Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-01475

Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Randal S Mashburn
Case #: 1:22-ap-90084
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 26, 2022
Terminated:Feb 07, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Solar Mosiac, Inc.
CT Corporation System 300 Montvue Road
Knoxville, TN 37919
Represented By
Solar Mosiac, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Ideal Horizon Benefits
FKA Solar Titan USA c/o Registered Agent, Richard M. Atnip 11205 Outlet Drive
Knoxville, TN 37932
Represented By
Ideal Horizon Benefits
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Lee Hanson, Sr.
2234 Tindell Ln
Columbia, TN 38401
Represented By
KEITH DAVID SLOCUM
Harlan Slocum & Quillen
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
32 32 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/07 4:36 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-90084 Closed . (rww)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
31 31 notice Stipulation of Dismissal - AP Mon 01/23 1:59 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding . Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff Richard Lee Hanson Sr.. (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
30 30 order Compromise/Settlement - AP Order Wed 01/18 10:29 AM
Order Granting Motion for Compromise and Settlement . Related [+] BY THE COURT: Judge Randal S. Mashburn. (rww)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #28
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
29 29 misc Submitted Order Tue 01/17 9:56 AM
Submitted Order Approving Compromise and Settlement . Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff Richard Lee Hanson Sr. Related [+]. (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-] 27 ,28
Thursday, December 22, 2022
28 28 motion Compromise/Settlement - AP Motion Thu 12/22 4:27 PM
Amended Notice of Motion and Notice for Compromise and Settlement . If timely response hearing will be held 2/15/2023 at 09:30 AM, Joint Hearing Courtroom (COL); (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 1/13/2023. Certificate of Service Mailed on 12/22/22. Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff Richard Lee Hanson Sr. Related [+]. (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-] 27
27 27 motion Compromise/Settlement - AP Motion Thu 12/22 4:25 PM
Amended Motion and Notice for Compromise and Settlement . If timely response hearing will be held 2/15/2023 at 09:30 AM, Joint Hearing Courtroom (COL); (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 1/23/2023. Certificate of Service Mailed on 12/22/22. Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff Richard Lee Hanson Sr. Related [+]. (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-] 25
26 26 virtual 10. Docket Order - Add Text. Thu 12/22 1:38 PM
ORDER by Judge Mashburn : With regard to docket entry #25 , a joint motion has been filed seeking approval of a compromise and settlement. The notice accompanying the motion includes incorrect information. Since this is a Columbia docket case, the hearing time is 9:30 a.m., not 9:00 a.m. Further, the notice indicates that the hearing will be conducted telephonically using an AT&T number that has not been in use for more than a year. The hearing will be in the Joint Hearing Courtroom in the Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN. In certain situations, virtual participation by Zoom video is allowed. The circumstances where virtual participation is allowed and the Zoom access information are provided on the Court website. Counsel for movants shall file and serve an amended notice with correct information. Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 25
25 25 motion Compromise/Settlement - AP Motion Thu 12/22 11:55 AM
Joint Motion and Notice for Compromise and Settlement Resolving Adversary Proceeding . If timely response hearing will be held 2/15/2023 at 09:30 AM, Joint Hearing Courtroom (COL); (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 1/13/2023. Certificate of Service Mailed on 12/22/22. Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff Richard Lee Hanson Sr.. (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
24 24 virtual 10. Docket Order - Add Text. Fri 12/02 2:53 PM
ORDER by Judge Mashburn : With regard to docket entry #22 ,23 , a notice of settlement of this adversary proceeding has been filed at Doc. 23. In light of the anticipated resolution of this matter, the pretrial conference set for December 7, 2022, is hereby cancelled. If the parties do not file the necessary Court documents to complete the settlement and conclude the adversary proceeding within 90 days, plaintiffs counsel shall take appropriate steps to have the pretrial conference rescheduled. Related [+] (skb)
Related: [-] 22 ,23
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
23 23 notice Generic Notice - BK Notice Wed 11/30 11:19 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed on behalf of Defendants Solar Titan USA . Filed on the behalf of: Defendants Ideal Horizon Benefits, Solar Mosiac, Inc.. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
22 22 order Continue Pre-Trial Conference Wed 10/19 4:36 PM
Expedited Agreed Order Granting Motion to Continue Pre-Trial Conference and for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Related [+], BY THE COURT: Judge Randal S. Mashburn. Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 12/7/2022 at 01:45 PM, Courtroom 1 (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Zoom Call-in Number: 833-568-8864 and Meeting ID: 161 2444 4713. (skb)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #20
21 21 misc Submitted Order Wed 10/19 12:07 PM
Expedited Submitted Agreed Order . Filed on the behalf of: Defendants Ideal Horizon Benefits, Solar Mosiac, Inc. Related [+]. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 motion Continue Pretrial Conference Wed 10/19 12:06 PM
Expedited Motion for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference .Filed on the behalf of: Defendants Ideal Horizon Benefits, Solar Mosiac, Inc.. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, September 18, 2022
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 09/18 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 09/18/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order to Continue Pre-Trial Conference
Friday, September 16, 2022
18 18 order Continue Pre-Trial Conference Fri 09/16 1:54 PM
Expedited Agreed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Continue Pre-Trial Conference and for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Related [+], BY THE COURT: Judge Randal S. Mashburn. Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 11/2/2022 at 01:45 PM; Refer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details (Nashville). via Zoom Audio (jlm)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #16
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
17 17 misc Submitted Order Tue 09/13 2:08 PM
Expedited Submitted Agreed Order . Filed on the behalf of: Defendants Ideal Horizon Benefits, Solar Mosiac, Inc. Related [+]. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 motion Continue Pretrial Conference Tue 09/13 2:03 PM
Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference .Filed on the behalf of: Defendants Ideal Horizon Benefits, Solar Mosiac, Inc.. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 26, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/26 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 08/26/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order to Continue Pre-Trial Conference
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
14 14 order Continue Pre-Trial Conference Wed 08/24 11:00 AM
Expedited Agreed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Continue Pre-Trial Conference and for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Related [+], BY THE COURT: Judge Randal S. Mashburn. Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/12/2022 at 01:45 PM; Refer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details (Nashville). via Zoom Audio (jlm)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #12
13 13 misc Submitted Order Wed 08/24 8:27 AM
Expedited Submitted Agreed Order . Filed on the behalf of: Defendant Ideal Horizon Benefits Related [+]. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 motion Continue Pretrial Conference Wed 08/24 8:26 AM
Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference .Filed on the behalf of: Defendant Ideal Horizon Benefits. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 07/27 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 07/27/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order to Continue Pre-Trial Conference
Monday, July 25, 2022
10 10 order Continue Pre-Trial Conference Mon 07/25 4:34 PM
Expedited Agreed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Continue Pre-Trial Conference and for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Related [+], BY THE COURT: Judge Randal S. Mashburn. Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 9/28/2022 at 01:45 PM; Refer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details (Nashville). , via Zoom Audio. (ko)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #8
9 9 misc Submitted Order Mon 07/25 1:49 PM
Expedited Submitted Agreed Order . Filed on the behalf of: Defendant Solar Mosiac, Inc. Related [+]. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 motion Continue Pretrial Conference Mon 07/25 1:48 PM
Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference .Filed on the behalf of: Defendant Solar Mosiac, Inc.. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 06/29 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 06/29/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order to Continue Pre-Trial Conference
Monday, June 27, 2022
6 6 order Continue Pre-Trial Conference Mon 06/27 5:09 PM
Expedited Agreed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Continue Pre-Trial Conference and for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Related [+], BY THE COURT: Judge Randal S. Mashburn. Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 8/24/2022 at 01:45 PM; Refer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details (Nashville). via Zoom Audio. (sdt) Modified on 6/28/2022 to fix misspelling (cdw)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #4
5 5 misc Submitted Order Mon 06/27 3:08 PM
Expedited Submitted Agreed Order . Filed on the behalf of: Defendant Solar Mosiac, Inc. Related [+]. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 motion Continue Pretrial Conference Mon 06/27 3:07 PM
Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference .Filed on the behalf of: Defendant Solar Mosiac, Inc.. (MALONE-SMOLLA, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/01 1:27 PM
Certificate of Service mailed on 6/1/22 Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff Richard Lee Hanson Sr. Related [+]. (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Friday, May 27, 2022
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conf Fri 05/27 4:22 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Ideal Horizon Benefits of FKA Solar Titan USA ; Solar Mosiac, Inc.. Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 7/13/2022 at 01:45 PM; Refer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details (Nashville). - via Zoom Audio. Zoom Call-in Number: 833-568-8864 and Meeting ID: 161 2444 4713. Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, May 26, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/26 4:41 PM
Adversary case 1:22-ap-90084. Complaint by Richard Lee Hanson Sr. against Solar Mosiac, Inc., Ideal Horizon Benefits. This Adversary is Being Filed On Behalf of the Debtor. Richard Lee Hanson Sr.. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit