Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-06801
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 25, 2022
Case in other court:Maine, 1:22-cv-00138
Last checked: Monday Nov 21, 2022 4:38 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
TERRY BEAN
Represented By
KEVIN M FITZGERALD
Fitzgerald Law Group - Portland Me
contact info
Plaintiff
EILEEN NELSON-BEAN
Represented By
KEVIN M FITZGERALD
Fitzgerald Law Group - Portland Me
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/07 1:22 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by EILEEN NELSON-BEAN, TERRY BEAN. (FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 06/07 8:40 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer Re: Refiled Short Form Complaint. Pursuant to Pretrial Order No. 17, please file the Amended "Short Form" Complaint as directed. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 06/06 3:06 PM
NOTICE Designated Form - District of Maine by TERRY BEAN, EILEEN NELSON-BEAN (FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only Mon 06/06 3:05 PM
REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by EILEEN NELSON-BEAN, TERRY BEAN. (FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
8 8 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/26 11:01 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 6/15/2022 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 05/25 10:26 AM
Case transferred in from District of Maine; Case Number 1:22-cv-00138. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
6 6 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (mmy) [Transferred from Maine on 5/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (mnd) [Transferred from Maine on 5/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
4 4 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 5/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 5/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3M Company summons,
Att: 2 3M Occupational Safety LLC summons,
Att: 3 Aearo Holding LLC summons,
Att: 4 Aearo Intermediate LLC summons,
Att: 5 Aearo LLC summons
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2651899.), filed by EILEEN NELSON-BEAN, TERRY BEAN.(FITZGERALD, KEVIN) [Transferred from Maine on 5/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 5/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by EILEEN NELSON-BEAN, TERRY BEAN. (Service of Process Deadline 8/9/2022) Fee due by 5/13/2022.(bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 5/25/2022.]
Related: [-]