Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-06536
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 23, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:22-cv-01233
Last checked: Saturday Nov 19, 2022 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Plaintiff
SIDNEY LOGAN
Represented By
DANIEL JAMES THORNBURGH
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz - Pensacola Fl
contact info
BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz - Pensacola Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/01 7:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK on behalf of SIDNEY LOGAN (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/01 7:29 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand - Per PTO 17 against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, filed by SIDNEY LOGAN. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 05/23 10:19 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-01233. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
7 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-158) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/23/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
6 6 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal,. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/23/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Bryan F. Aylstock as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/23/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-1233 JRT/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/23/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/23/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/23/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9496085) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/23/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet