New Mexico District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00716
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 28, 2022 1:23 AM MDT
Defendant
Ruben Padilla (1)
Represented By
Richard B Pugh
Law Office Of Richard Pugh
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jackson Tavo Hall
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/28/2022 2:06 AM MDT
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ruben Padilla (1). (cl) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
3 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Ruben Padilla. (cl) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
Arrest of Ruben Padilla (khs) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Ruben Padilla (khs) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Ruben Padilla. Attorney Jackson Tavo Hall for USA added. Attorney Jack Burkhead terminated. (eh) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF HEARING WITH VIDEO STREAMING as to Ruben Padilla: Initial Appearance set for 4/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom - Remote before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (khs) NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. *** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** This hearing will be available for remote viewing by video stream. Please visit the Court's website at[LINK:www.nmd.uscourts.gov] for information and instructions to connect. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
6 6 1 pgs AMENDED Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/19/22 as to Ruben Padilla. (eh) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
7 7 CJA Appointment of Attorney Richard B Pugh for Ruben Padilla by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (nm) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
8 8 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Initial Appearance as to Ruben Padilla held Related [+] (kd) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Hondo
9 9 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORAL ORDER of Temporary Detention pending hearing as to Ruben Padilla by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF HEARING WITH VIDEO STREAMING as to Ruben Padilla: Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 4/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom - Remote before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kd) NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. *** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** This hearing will be available for remote viewing by video stream. Please visit the Court's website at[LINK:www.nmd.uscourts.gov] for information and instructions to connect. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER of Personal Presence at Hearing by Ruben Padilla (cl) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Maestas, Andrea) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
15 15 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Ruben Padilla held Related [+] (kd) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Hondo
16 16 WAIVER of Personal Presence at Hearing by Ruben Padilla (cl) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Ruben Padilla (cl) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
18 18 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Ruben Padilla (cl) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Ruben Padilla by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [1:22-mj-00536-JHR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
Judge update in case as to Ruben Padilla. District Judge Judith C. Herrera added. (khs)
Related: [-]
21 21 REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Ruben Padilla. (khs)
Related: [-]