Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 3:22-cv-08092
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 23, 2022
Terminated:May 01, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 19, 2022 2:55 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Torel Building & Remodeling LLC
Represented By
James E Ledbetter
Ledbetter Law Firm PLC
contact info
Mark Andrew Hanson
Ledbetter Law Firm PLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mark Kenzer
Represented By
Olivier Andre Beabeau
Galbut Beabeau PC
contact info
Grant Hayes Frazier
Galbut Beabeau PC
contact info
Defendant
Torel Building & Remodeling LLC
Represented By
James E Ledbetter
Ledbetter Law Firm PLC
contact info
Mark Andrew Hanson
Ledbetter Law Firm PLC
contact info
Defendant
Beth Tortorello
Represented By
James E Ledbetter
Ledbetter Law Firm PLC
contact info
Mark Andrew Hanson
Ledbetter Law Firm PLC
contact info
Defendant
Chris Tortorello
Represented By
James E Ledbetter
Ledbetter Law Firm PLC
contact info
Mark Andrew Hanson
Ledbetter Law Firm PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Kenzer
Represented By
Olivier Andre Beabeau
Galbut Beabeau PC
contact info
Grant Hayes Frazier
Galbut Beabeau PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, May 01, 2023
29 29 minute_ord ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 05/01 11:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order (Doc.28 ), this matter is dismissed, with prejudice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 03/24 11:21 AM
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, dismiss this entire case on April 28, 2023, with prejudice, unless prior thereto a party withdraws the Notice of Settlement27 .IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any pending deadlines in this matter are stayed and any hearings in this matter are vacated. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 3/24/2023. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
27 27 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 03/23 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Mark Kenzer. (Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/10 1:04 PM
ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Torel Building & Remodeling LLC.(Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/07 12:12 PM
NOTICE re: COMPLIANCE by Mark Kenzer .(Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit redline version of Second Amended Complaint - filed in this action on November 10, 2022 Docket document 20
Monday, March 06, 2023
24 24 minutes Status Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Mon 03/06 10:48 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T. Liburdi: Status Conference held on 3/6/2023. IT IS ORDERED discharging the Court's Order to Show Cause (Doc. 15 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a notice of compliance with a redline Second Amended Complaint per the Local Rules by March 10, 2023. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendant shall file an Answer to the Amended Complaint (Doc.20 ) by March 24, 2023. APPEARANCES: Grant Frazier for Plaintiff. Mark Hanson for Defendants. (Court Reporter Cathy Taylor.) Hearing held 4:08 PM to 4:22 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 02/22 11:39 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Olivier Andre Beabeau terminated. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 2/22/2023. (CLM)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/22 10:06 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting an in-person Status Conference for 3/6/2023 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi.Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 2/22/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
21 21 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 02/16 2:39 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mark Kenzer.(Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, November 10, 2022
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/10 5:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants filed by Mark Kenzer.(Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-13
Thursday, November 03, 2022
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/03 12:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Torel Building & Remodeling LLC. (Ledbetter, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
18 18 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Mon 10/31 10:37 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:17 Response to Order to Show Cause. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document signed by attorney Mark A. Hanson but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney James E. Ledbetter. Please correct future filings . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLM)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 10/28 1:37 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:12 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, by Defendant Torel Building & Remodeling LLC.(Ledbetter, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/28 11:39 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/24/2023. Dispositive motions due by 6/9/2023. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/28/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Fri 10/28 11:33 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T. Liburdi: Scheduling Conference held on 10/28/2022. Defendants' counsel are not present. IT IS ORDERED Defendants' counsel, Mark Andrew Hanson and James E. Ledbetter, shall show cause no later than 10:00 a.m. (Arizona time) on October 31, 2022, as to why they should not be sanctioned and fined $500.00 each for failing to appear at the in-person scheduling conference set for October 28, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall file a response to Defendants' counsel's submission, if they so choose, no later than November 1, 2022. Case status and deadlines are discussed. Separate scheduling order to issue. APPEARANCES: Grant Frazier for Plaintiff. Counsel for defendants not present. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 10:32 AM to 10:51 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
14 14 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Tue 10/18 4:02 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Mark Kenzer. (Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
13 13 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 09/29 4:51 PM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Mark Kenzer.(Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
12 12 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/28 5:04 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is set for 10/28/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. See attached order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 9/28/2022. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Thu 09/08 3:52 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Mark Kenzer by Torel Building & Remodeling LLC.(Ledbetter, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/04 4:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mark Kenzer.(Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-13
9 9 notice Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) Thu 08/04 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Mark Kenzer .(Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Thursday, July 14, 2022
8 8 service Service Executed Thu 07/14 12:37 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mark Kenzer: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 06/17/2022 to Beth Tortorello . (Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Service Executed Thu 07/14 12:36 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mark Kenzer: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 06/17/2022 to Chris Tortorello . (Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Service Executed Thu 07/14 12:35 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mark Kenzer: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 06/17/2022 to Torel Building & Remodeling LLC . (Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 05/23 1:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Torel Building & Remodeling LLC, Beth Tortorello, Chris Tortorello.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
4 4 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 05/23 1:27 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mark Kenzer.(Frazier, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit
3 3 misc New Case Opened Mon 05/23 1:23 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20685442. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 22-08092 PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Mon 05/23 1:21 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Mark Kenzer. (Frazier, Grant)(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/23 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20685442 filed by Mark Kenzer. (Frazier, Grant)(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet