In Re Miykael Muhammad and Ada Gardner
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy S Black |
Referred: | Stephanie K Bowman |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00695 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 10:41 PM EDT |
Plaintiff
Ada Gardner
|
|
Plaintiff
Miykael Muhammad
3127 S. Indiana Ave.
Chicago, IL 60616 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, January 29, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 01/30 3:44 PM
ORDER of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal filed by Miykael Muhammad dismissing the appeal. (sct1) |
|
Tuesday, November 25, 2014 | ||
USCA Case Number 14-4162 for10 Notice of Appeal filed by Miykael Muhammad. Case Manager - Jill Colyer. (sct1) | ||
Monday, November 24, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to9 Clerk's Judgment by Plaintiff Miykael Muhammad. (jlw1) | |
Monday, October 20, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING DECISION AND ENTRY8 . (mr1) | |
8 | 8 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Doc.5 ) Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/20/2014. (mr1) | |
Thursday, October 02, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re3 Complaint filed by Ada Gardner, Miykael Muhammad. Green card returned signed for Miykael Muhammad. (jlw1) | |
Thursday, September 11, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of service by Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested re5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (km1) | |
5 | 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re3 Complaint filed by Ada Gardner, Miykael Muhammad. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(B). It is further RECOMMENDED that the Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3) that an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith, and therefore, deny Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 9/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/11/2014. (km1) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS PRO SE LITIGANT by In Re Miykael Muhammad. (km1) | |
3 | 3 COMPLAINT filed by In Re: Miykael Muhammad, Ada Gardner. (km1) | |
2 | 2 ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/11/2014. (km1) | |
Tuesday, September 02, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 7 pgs MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by In Re Miykael Muhammad. (jlw1) | |
Att: 1 27 pgs Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Notice of Appearance |