Oregon District Court
Case #: 6:22-cr-00152
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 21, 2022 12:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Armando Lugo-Bejarano (2)
Defendant
Richard Ramos-Chavez (1)
Represented By
Robert L. Sepp
Attorney At Law
contact info
Irina Hughes
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam E. Delph
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2022 1:32 AM PDT
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai as to Richard Ramos-Chavez (1), Armando Lugo-Bejarano (2). (bd) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint.
4 4 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai as to Richard Ramos-Chavez: Initial Appearance is set for 3/23/2022 at 01:30PM in Eugene by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
5 5 Minutes of Proceedings: First Initial Appearance before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai as to Richard Ramos-Chavez held on 3/23/2022. Defendant waives personal appearance and consents to appearance by video conference. Attorney Irina Hughes appointed for Richard Ramos-Chavez. Defendant ordered detained - see formal order. Brady Disclosure Order: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the government is advised of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. See attached Order. Preliminary Examination is set for 4/5/2022 at 10:30AM in Medford by video conference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Joint Status Report due by 4/20/2022. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Adam Delph, by video. Counsel Present for Defendant: Irina Hughes, by video. Restraint Order: NR. (US Pretrial Services Officer Present: Lisa Brown, by telephone) (Court Reporter FTR (Courtroom 3)) (Interpreter for Defendant Present: Kenneth Barger) (Oath on file with the court.) (cp) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Defendant Richard Ramos-Chavez. Signed on 3/23/2022 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (cp) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 03/23/2022 as to Richard Ramos-Chavez. (bd) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
8 8 Scheduling Order as to Richard Ramos-Chavez. The Preliminary Hearing set for 04/05/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke has been RESET for 4/6/2022 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
9 9 Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing pursuant to Rule 5.1 by Richard Ramos-Chavez (Hughes, Irina) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
10 10 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai as to Richard Ramos-Chavez: Preliminary Hearing set for 4/6/2022 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke is VACATED. Arraignment is set for 4/20/2022 at 01:30PM in Eugene by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report in which they update the Court on the status of the case. The Joint Status Report shall include requests for additional waivers of time under the Speedy Trial Act and for presentment to the grand jury, if applicable. The Joint Status Report deadline set for 4/20/2022 is RESET for 4/11/2022. (jk) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
11 11 Joint Status Report filed by USA as to Richard Ramos-Chavez (Delph, Adam) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
12 12 Notice of Attorney Substitution: Attorney Robert L Sepp added for Richard Ramos-Chavez in place and stead of Attorney Irina Hughes. (Sepp, Robert) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
13 13 Request for Discovery by Richard Ramos-Chavez (Sepp, Robert) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
14 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai as to Richard Ramos-Chavez: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Status Report11 . At the request of counsel, an additional 45 days, from 3/23/2022 to 5/7/2022, are ordered waived under the Speedy Trial Act for presentation of this matter to the grand jury to continue its investigation. The Court finds that the ends of justice served by granting the continuance outweigh the best interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report in which they update the Court on the status of the case. The Joint Status Report shall include requests for additional waivers of time under the Speedy Trial Act and for presentment to the grand jury, if applicable. The Joint Status Report is due by 4/25/2022. Arraignment set for 4/20/2022 at 01:30PM in Eugene by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai is VACATED. (jk) [6:22-mj-00053-MK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
15 15 Indictment Related [+] as to Richard Ramos-Chavez (1) count 1, Armando Lugo-Bejarano (2) count 1. (Forfeiture Allegation.) (jk)
Related: [-] dacted
16 16 Indictment Unredacted Version Filed Under Seal as to Defendant Richard Ramos-Chavez, Armando Lugo-Bejarano. (jk)
Related: [-]
17 17 Defendant Information Relative to a Criminal Case Sheet as to Defendant Richard Ramos-Chavez. (In accordance with Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1 this form document containing personal data identifiers is filed under seal.) (jk)
Related: [-]
18 18 Defendant Information Relative to a Criminal Case Sheet as to Defendant Armando Lugo-Bejarano. (In accordance with Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1 this form document containing personal data identifiers is filed under seal.) (jk)
Related: [-]