California Southern District Court
Judge:Dana M Sabraw
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:22-cv-00773
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441fc Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 27, 2022
Terminated:Sep 29, 2022
Case in other court:Superior Court, San Diego County, 37-02022-00015200-CU-NP-CTL
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 23, 2022 1:11 AM PST
Defendant
Comenity Servicing, LLC
Represented By
Nathan Andrew Searles
Simmonds & Narita, LLP
contact info
Tomio B Narita
Simmonds & Narita LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrian Benedict
Represented By
Todd M. Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman
contact info
Adrian R Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman
contact info
Thomas Edward Wheeler
Law Offices Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Thursday, September 29, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 09/29 10:32 AM
ORDER to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/29/2022. (jpp)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Thu 09/29 1:39 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Adrian Benedict. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 07/25 2:56 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Adrian Benedict (Friedman, Todd) (jpp)
Related: [-]
minutes ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/25 10:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed by the parties, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and the Case Management Conference have been taken off calendar. A telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference has been scheduled for 9/30/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. To participate in the conference, counsel must dial the toll free number: 1-877-873-8017; enter the Access Code: 2924630 (participants will then be put on hold until the Court activates the conference call); and when prompted, press * to bypass the Security Code. The Court will VACATE the conference if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers before 9/30/2022.(no document attached) (plh)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
5 5 8 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 06/10 2:56 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/10/2022.(jrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/03 10:49 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Comenity Servicing, LLC.(Searles, Nathan) (jpp)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Certificate of Service Fri 06/03 10:01 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Comenity Servicing, LLC of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal (Searles, Nathan) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Wed 06/01 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Comenity Servicing, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent Comenity LLC, Corporate Parent Bread Financial Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate Comenity Bank for Comenity Servicing, LLC. (Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/27 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16863357.), filed by Comenity Servicing, LLC. The new case number is 3:22-cv-773-DMS-KSC. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(cxt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proof of Service