California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:22-cv-01037
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 23, 2022
Terminated:Aug 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 19, 2022 2:23 AM PST
Defendant
Hao Ma
Represented By
Michael A DiNardo
Yk Law LLP
contact info
Defendant
Okaysou Corporation
Represented By
Michael A DiNardo
Yk Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arovast Corporation
Represented By
R. Joseph Trojan
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Lan C. Dang
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Francis Wong
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Lan C Dang
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Etekcity Corporation
Represented By
R. Joseph Trojan
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Lan C. Dang
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Francis Wong
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Lan C Dang
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Yan Huang
Terminated: 07/20/2022


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 16, 2024
49 49 1 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/16 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
48 48 transfer Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (DJ) (G-74) - optional html form Thu 08/15 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned District Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief District Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. Case number will now read as 8:22-cv-01037-DOC(DFMx). (nhac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
47 47 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/09 9:18 AM
ORDER RE: CASE STATUS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re Status Report46 , Status Report45 . If events in the bankruptcy court ultimately lead to relief from the automatic stay in some manner, please file an appropriate notice with the Court. Until then, the action remains stayed in this district court. As for the reassignment issue, it's likely that the case will be returned to the assignment wheel if/when it becomes active again. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
46 46 misc Status Report Fri 05/03 4:07 PM
STATUS REPORT as to Bankruptcy Proceeding filed by Defendants Hao Ma, Okaysou Corporation. (DiNardo, Michael)
Related: [-]
45 45 misc Status Report Fri 05/03 3:35 PM
STATUS REPORT (Update) filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
44 44 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/11 3:54 PM
ORDER RE: CASE STATUS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re Order Staying Action43 . The parties are directed to file a short notice with the Court by May 3 to inform the Court about the status of this lawsuit and the bankruptcy case. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
43 43 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Stayed Thu 07/06 1:41 PM
ORDER STAYING ACTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re Order42 . IT IS ORDERED that the civil action is STAYED during the pendency of the bankruptcy proceedings. (see document for further details) Case stayed. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
42 42 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/26 5:06 PM
ORDER RE: BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re Notice of Bankruptcy Filing41 . If Plaintiff believes that it can lawfully continue to pursue this action in district court, it may present its argument by or before May 12. Otherwise, the Court will likely be obliged to stay this action pending further order of the Bankruptcy Court. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/17 2:52 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Filing filed by Defendant Okaysou Corporation. (DiNardo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
40 40 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/04 5:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF CASE DEADLINES REQUESTED BY JOINT STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re Stipulation to Continue,39 . Jury Trial continued to 11/2/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner., Pretrial Conference continued to 10/23/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (see document for further details). (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
39 39 stip Continue Mon 04/03 5:51 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Discovery cut off and other dates from 04/04/2023 to 05/19/2023 Re: Order,38 filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation.(Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order GRANTING EXTENSION OF CASE DEADLINES REQUESTED BY JOINT STIPULATION
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
38 38 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/11 3:58 PM
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY CUT-OFF by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. 1. The Court conducted an extensive "halftime show" / discovery conference with the parties today. 2. As a result of our discussion, the Court EXTENDS the fact and expert discovery deadlines by eight weeks. Of most relevance, the new fact discovery cut-off date is April 4. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
37 37 order For Order re Discovery Matter Wed 01/11 3:56 PM
FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION settling34 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute, re:36 MINUTES. (hr)
Related: [-]
36 36 minutes Status Conference - optional html form Wed 01/11 3:49 PM
MINUTES OF HALF TIME STATUS CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Half time status conference held as stated on the record. Court Recorder: CS 01/11/23. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 01/10 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney R. Joseph Trojan counsel for Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation. Adding Emi Shibata as counsel of record for Arovast Corporation and Etekcity Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation and Etekcity Corporation. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
34 34 1 pgs motion Order re Discovery Matter Fri 01/06 4:56 PM
MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Video Conference set for 1/11/2023 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 01/04 5:27 PM
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. 1. The Court received an e-mail from Plaintiff's lawyers regarding several pending discovery disputes. Plaintiff requested an informal discovery conference to discuss these issues. 2. We're already on calendar for a "halftime show" hearing on January 11. Rather than set a separate hearing, I suggest that we take up the discovery issues at that session. To ensure that we get through everything, the hearing time will be advanced to 9 a.m. Either side may submit a status report or update on the discovery issues by the close of business on January 10. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 17, 2022
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Sat 12/17 3:33 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney R. Joseph Trojan counsel for Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation. Francis wong is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation and Etekcity Corporation. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
31 31 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/28 2:37 PM
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. 1. The Court reviewed the stipulation to modify the discovery dates in this action. (Docket # 30.) The lawyers' request reflects their professionalism, and will be granted in its entirety. 2. Your new dates are as follows: (see document for further details). (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
30 30 stip Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Wed 11/23 3:00 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 02/07/2023 filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation.(Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
29 29 order Protective Order Mon 09/12 1:41 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner re Stipulation for Protective Order28 . (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
28 28 stip Protective Order Fri 09/09 5:09 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Hao Ma, Okaysou Corporation.(DiNardo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
27 27 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/31 2:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Jury Trial set for 7/24/2023 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Status Conference - optional html form Wed 08/31 2:14 PM
MINUTES OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (VIDEO) held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Case management conference held. Separate scheduling order to be issued. Court Recorder: CS 08/31/22. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 08/22 2:30 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE - IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner: Case management conference previously scheduled for 8/24/2022 at 9:30 AM has been rescheduled for 8/31/2022 at 9:30 AM. Zoom link to be sent to parties. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 08/11 3:54 PM
ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. To advance the litigation efficiently, the Court will hold a case management conference on August 24 at 9:30 a.m. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program Thu 08/11 12:55 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is approved by District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 8:22-cv-01037 MRW. (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
22 22 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Tue 08/09 9:59 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The parties agree to proceed with Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court grants the parties CV-11D re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge (Dkt.20 ). Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
21 21 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 07/25 4:46 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation.. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 07/20 6:59 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form10(Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
19 19 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 07/20 5:54 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Yan Huang. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
18 18 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 07/19 9:22 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
17 17 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 07/07 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Hao Ma, Okaysou Corporation, (DiNardo, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/07 8:44 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Hao Ma, Okaysou Corporation.(DiNardo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 06/14 3:25 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hao Ma answer now due 7/8/2022; Okaysou Corporation answer now due 7/8/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Hao Ma; Okaysou Corporation.(Attorney Michael A DiNardo added to party Hao Ma(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A DiNardo added to party Okaysou Corporation(pty:dft))(DiNardo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 06/06 4:46 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation, upon Defendant Hao Ma served on 5/25/2022, answer due 6/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hao Ma, Individual Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 06/06 4:43 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation, upon Defendant Okaysou Corporation served on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hao Ma, Agent for Service of Process and CEO of Okaysou Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 05/25 12:47 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/24 11:00 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Yan Huang, Hao Ma, Okaysou Corporation. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Hao Summons,
Att: 2 Yan Summons
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 05/24 10:58 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 05/24 10:57 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 05/24 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
7 7 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Mon 05/23 4:34 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 05/23 4:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/23 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF CORPORATE DISCLOSURES; and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation, identifying L&H Y Trading Inc., Arcsync Co., Ltd., and Arcsync Co., Ltd.. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 05/23 4:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Subpoena Request (AO 88) Summons Request Mon 05/23 4:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 05/23 4:14 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 05/23 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33347839 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Arovast Corporation, Etekcity Corporation. (Attorney R. Joseph Trojan added to party Arovast Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney R. Joseph Trojan added to party Etekcity Corporation(pty:pla))(Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2