Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:R Austin Huffaker, Jr
Referred: Chad W Bryan
Case #: 2:22-cv-00323
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:May 26, 2022
Terminated:May 01, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 22, 2022 2:27 AM CST
Defendant
Smart Alabama, LLC
Gary Sport, Registered Agent 121 Shin Young Drive
Luverne, AL 36049
Represented By
Kathryn Morris Willis
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Ingu Hwang
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yunaka Brown
Represented By
Eric Collin Sheffer
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher Goldfarb LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 01, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/01 12:08 PM
ORDER: Upon review of the parties' 17 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, which comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) FRCP, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice by operation of Rule 41 on the terms agreed to and set out by the parties; DIRECTING the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/1/2023. (amf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/27 8:47 AM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Smart Alabama, LLC, Yunaka Brown. (Willis, Kathryn) Modified on 4/27/2023 to add as also filed on behalf of the Plaintiff (amf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
16 16 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Mon 03/13 2:16 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that all pending deadlines are TERMINATED and all hearings are CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint stipulation of dismissal on or before 04/28/2023. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 03/13/2023.(Furn: Calendar, dh) (TERM: Final Pretrial Conference 09/08/2023, Jury Selection 10/30/2023 and Jury Trial 10/30/2023)(tha, )
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/13 8:43 AM
JOINT NOTICE of Settlement filed by Smart Alabama, LLC and Yunaka Brown. regarding Settlement (Willis, Kathryn) (Main Document 15 replaced on 3/13/2023) (tha, ). Modified on 3/13/2023 to correct pdf and clarify text. (tha, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference Wed 02/22 3:16 PM
Joint Notice Concerning Settlement Conference and Mediation filed by Yunaka Brown and Smart Alabama, LLC(Sheffer, Eric) Modified on 2/22/2023 to clarify text (tha, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Non-Compliance Tue 10/04 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re12 Notice of Service. The referenced document is discovery and is not allowed pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY. The document is hereby STRICKEN from the record and the parties are instructed to disregard the entry of this document on the court docket.(dmn, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 26.3 Excerpt
Monday, October 03, 2022
12 12 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 10/03 11:26 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yunaka Brown by Smart Alabama, LLC.(Willis, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
11 11 3 pgs order Order Tue 09/20 2:11 PM
STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER: Briefing deadlines and instructions for all pending and future motions. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/20/2022.(dmn, )
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/20 2:05 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 9/8/2023 at 11:00 AM in CR 2D in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for term of court commencing on 10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. A motion must be filed even if an amendment is sought on or before 9/30/2022. Discovery due by 2/15/2023. Motions due by 3/17/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2023. Mediation Notice due by 2/22/2023. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/20/2022. Furnished calendar, DH.(dmn, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
9 9 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 07/29 1:23 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Willis, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/15 4:27 PM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan as referral judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
8 8 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Thu 07/07 1:40 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Smart Alabama, LLC re6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Willis, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 07/07 12:07 PM
RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) Report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/29/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 7/7/2022. (bes, )
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement Thu 07/07 12:06 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Smart Alabama, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/18/2022.(bes, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order and Sample Format
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 07/07 3:35 PM
***PURSUANT TO THE8 STATEMENT - Attorney Ingu Hwang for Smart Alabama, LLC added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/06 9:32 AM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Smart Alabama, LLC.(Willis, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
4 4 service Return Receipt Card Wed 06/01 10:37 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Glenda P. for Smart Alabama, LLC served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/27 1:41 PM
Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Smart Alabama, LLC. (dmn, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
2 2 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Fri 05/27 1:36 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Yunaka Brown. (dmn, )
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/27 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Smart Alabama, LLC (Filing fee $ 402.00, Receipt No. 4602066915.), filed by Yunaka Brown. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/24/2022.(dmn, ) Modified on 5/27/2022 to include receipt number. (dmn, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Request for Service by Certified Mail,
Att: 3 Filing Fee Receipt
misc Jury Demand Fri 05/27 1:35 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Yunaka Brown. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc.1 )
Related: [-]