California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:René Lastreto II
Case #: 1:22-bk-10885
Case Filed:May 25, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Jun 21, 2022
Discharged:Mar 01, 2023
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Nov 17, 2022

Debtor
SYNCHRONY OF VISALIA, INC.
1810 S Central St Ste A
Visalia, CA 93277-4528
Represented By
Leonard K. Welsh
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Irma Edmonds
2501 West Shaw Avenue, Suite 124
Fresno, CA 93711
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
United States Courthouse 2500 Tulare Street, Room 1401
Fresno, CA 93721


Docket last updated: 05/26/2022 12:02 AM PDT
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (7) [ADI] Wed 05/25 4:15 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $338.00, Receipt Number: 376532, eFilingID: 7103142) (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload Wed 05/25 4:14 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $0.00) (Leonard Kaiser Welsh) (eFilingID: 7103142)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility First Meeting - 7 Business Wed 05/25 4:15 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 6/21/2022 at 10:00 AM. See our website for location. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Master Address List Wed 05/25 4:20 PM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form) Wed 05/25 4:22 PM
Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Irma Edmonds (auto)
Related: [-]