Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Greg Kays
Case #: 4:22-cv-00349
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:May 26, 2022
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 22, 2022 2:56 AM CST
Defendant
A Clean Slate, LLC
6301 Rockhill Rd., Suite 310
Kansas City, MO 64131
Represented By
Meghan E. Lewis
Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard, Pc-Kcmo
contact info
Isaac A. Ames
Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard, Pc-Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
Greater Kansas City Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By
Aaron Schuster
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Bradley Jay Sollars
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Greater Kansas City Laborers Training Fund
Represented By
Aaron Schuster
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Bradley Jay Sollars
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan
Represented By
Aaron Schuster
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Bradley Jay Sollars
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Greater Kansas City Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By
Aaron Schuster
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Bradley Jay Sollars
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald E Greenwell, III
Represented By
Aaron Schuster
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Bradley Jay Sollars
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Caleb McCandless
Trustee of the Greater Kansas City Laborers Training Fund The Builders' Association 105 West 12th Ave
North Kansas City, MO 64116
Represented By
Aaron Schuster
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Bradley Jay Sollars
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Reginald L. Thomas
Represented By
Aaron Schuster
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info
Bradley Jay Sollars
Arnold, Newbold, Sollars & Hollins PC
contact info

GPO Dec 08 2023
ORDER on 28 31 43 53 various motions. Signed on 12/8/2023 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 23, 2024
72 72 order Order of Dismissal Thu 05/23 3:10 PM
ORDER. In light of the Parties'71 joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed on 5/23/2024 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
71 71 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/23 9:28 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by Greater Kansas City Laborers Pension Fund, Greater Kansas City Laborers Training Fund, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, Greater Kansas City Laborers Welfare Fund, Donald E Greenwell, III, Caleb McCandless, Reginald L. Thomas. (Sollars, Bradley)
Related: [-]