Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Charles Goodwin
Case #: 5:22-cv-00433
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Account Receivable
Case Filed:May 27, 2022
Case in other court:District Court of Oklahoma County, CJ-22-02115
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 23, 2022 2:34 AM CST
Defendant
Wal Mart Stores East LP
Represented By
Michael W Brewer
Hiltgen & Brewer
contact info
Jeffrey D Scott
Hiltgen & Brewer
contact info
Plaintiff
Paula Peeler
Represented By
Bryan G Garrett
Bryan Garrett PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 17, 2024
55 55 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/17 8:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paula Peeler (Branum, John)
Related: [-]
54 54 notice ~Notice (other) Fri 05/17 7:29 PM
NOTICE (other) by Paula Peeler (Branum, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
53 53 notice ~Notice (other) Thu 05/16 5:47 PM
NOTICE (other) by Paula Peeler (Ladd, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
52 52 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Clarify Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Quash Order on Motion to Strike Fri 05/10 5:36 PM
ORDER granting50 JOINT MOTION to Strike Deadlines as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 05/10/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]