Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul Baisier
Case #: 1:22-bk-53895
Case Filed:May 23, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Jun 28, 2022
Terminated:Apr 12, 2023

Debtor
CARS CARS CARS, LLC
1805 Grassland Pkwy Ste A
Alpharetta, GA 30004-0756
Represented By
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
Cars Cars Cars, LLC
1805 Grassland Parkway, Suite A
Alpharetta, GA 30004
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann Childers
Rountree Leitman Klein & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jordan E. Lubin
Lubin Law, P.C. Building 2 8325 Dunwoody Place
Atlanta, GA 30350
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303


Docket last updated: 02/22/2023 1:57 PM EST
Monday, May 23, 2022
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Mon 05/23 5:44 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 22-53895 ) [misc,1011aty] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A57169556. Fee Amount 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 16 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 05/23 5:40 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Non-Individual Fee $ 338, Filed by William A. Rountree of Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC on behalf of CARS CARS CARS, LLC. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/21/2022. (Rountree, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc P-Corporate Resolution Mon 05/23 5:46 PM
Corporate Resolution filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of CARS CARS CARS, LLC. (Rountree, William)
Related: [-]