Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:22-cv-10811
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 26, 2022
Terminated:Mar 01, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 22, 2022 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
Gail Colozzi
Represented By
Sarah E.A. Sousa
Arrowood LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert W. Greene
Represented By
Sarah E.A. Sousa
Arrowood LLP
contact info
Mediator
Judge Judith G. Dein
United States District Court United States Courthouse 1 Courthouse Way
Boston, MA 02210
Plaintiff
Cambridge Teachers Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Michael A. Bednarz
Berluti Mclaughlin & Kutchin, LLP
contact info
Robert R. Berluti
Berluti & Mclaughlin LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/22 10:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cambridge Teachers Federal Credit Union. (Bednarz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
24 24 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Wed 03/01 11:13 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. 30-Day Settlement Order of Dismissal. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
23 23 adr Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider Tue 02/28 10:31 AM
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein reports this case has settled. The clerk should enter a 30-day order of dismissal. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 01/11 3:00 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery deadline in this case is 1/13/2023. Initial disclosures were made on July 22, 2022. Since that time, the parties have exchanged written discovery and now ask the court for an additional 120 days of discovery should their mediation scheduled before Judge Dein on February 27, 2023, be unsuccessful. The court notes that the demand in the case is $99,000. The court will permit sixty days of additional discovery beyond the mediation date -- finding that few, if any, depositions are appropriate in this case. Accordingly, if unable to settle the matter, all fact discovery must be completed no later than 4/27/23. Dispositive Motions are due by 5/10/23, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 5/31/23; Reply, if any, by leave of court. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 01/11 1:32 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/15/2023 to Complete Discovery and Extend Subsequent Scheduling Order Deadlines by Cambridge Teachers Federal Credit Union.(Bednarz, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of ADR Conference Wed 01/11 11:21 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING ADR: Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein will hold a telephone conference with counsel for each party separately prior to the mediation. A telephone conference is scheduled with plaintiff's counsel Friday, February 17, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. and with defense counsel Friday, February 17, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. The clerk will provide the call-in information to the parties via email. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of ADR Conference Wed 01/11 11:19 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF AND ORDER REGARDING ADR CONFERENCE: Mediation before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein set for Monday, February 27, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom #15 on the 5th Floor. Counsel, clients or representatives thereof with full settlement authority must all participate. It shall be understood (a) that all parties and counsel will participate in this court-sponsored mediation in good faith and with the interest of settling the matter on mutually acceptable terms, (b) that the entire mediation process, including all communications during any in-person, video or audio part thereof, is confidential, (c) that all statements made during the course of mediation are privileged settlement discussions, made without prejudice to any party's legal position, and inadmissible for any purpose in any legal proceeding, (d) that no party, participant, or representative shall seek in any proceeding to hereafter compel the mediator to testify and/or produce any document with respect to the mediation, and (e) that all parties, counsel and other participants agree that, by participating in this court-sponsored mediation, they are bound by these conditions and shall keep confidential all communications exchanged during the mediation process. No later than Monday, February 13, 2023, each party shall submit by email to Katherine_Thomson@mad.uscourts.gov a brief Memorandum marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing" addressing the party's position on the merits of the case and on settlement. If you use a standard form settlement agreement, please bring a copy with you. If you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time, please notify opposing counsel and the court as soon as possible. Please note, those who are participating in the in-person mediation are requested to be fully vaccinated and test the morning prior to coming to the court. Masks may be required at the discretion of the Court. The court also request for those attending to take precaution, if you're feeling unwell, please stay home. The court can reschedule an in-person mediation or convert the mediation to a remote proceeding if necessary. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
16 16 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Mon 12/19 12:19 PM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Judith G. Dein re-appointed at request of the parties to coordinate a convenient date. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
15 15 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Thu 12/15 12:25 PM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Kenneth P. Neiman appointed. Judge Harrington terminated. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
14 14 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Fri 12/09 1:46 PM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Edward F. Harrington appointed for a mediation date prior to 1/13/23. Judge Judith G. Dein no longer assigned. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
13 13 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Fri 11/18 9:32 AM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Judith G. Dein appointed at request of the parties.(Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
12 12 order Order Referring Case to ADR Thu 11/17 3:33 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. The parties jointly request mediation before Judge Dein. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
order Order Thu 06/23 12:00 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered setting the pretrial schedule. Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 7/22/22. All amendments to the pleadings and/or joinder of additional parties shall be completed by 9/9/22. The court will permit 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests without leave of court and expects those requests to be filed within 30 days of the initial disclosures. If the parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 12/21/22 (it may take several weeks to get a mediation date). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 1/13/23. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/10/23, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 3/1/23; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 12/19/22, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/22 1:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Gail Colozzi, Robert W. Greene.(Sousa, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/06 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Berluti on behalf of Cambridge Teachers Federal Credit Union (Berluti, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/02 3:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Gail Colozzi served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. (Bednarz, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/02 2:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Robert W. Greene served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. (Bednarz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 05/27 11:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Gail Colozzi, Robert W. Greene. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Fri 05/27 9:43 AM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Cambridge Teachers Federal Credit Union. (Bednarz, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 05/27 10:52 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/26 1:33 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cambridge Teachers Federal Credit Union. (Bednarz, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/26 1:20 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9340876 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cambridge Teachers Federal Credit Union.(Bednarz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice - Other Thu 05/26 1:30 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]