Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Charles A Pannell, Jr
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 1:22-cv-02032
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:May 23, 2022
Terminated:Nov 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 19, 2022 4:59 AM EST
Defendant
American Home Relocation, Inc.
Defendant
David and Goliath Moving
Defendant
Handle With Care Moving & Transportation, LLC
Defendant
ONR Property Management & Investment, LLC
Defendant
Right-A-Way Movers, LLC
Defendant
Spirit Vanlines, Inc.
Plaintiff
Michelle Moss
Represented By
Keely Collins
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Justin Beecher Connell
Elarbee, Thompson, Sapp & Wilson, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, February 08, 2024
43 43 misc Mail Returned Fri 02/09 9:34 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("Return to Sender. Unable to Forward"). Mail sent to American Home Relocation, Inc. re39 Order on Final Report &40 Clerk's Judgment. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
42 42 misc Mail Returned Thu 12/21 3:57 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("Return to Sender. Unable to Forward. Return to Sender"). Mail sent to Handle with Care Moving & Transportation, LLC re39 Order &40 Clerk's Judgment. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
41 41 misc Mail Returned Thu 12/14 8:08 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("Return to Sender. Attempted - Not Known. Unable to Forward. Return to Sender"). Mail sent to American Home Relocation, Inc. re39 Order &40 Clerk's Judgment. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
40 40 misc Judgment - Clerk Thu 11/16 9:50 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the plaintiff Michelle Moss, recover from the defendants, in the amount of $177,791.25. This amount is comprised of $30,100 in back pay, $1,429.75 in prejudgment interest, $100,000 in compensatory and punitive damages, and $46,261.50 in attorneys fees. (pdt)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/16 9:54 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to American Home Relocation, Inc., David and Goliath Moving, Handle With Care Moving & Transportation, LLC, ONR Property Management & Investment, LLC, Right-A-Way Movers, LLC, & Spirit Vanlines, Inc. re39 Order on Final Report and Recommendation &40 Clerk's Judgment. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 11/16 9:37 AM
ORDER. After reviewing the37 Report & Recommendation for clear error and finding none, the court HEREBY APOPTS it as the order and opinion of the court. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendants in the amount of $177,791.25. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on this 15th day of November, 2023. (pdt)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 11/16 9:43 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
38 38 3 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 10/27 8:42 AM
ORDER for Service of37 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/27/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Fri 10/27 8:40 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by Michelle Moss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/27/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
motion Report and Recommendation - Final Fri 10/27 8:41 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by Michelle Moss. The undersigned REPORTS that plaintiff has stated a cause of action for discrimination and retaliation under Title VII for which relief may be granted. Accordingly, the undersigned RECOMMENDS, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b)(2), that plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment26 be GRANTED and judgment by default be entered in favor of Ms. Moss and against defendants in the amount of $177,791.25. This amount is comprised of $30,100 in back pay, $1,429.75 in prejudgment interest, $100,000 in compensatory and punitive damages, and $46,261.50 in attorney's fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/27/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/24 11:17 AM
Submission of36 Detailed Specification and Itemization of Requested Attorney Fees, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
36 36 misc Detailed Specification and Itemization of Attorney Fees Fri 10/20 12:17 PM
Detailed Specification and Itemization of Requested Attorney Fees.(Connell, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Justin B. Connell
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
35 35 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 10/11 1:58 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On September 12, 2023, the Court held a hearing33 on plaintiff Michelle Moss's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment26 . At the conclusion of the hearing, the Court direct plaintiffs counsel to submit statements regarding her damages and attorney's fees within ten days. (See Minute Sheet of Sept. 12, 202333 .) That deadline has passed and plaintiff has failed to comply with the Courts lawful Order. Pursuant to Local Rule 41.3, the Court may dismiss a civil case for want of prosecution if [a] plaintiff or plaintiffs attorney shall, after notice,... fail or refuse to obey a lawful order of the Court in the case. N.D. Ga. Civ. R. 41.3(A)(2). Accordingly, the Court ORDERS plaintiff to show cause within TEN (10) DAYS of the date of this Order why the undersigned should not recommend that this case be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/11/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
34 34 misc Mail Returned Tue 09/26 8:41 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable with Letter from Incorp. Mail sent to Spirit Vanlines, Inc. re28 and30 Notices of Hearing. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
33 33 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 09/12 2:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2023 re26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by Michelle Moss. Counseldirected to submit within 10 days statements regarding damages, attorneyfees. (Court Reporter Melissa Brock)(klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
32 32 misc Mail Returned Fri 09/01 11:02 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to American Home Relocation, Inc. re30 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
31 31 misc Mail Returned Wed 08/23 11:42 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to American Home Relocation, Inc. Re: Notice of Hearing on Motion30 . (pdt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
30 30 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 08/17 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants . Motion Hearing reset for 9/12/2023 at 1:30 PM in ROME Courtroom 201 before Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (klb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/17 1:30 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to American Home Relocation, Inc., David and Goliath Moving, Handle With Care Moving & Transportation, LLC, ONR Property Management & Investment, LLC, Right-A-Way Movers, LLC, Spirit Vanlines, Inc. re30 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
29 29 misc Mail Returned Wed 08/16 3:37 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to American Home Relocation, Inc. re27 Order. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
28 28 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 08/10 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants . Motion Hearing reset for 8/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in ROME Courtroom 201 before Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (klb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/10 9:56 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to American Home Relocation, Inc., David and Goliath Moving, Handle With Care Moving & Transportation, LLC, ONR Property Management & Investment, LLC, Right-A-Way Movers, LLC, Spirit Vanlines, Inc. re28 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
27 27 5 pgs order Order Tue 08/01 11:01 AM
ORDER - the Court ORDERS the parties to appear before the undersigned on August 8, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 201 located in the United States Federal Building, 600 E. 1st Street, Rome, Georgia 30161 to determine the amount of damages due plaintiff and the costs and reasonable attorneys fees associated with this action. Additionally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to all defendants: David and Goliath Moving 1800 Montreal Court, Unit B Tucker, GA 30084; Spirit Vanlines, Inc. c/o Incorporated Services, Inc. 9040 Roswell Road, Suite 500 Atlanta, GA 30350; American Home Relocation, Inc. c/o Jerry Whaley 3453 West 47th Place Chicago, IL 60632 ; Right-A-Way Movers, LLC c/o United States Corporation Agents, Inc. 1420 South Lake Plaza Drive Morrow, GA 30260 ; ONR Property Management & Investment, LLC c/o David Razon 1800 Montreal Court, Unit B Tucker, GA 30084 ; Handle With Care Moving & Transportation, LLC c/o United States Corporation Agents, Inc. 1420 South Lake Plaza Drive Morrow, GA 30260 ; Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/31/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 08/01 11:03 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re27 Order. Mailed as directed in order. (klb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/01 11:12 AM
Set Hearing as to26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants . Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2023 at 2:00 PM in ROME Courtroom 201 before Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/31 12:13 PM
Submission of26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants , to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (bnw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 07/14 11:06 AM
Submission of25 Order to Show Cause to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (bnw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
26 26 motion Default Judgment Mon 07/10 3:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants with Brief In Support by Michelle Moss.(Connell, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration of Michelle Moss,
Att: 3 Declaration of Justin B. Connell
Monday, June 26, 2023
25 25 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 06/26 8:44 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - A review of the docket reveals that plaintiff, Michelle Moss, filed an Application to the Clerk for Entry of Default Against All Defendants23 on November 15, 2022, which the Clerk entered the next day. Since that time, there has been no substantive activity in this case by plaintiff for at least six months. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS plaintiff to show cause within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order why the undersigned should not recommend that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 6/26/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/13 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Forbes Barrett on behalf of Michelle Moss (Barrett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
23 23 motion Default Judgment Tue 11/15 4:03 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to David & Goliath Moving; Spirit VanLines, Inc; Handle with Care Moving & Transportation; American Home Relocation, Inc; Right-A-Way Movers, LLC; ONR Property Management & Investment, LLC by Michelle Moss.(Connell, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit [Dkt] 14 Spirit Vanlines Executed ummons,
Att: 2 Exhibit [Dkt 15] Right-A-Way Movers Executed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit [Dkt 16] ONR Property Executed Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit [Dkt 17] Handle with Care Executed Summons,
Att: 5 Exhibit [Dkt 18] David & Goliath Executed Summons,
Att: 6 Exhibit [Dkt 19] American Home Affidavit of Service
Monday, November 07, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 11/07 4:00 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Keely Collins terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/7/22. (klb)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Withdraw As Attorney Mon 11/07 2:53 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Keely Collins as Attorneyby Michelle Moss. (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 11/07 12:55 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - the Court ORDERS plaintiff to show cause within TEN (10) DAYS of the date of this Order why the undersigned should not recommend that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/7/22. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
19 19 service Return of Service Executed Tue 07/05 4:27 PM
Return of Service Executed by Michelle Moss. American Home Relocation, Inc. served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
18 18 service Return of Service Executed Wed 06/08 5:02 PM
Return of Service Executed by Michelle Moss. David and Goliath Moving served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Return of Service Executed Wed 06/08 5:01 PM
Return of Service Executed by Michelle Moss. Handle With Care Moving & Transportation, LLC served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Return of Service Executed Wed 06/08 5:00 PM
Return of Service Executed by Michelle Moss. ONR Property Management & Investment, LLC served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Return of Service Executed Wed 06/08 4:58 PM
Return of Service Executed by Michelle Moss. Right-A-Way Movers, LLC served on 6/7/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Return of Service Executed Wed 06/08 4:57 PM
Return of Service Executed by Michelle Moss. Spirit Vanlines, Inc. served on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
13 13 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 06/03 12:32 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Handle With Care Moving & Transportation, LLC. (tcc)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 06/03 12:32 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to ONR Property Management & Investment, LLC. (tcc)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 06/03 12:30 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Right-A-Way Movers, LLC. (tcc)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 06/03 12:30 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to American Home Relocation, Inc.. (tcc)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 06/03 12:28 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Spirit Vanlines, Inc.. (tcc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 06/03 12:28 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to David and Goliath Moving. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
7 7 service Proposed Summons Thu 06/02 12:48 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michelle Moss for Defendant Spirit VanLines (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons Thu 06/02 12:47 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michelle Moss for Defendant Right-A-Way Movers (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed Summons Thu 06/02 12:46 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michelle Moss for Defendant ONR Property Management & Investment (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons Thu 06/02 12:45 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michelle Moss for Defendant Handle with Care Moving & Transportation (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Thu 06/02 12:44 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michelle Moss for Defendant David and Goliath Moving (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed Summons Thu 06/02 12:43 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michelle Moss for Defendant American Home Relocation (Collins, Keely)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/23 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michelle Moss. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11818247)(lwb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet