Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:22-cv-30068
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 24, 2022
Terminated:Jun 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 20, 2022 4:31 AM EST
Defendant
University of Massachusetts Amherst
Represented By
Mark A. Johnson
University Of Massachusetts
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Brown
625 Old Post Rod
Tolland, CT 06084

GPO Mar 06 2023
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, defendant's 11 motion to dismiss is DENIED.(de Oliveira, Flaviana)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
37 37 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/28 5:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by University of Massachusetts Amherst. (Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
36 36 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Tue 06/06 4:22 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. 45-DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
35 35 adr Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider Tue 06/06 3:14 PM
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 05/15 3:51 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. granting32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 16, 2023 to Extend deadlines. The status conference set for 5/16 is canceled. Next status conference set by telephone for 6/16/23. AMENDED DEADLINES: Initial Disclosures must be completed by 6/16/23. Amendments to Pleadings to be filed by 6/30/23. Written discovery Related [+] shall be served no later than 7/21/23. All depositions, other than expert depositions, and fact discovery must be completed by 11/2/23. Notice of intent to call expert witness is due by 10/13/23. Dispositive motions must be by filed by 12/15/23. Oppositions must be filed 1/19/24. Replies to be filed by 1/26/24. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-] quests for production of documents, interrogatories and request for admissions
Friday, May 12, 2023
32 32 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/12 12:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 16, 2023 to Extend deadlines by University of Massachusetts Amherst.(Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
31 31 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/12 9:04 AM
Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ORDER entered. ORDER WITH RESPECT TO MEDIATION . Memos due no later than 6/1/23. See Order for complete details. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of ADR Conference Fri 05/12 9:01 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 6/6/2023 at 10:00 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
29 29 notice Notice of ADR Conference Mon 05/08 11:14 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference. Telephone Conference set for 5/11/2023 at 4:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice Cancelling Hearing Mon 05/08 11:11 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling ADR Hearing scheduled for 5/30/23. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order Mon 05/08 11:10 AM
Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The mediation conference scheduled for 5/30/23 is hereby cancelled. Insofar as Judge Neiman is not available. Accordingly, Judge Neiman hereby schedules a brief telephone conference with Plaintiff (pro se) and Defendants counsel for Thursday, May 11, 2023. The Clerks Office will send call-in information for that telephone conference via email. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
26 26 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Thu 04/27 6:24 PM
Notice of reassignment to ADR Provider. Judge Kenneth P. Neiman appointed. Judge Edward F. Harrington no longer assigned.(Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of ADR Conference Wed 04/19 11:38 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 5/30/2023 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. You may forward the invitation to your clients for participation in the Mediation. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Counsel and principals are ORDERED to be present and to have full settlement authority. A brief mediation memorandum addressing both the merits of the case and the filing party's settlement position should be submitted to the court via email as an attachment to tracy_mclaughlin@mad.uscourts.gov by 5/22/2023 at 12:00PM. The mediation memo should be marked "Confidential - Not for docketing" and is not to be served upon opposing parties. Counsel are asked to accommodate this date.. In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time or the date poses a serious conflict, please contact Tracy McLaughlin at the email address above.. (McLaughlin, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
24 24 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Mon 04/03 10:21 AM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Edward F. Harrington appointed.(Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR Fri 03/31 3:56 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/31 3:48 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED: Initial Disclosures must be completed by 5/19/23. Amendments to Pleadings to be filed by 5/31/23. Written discovery Related [+] shall be served no later than 6/30/23. All depositions, other than expert depositions, and fact discovery must be completed by 11/2/23. Notice of intent to call expert witness is due by 10/13/23. Dispositive motions must be by filed by 12/15/23. Oppositions must be filed 1/19/24. Replies to be filed by 1/26/24. NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 5/16/2023 03:00 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Status Conference set for 6/16/2023 03:20 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Status Conference set for 11/6/2023 03:10 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-] quests for production of documents, interrogatories andrequest for admissions
21 21 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 03/31 3:34 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Scheduling Conference held by telephone on 3/31/2023. Case called; Schedule and Status Conferences set. Court to refer case for mediation. Orders to follow. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Matthew Brown (Pro Se). Mark A. Johnson for the defendant.) (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Fri 03/31 8:02 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Rescheduling Thu 03/30 1:40 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference re-set for 3/31/2023 03:10 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Rescheduling Thu 03/23 2:13 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING TIME CHANGE ONLY: Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2023 03:50 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Thu 03/23 12:48 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/20 3:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by University of Massachusetts Amherst.(Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Tue 03/07 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2023 03:10 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Template for Scheduling Order
Monday, March 06, 2023
14 14 13 pgs order Memorandum & Order Mon 03/06 3:58 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, defendant's 11 motion to dismiss is DENIED. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
13 13 order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Thu 11/17 2:06 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying9 Motion to Transfer Case (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
12 12 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 08/18 4:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by University of Massachusetts Amherst. (Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 08/18 4:42 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by University of Massachusetts Amherst.(Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/01 1:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed University of Massachusetts Amherst served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Transfer Case Mon 08/01 1:54 PM
MOTION by Matthew Brown. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 06/02 3:55 PM
Summons Issued as to University of Massachusetts Amherst. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Remark Thu 06/02 12:44 PM
Notice to Plaintiff re service by USMS; Local Rule 4.1 (PSSA, 3)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/02 12:42 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering that a summons issue. Service must be completed within 90 days. Plaintiff may ask USMS to complete service with all costs to be advanced by the United States. (PSSA, 3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
5 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case transferred in from Western Division (Springfield) on 5/24/2022 Case Number 3:22-cv-30068. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/24 11:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Brown.(Zamorski, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case transferred to Eastern Division (Boston). (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/24 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT against University of Massachusetts Amherst, filed by Matthew Brown.(Zamorski, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5
transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer Tue 05/24 11:32 AM
Case transferred to Eastern Division (Boston). (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer Tue 05/24 12:01 PM
Case transferred in from Western Division (Springfield) on 5/24/2022 Case Number 3:22-cv-30068. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 05/24 12:04 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]