Homelight, Inc. v. Shkipin et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | P Casey Pitts |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-03119 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 27, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 23, 2022 12:24 AM PST |
Counter-claimant
Dmitry Shkipin
325 Sharon Park Dr. #416
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Counter-defendant
Homelight, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HomeOpenly, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dmitry Shkipin
325 Sharon Park Dr. #416
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Plaintiff
Homelight, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
104 | 104
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 08/18 9:44 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable P. Casey Pitts in the San Jose Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials PCP immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Pitts by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after November 13, 2023 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before November 13, 2023 , are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (e.g., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. On or before September 11, 2023 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlined in the [LINK:Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District] . The approved form for such statements can be accessed [LINK:here] . A Joint Case Management Statement is not required in prisoner cases in which the prisoner plaintiff/petitioner is not represented by counsel. 9. Judge Pitts participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project; hearings and trials in civil cases are thus eligible for video recording upon request and with the consent of the parties and Judge Pitts. Please see the Court's [LINK:Pilot Project webpage] and [LINK:General Order 65] for more information. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 08/18/2023 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
103 | 103
order
Order
Mon 08/14 7:20 PM
ORDER: The motion to dismiss (ECF No. 28) is suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, the motion hearing set for August 22, 2023, is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 08/14/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc3, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
102 | 102
![]() ORDER DENYING 47 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 8/11/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
101 | 101
![]() ORDER DENYING 50 SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 8/11/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |