Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Roy B Dalton, Jr
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:22-cv-00954
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:May 27, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 23, 2022 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc.
Represented By
J. Scott Hudson
Zimmerman, Kiser & Sutcliffe, PA
contact info
Nicholas James Mari
Zimmerman, Kiser & Sutcliffe, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nichole Lugo
Represented By
Lisa Kuhlman
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info
Noah E. Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 07, 2023
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 04/07 5:24 PM
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Settlement; the settlement is APPROVED, and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close thecase. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/7/2023. (JEB)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order referring motion to Magistrate Judge for disposition Fri 04/07 8:26 AM
ORDER referring motion to Magistrate Judge for disposition: 26 Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal With Prejudice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/6/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/04 1:22 PM
NOTICE, Consent, and Reference of a Dispositive Motion to a Magistrate Judge by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc. re26 Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal With Prejudice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Hudson, J.) Modified on 4/4/2023 to edit docket text (KNC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
order Order Fri 03/31 8:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The parties are reminded that they may consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned magistrate judge to resolve their pending joint motion to approve their FLSA settlement agreement and dismiss the case with prejudice. Doing so would allow the resolution of the pending motion without the necessity of the issuance of a report and recommendation. If the parties would like to consent to the magistrate judge resolving the motion and granting the relief requested therein, they must all sign and file Form AO 85A, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/forms/all. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/31/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/20 2:05 PM
NOTICE by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc. re26 Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal With Prejudice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of Filing Fully Executed FLSA Settlement Agreement(Mari, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A - Fully Executed FLSA Settlement Agreement
Monday, December 19, 2022
26 26 motion Settlement Mon 12/19 7:52 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of FLSA claims by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc..(Mari, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A - FLSA Settlement Agreement
Thursday, December 15, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 12/15 9:31 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion for One Week Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/15/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 12/12 8:56 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Approval by Nichole Lugo. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
23 23 misc Settlement/Trial report Fri 11/18 11:14 AM
SETTLEMENT/TRIAL report by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc.. (Mari, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Settlement/Trial report Fri 11/18 10:51 AM
SETTLEMENT/TRIAL report by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc.. (Mari, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
21 21 misc Settlement/Trial report Wed 11/02 4:59 PM
SETTLEMENT/TRIAL report by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc.. (Mari, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
20 20 misc Settlement/Trial report Wed 10/19 10:00 AM
SETTLEMENT/TRIAL report by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc.. (Mari, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
order Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically Fri 09/23 9:46 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/23/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
18 18 motion Appear Telephonically Thu 09/22 12:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Lisa Kuhlman to appear telephonically by Nichole Lugo. (Kuhlman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of appearance Thu 09/08 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Kuhlman Kuhlman on behalf of Nichole Lugo (Kuhlman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
16 16 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Thu 09/08 11:33 AM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:13 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order, 15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File by Nichole Lugo. (Kuhlman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 09/02 10:52 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to the Court's Interrogatories. The deadline is extended to 9/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/2/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 09/01 8:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answers to Court Interrogatories by Nichole Lugo. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
13 13 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Thu 07/21 2:09 PM
FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/21/2022. (YG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
utility *Remark Tue 07/12 4:33 PM
Remark: Doc.11 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/11/2022. (EP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 07/07 3:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc. (Mari, Nicholas) Modified text on 7/7/2022 (LDJ)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/07 3:05 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc. Related case(s): No (Mari, Nicholas) Modified text on 7/7/2022 (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/24 8:46 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, by Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc..(Hudson, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
utility *Remark Mon 06/06 12:38 PM
Remark: Doc.5 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/2/2022. (EP)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
7 7 service Summons returned executed Fri 06/03 11:45 AM
RETURN of service executed on 6/3/2022 by Nichole Lugo as to Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc.. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
6 6 11 pgs order Order Thu 06/02 3:01 PM
INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/2/2022. (YG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/01 8:37 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nichole Lugo. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 06/01 8:36 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nichole Lugo. Related case(s): No (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
3 3 service Summons issued Tue 05/31 11:15 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Longwood Lincoln-Mercury Inc. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/27 4:07 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:22-cv-0954-RBD-DCI. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/27 4:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Longwood Lincoln Mercury Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19620043) filed by Nichole Lugo.(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet