Nolan), Richard Gonzalez, Maranda Ray, Janelle Vanschuyver(As a representative of the Estate of Mackenzie Vanschuyver), Daniel Green, Brielle Rigilano, Andrew Donovan, Bridget Hayes, Michael Simpson, Sharon Davis(as a Representative of the Estate of Tajanae Davis), Justin Knight, Khadija Ahmad(As representative of the estate of Qadir Ahmad), Laigin Perez, Andrew Gayer, Diane London, Marty Vanschuyver(As a representative of the Estate of Mackenzie Vanschuyver), Ashley Melcher, Allen Boetke, Robert Baile, Mark Anderson, Bridgette Jones, Oscar Salina. Related document: 59 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by Daniel Green, Sherry Alvey, Richard Gonzalez, Allen Boetke, Roberto Sanz, Anthony Markle, Crystal Perkins, Carolyn Boyd, LaDonna Bailey, Chantel Roger, Kaii Almeida-Falcones, Jonathan Howard, Kimberly Pittman, Jessica Pawlicki, Alesha Savoy, Brielle Rigilano, Marty Vanschuyver, Reginald Derrickson, Craig Dempsey, Robert Bailey, Janelle Vanschuyver, Cody Hummel, Justin Knight, Khadija Ahmad, Sharla Williams, Felisa Long, Patrice Perry, Gloria Adesanya, Michael Simpson, Anise Collins, Martha Jean-Claude, Richard A Smith, Laigin Perez, Jerome Howard, Andrew Gayer, Jaunee Snear, Yamilet Padilla, Ronisha Doty, Bridget Hayes, Ashley Melcher, Tosha Murphy, Ruby McClain, Bridgette Jones, Genita McKnight, Sharon Davis, Andrew Donovan, Mark Anderson, Ladonna Bailey, Ajmal Razaq, Carolyn boyd, Oscar Salina, Maranda Ray, James R. Moore, Gwen Anthony, Diane London.(Willis, Matthew).(gp) |
|
1 | 1
![]() (ORIGINAL DOCUMENT FILED IN CASE 1:16-CV-925 DOCUMENT #263) ORDER granting (8745) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-md-02543-JMF; granting (262) Motion to Sever in case 1:16-cv-00925-JMF. The Court, having read the Motion, is of the opinion that the Motion is meritorious, and should be GRANTED in its entirety. It is therefore, ORDERED, that Plaintiff Andrew Donovans Motion to Sever is hereby GRANTED, and Plaintiff Andrew Donovans cause of action is hereby severed out of Case No. 16-CV-00925. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Andrew Donovan as Plaintiff in 16-CV-00925 and to open a new case with this Order and the Complaint docket at ECF No. 60 in 16-CV-00925, captioned: Andrew Donovan, Plaintiff, v. General Motors, LLC, Defendant. The newly opened case shall be treated as a member case of 14-MD-2543. SIGNED., (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/19/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:16-cv-00925-JMF (yv). (gp) |
|
utility
Case Designation
Fri 05/20 12:26 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 05/20 12:27 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp) |
||
utility
Case Consolidation - Member
Fri 05/20 12:28 PM
CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (gp) |