Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 6:22-cv-00518
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 20, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 16, 2022 3:01 AM CST
Defendant
AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By
Winston Oliver Huff
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, PC
contact info
Jamil N. Alibhai
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Denise Marks
Represented By
James D. Tuck
Dentons
contact info
Victor C. Johnson
Dentons LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 15 2024
Redacted Copy of 24 Sealed MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER DENYING 12 DEFENDANT AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LIFTING STAY. (zv)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
35 35 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 03/13 10:19 PM
Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Denise Marks' ANSWER to34 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Denise Marks.(Godfrey, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
34 34 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Thu 02/20 2:20 PM
AMS's ANSWER to33 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Denise Marks by AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC.(Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
33 33 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/06 10:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended) against AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC amending2 Amended Complaint,., filed by Denise Marks.(Godfrey, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff Denise Marks' Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Plaintiff Denise Marks' Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff Denise Marks' Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Plaintiff Denise Marks' Second Amended Complaint
Friday, November 22, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 11/22 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett M. Godfrey on behalf of Denise Marks. Attorney Brett M. Godfrey added to party Denise Marks(pty:pla) (Godfrey, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
31 31 misc Claim Construction Brief Thu 08/22 3:23 PM
Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by Denise Marks. (Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
30 30 notice Notice Thu 07/25 6:36 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Denise Marks (Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice Thu 07/25 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
28 28 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 06/03 4:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 11/7/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 12/12/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2025.Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2025 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 11/6/2025 before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Jury Trial set for 11/6/2025 before Judge Alan D Albright. Motions terminated:27 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Denise Marks. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
27 27 motion Entry of Scheduling Order Wed 04/17 4:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Denise Marks. (Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
26 26 misc Redacted Copy Thu 02/15 10:09 AM
Redacted Copy of24 Sealed MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER DENYING12 DEFENDANT AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LIFTING STAY. (zv)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
25 25 misc Status Report Mon 02/12 4:25 PM
STATUS REPORT in Accordance with Court's Order (Dkt. 24) by Denise Marks. (Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
24 24 order Sealed Order on Motion Mon 02/05 11:44 AM
Sealed MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER DENYING12 DEFENDANT AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Stayed Mon 02/05 11:47 AM
Case No Longer Stayed. Pursuant to Order filed 02/05/2024, It is further ORDERED that the stay currently in place is lifted. (zv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
misc Remark (No Doc#) Thu 01/25 9:36 AM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated[LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings - Patent Cases] available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 09/22 1:59 PM
Text Order GRANTING20 Motion for Leave to File. Before the Court is Defendant AmeriMaintenance Systems, LLC d/b/a American Maintenance Systems and AMS's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence (the "Motion"). Upon review of the Motion, the Court finds that the Motion should be GRANTED. IT THEREFORE ORDERED that leave is granted to file the Interest Valuation for AmeriMaintenance Systems, LLC, which was submitted under seal as Exhibit A to the Motion, which shall kept under seal by the Court's Clerk. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (MSlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
misc Remark (No Doc#) Wed 05/24 6:38 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated Standing Orders:[LINK:Order Regarding Court Docket Management] and[LINK:Amended Standing Order for Pretrial Procedure] . Both orders are available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
misc Remark (No Doc#) Wed 04/05 7:47 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated[LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings - Patent Cases] available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/27 4:48 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Denise Marks, re20 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence In Support of Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 12] filed by Defendant AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/14 7:19 AM
Text Order GRANTING22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence In Support of Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 12] entered by Judge Alan D Albright. This matter comes before the Court on notice by Plaintiff Estate of Arthur William Doty (Plaintiff) and Defendant AmeriMaintenance Systems, LLC d/b/a American Maintenance Systems and AMS (Defendant) (collectively the parties) that the parties have jointly agreed to an extension of time of fourteen (14) days, setting a deadline of up to and including February 27, 2023, for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants Opposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence Related [+]. Therefore, it is ORDERED that a 14 day extension for the Plaintiff to respond to Defendants Request for Leave be, and hereby is, GRANTED, setting a deadline of February 27, 2023 for the Plaintiff to respond to Plaintiffs Request for Leave. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (NMlc)
Related: [-] quest for Leave
Monday, February 13, 2023
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/13 4:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence In Support of Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 12] by Denise Marks.(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
misc Remark (No Doc#) Tue 01/31 4:39 PM
Notice to filing attorneys: Local rules state that document requiring leave of Court to file must be attached to the Motion for Leave. In this case a Sealed Motion for Leave to file a Sealed Document would have been correct. In the event that Leave is denied, the document at21 will be sticken from the record. (lad)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
21 21 misc Sealed Document - Patent Cases only Mon 01/30 6:31 PM
Sealed Document: Supplemental Evidence In Support of AMS's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 12] - Interest Valuation for AmeriMaintenance Systems, LLC Exhibit A of20 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence In Support of Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 12] ,12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Mon 01/30 6:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence In Support of Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 12] by AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC.(Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Supplemental Evidence
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/02 6:39 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC, re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC Defendant Amerimaintenance Systems, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/26 5:07 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Denise Marks, re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/12 9:56 AM
Text Order GRANTING17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants MTD be extended by 14 days; and a new deadline of October 26, 2022 be set for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants MTD. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (NMlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/11 3:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Denise Marks.(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 10/05 10:12 AM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
15 15 motion Stay Tue 10/04 4:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay the Patent Deadlines in the Case Until After Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction has been Resolved by Denise Marks.(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines
Friday, September 30, 2022
14 14 misc Status Report Fri 09/30 6:11 PM
STATUS REPORT by Denise Marks. (Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 09/29 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winston Oliver Huff on behalf of AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC. Attorney Winston Oliver Huff added to party AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC(pty:dft) (Huff, Winston)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
12 12 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 09/28 3:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC.(Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, September 23, 2022
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 09/23 2:10 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 09/23 2:05 PM
ANSWER to2 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC.(Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
misc Remark (No Doc#) Sat 09/17 9:41 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated[LINK:standing orders] available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows: 1. [LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases] , 2. [LINK:Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases] . (bot4)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
9 9 notice Notice Fri 08/26 3:12 PM
NOTICE Second Notice of Extension of the Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by 15 Days by Denise Marks re2 Amended Complaint,(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Second Extension
Friday, July 22, 2022
8 8 notice Notice Fri 07/22 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Extension of the Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Denise Marks re2 Amended Complaint,(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Order)
7 7 notice Deficiency Notice Fri 07/22 2:54 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Amended Complaint, Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (lad)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 07/22 11:47 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Amended Complaint, Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Denise Marks.(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order)
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 07/22 5:10 PM
Reset Deadlines: AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC answer due 9/8/2022. (lad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/15 11:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Denise Marks as to AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC. Waiver sent on 6/10/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. (Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 06/14 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamil N. Alibhai on behalf of AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC. Attorney Jamil N. Alibhai added to party AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC(pty:dft) (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 05/24 12:23 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/23 12:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC amending1 Complaint,,., filed by Denise Marks.(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, May 20, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/20 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST AMERIMAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC D/B/A AMERICAN MAINTENANCE SYSTEMS AND AMS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16058744). No Summons requested at this time, filed by DENISE MARKS, INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR M. DOTY, DECEASED,.(Johnson, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to the Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to the Complaint,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
misc Remark (No Doc#) Fri 05/20 5:00 PM
All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare a form AO120, FLATTEN, and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (lad)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/24 12:33 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
Related: [-]