California Southern District Court
Judge:Roger T Benitez
Referred: Barbara Lynn Major
Case #: 3:22-cv-00729
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:May 20, 2022
Terminated:Nov 29, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 16, 2022 1:00 AM PST
Defendant
American Wave Machines, Inc.
Represented By
Norman Michael Aspis
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.
Represented By
Joseph R.R. Tache
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Roger Leonard Scott
Buchalter
contact info
Joanne N. Davies
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
31 31 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/29 10:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and due to Plaintiffs filing of a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. See ECF No.30 (no document attached) (ddf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/27 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. (Tache, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/07 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Firm and Counsel by American Wave Machines, Inc.(Aspis, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/05 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Aileen M. Hunter on behalf of American Wave Machines, Inc. (Hunter, Aileen)Attorney Aileen M. Hunter added to party American Wave Machines, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/29 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Cummings on behalf of American Wave Machines, Inc. (Cummings, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
26 26 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/07 11:27 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Status Conference held on 2/6/2023. All parties appearing telephonically. The Court continues the stay in this case. Status Conference continued to 12/4/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporter/ECR Juliet Eichenlaub). (Plaintiff Attorney Roger Leonard Scott, Joseph R. R. Tache). (Defendant Attorney Norman Michael Aspis, Scott W. Cummings, Robert Tyler Goodwyn). (no document attached) (gxr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 01/31 3:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Granting24 Joint Motion to Appear Remotely at February 6, 2023 Status Conference. The parties are allowed to appear telephonically. The Court shall contact parties via email with instructions on how to proceed telephonically. (no document attached) (gxr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
24 24 motion Appear Wed 01/25 10:24 AM
Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Joint Motion to Appear Remotely at February 6, 2023 Status Conference by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. (Davies, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
23 23 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Thu 01/19 3:31 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Scott W. Cummings appearing for Defendant American Wave Machines, Inc. (no document attached) (jrm)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/19 2:44 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17511308.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Cummings, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
21 21 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Wed 01/18 3:53 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Robert Tyler Goodwyn, IV appearing for Defendant American Wave Machines, Inc. (no document attached) (jrm)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/18 3:48 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17507845.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Goodwyn, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, January 13, 2023
19 19 misc Status Report Fri 01/13 9:32 AM
STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT - by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. (Davies, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
notice Notice of Change of Hearing Mon 01/09 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Status Conference reset for 2/6/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
17 17 misc Status Report Wed 12/14 4:55 PM
STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT - by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. (Davies, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 11/14 9:33 AM
STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT - by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. (Davies, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
15 15 misc Status Report Fri 10/14 9:06 AM
STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT - by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. (Davies, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
14 14 misc Status Report Fri 09/16 9:07 AM
STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT - by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. (Davies, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
13 13 misc Status Report Thu 08/18 12:35 PM
STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT - by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. (Tache, Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Withdrawal of Document Thu 08/18 12:32 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. [Withdrawal of Joint Status Report Doc. 11 Due to CM/ECF Efiling Login Account Error] . (Tache, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
11 11 misc Status Report Wed 08/17 9:11 AM
STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT - by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. (Davies, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/19 10:29 AM
ORDER Granting Request For Immediate Stay Pending Inter-Parties Review [ECF No.9 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/18/2022.(ddf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/06 12:36 PM
NOTICE OF INTER-PARTES REVIEW PETITION AND REQUEST FOR CONFIRMATION OF IMMEDIATE STAY by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.(Tache, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Friday, June 17, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/17 3:29 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Extend Time For Defendant To Respond To Complaint [ECF No.7 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/17/2022. (ddf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/16 4:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by American Wave Machines, Inc..(Aspis, Norman)Attorney Norman Michael Aspis added to party American Wave Machines, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, June 09, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/09 4:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. American Wave Machines, Inc. served. (Tache, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 05/20 3:13 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM Fri 05/20 3:00 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *8,434,966*, *9,279,263*, *10,662,663*, *10,738,492* cc:USPTO (ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/20 2:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 05/20 2:55 PM
Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. No Parties With Financial Interest. (ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/20 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Wave Machines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16843060.), filed by Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. The new case number is 3:22-cv-729-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Tache, Joseph)(ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10