Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Yvette Kane
Case #: 1:22-cv-00748
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:May 20, 2022
Terminated:Jun 21, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 16, 2022 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
Pacwest Machinery, LLC
Represented By
Andrew K. Garden
Conrad O'Brien PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Volvo Construction Equipment North America, LLC
Represented By
Tyson Y Herrold
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Billy M Donley
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, June 23, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Clarify Thu 06/23 10:57 AM
ORDER - 1. Defendants Motion for Clarification (Doc. No. 11) is GRANTED; 2. The Courts June 21, 2022 Order (Doc. No. 10) is VACATED IN PART such that the phrase each party to bear its own costs and expenses is removed; and 3. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/23/22 (eo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
12 12 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 06/22 6:23 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re11 MOTION to Clarify 10 June 21, 2022 Order filed by Pacwest Machinery, LLC.(Garden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Clarify Wed 06/22 6:22 PM
MOTION to Clarify 10 June 21, 2022 Order by Pacwest Machinery, LLC.(Garden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 06/21 9:24 AM
ORDER granting9 - Considering Plaintiff Volvo Construction Equipment North America, LLCs Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all of Plaintiff Volvo Construction Equipment North America, LLCs claims against Defendant PacWest Machinery, LLC are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and expenses. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/21/22. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
9 9 motion Dismiss Wed 06/15 1:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Volvo Construction Equipment North America, LLC.(Donley, Billy) (cl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/15/2022) Proposed Order
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Wed 06/15 12:48 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pacwest Machinery, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Joshua Green Corporation for Pacwest Machinery, LLC. (Garden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 06/15 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew K. Garden on behalf of Pacwest Machinery, LLC (Garden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/27 11:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Volvo Construction Equipment North America, LLC. Pacwest Machinery, LLC served on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022. (Donley, Billy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
5 5 order Special Admissions Form Approved Wed 05/25 3:15 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Billy M. Donley. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/25/22. (dmn)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/25 12:28 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Tyson Y Herrold on behalf of Volvo Construction Equipment North America, LLC Attorney Billy Donley is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BPAMDC-5955503.. (Herrold, Tyson)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 05/25 2:10 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
3 3 misc Letter Tue 05/24 9:44 AM
Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/24/22. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 05/23 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Pacwest Machinery, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (gs) Modified on 5/23/2022 (gs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/23 9:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Pacwest Machinery, LLC ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5951751), filed by Volvo Construction Equipment North America, LLC.(gs) Modified on 5/23/2022 (gs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s)