New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:22-cv-04437
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:May 29, 2022
Terminated:Jul 22, 2022
Last checked: Friday Nov 25, 2022 3:53 AM EST
Plaintiff
Isabel Taveras
Represented By
Edward Y. Kroub
Mizrahi Kroub LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The Brownie Baker, Inc.
Terminated: 07/29/2022


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, July 29, 2022
13 13 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 07/29 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiff Isabel Taveras hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against defendant The Brownie Baker, Inc. SO ORDERED., (The Brownie Baker, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/29/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 07/28 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) The Brownie Baker, Inc.. Document filed by Isabel Taveras. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Kroub, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 07/22 3:47 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised at ECF No. 10 that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within sixty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, requests to extend the deadline to reopen are unlikely to be granted. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Courts Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/22/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 07/21 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Isabel Taveras..(Kroub, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
9 9 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 07/18 4:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Court's July 18, 2022 Order, Docket No. 8 served on The Brownie Baker, Inc. on July 18, 2022. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Isabel Taveras..(Kroub, Edward)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/18 1:35 PM
ORDER: Defendant in this action appears to be in default. Plaintiff shall file any motion for default judgment, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases (available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman), within two weeks of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff's counsel submits calculations in support of any motion for default judgment, Plaintiff's counsel shall also email native versions of the files with the calculations (i.e., versions of the files in their original format, such as in ".xlsx") to Chambers at Furman_ NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. If or when a motion for default judgment is filed, the Court will enter a further Order setting a deadline for any opposition and reply and scheduling a show cause hearing. If no motion for default judgment is filed by the deadline set forth above, the case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice to the parties. Plaintiff shall electronically serve a copy of this Order on Defendant within two business days from the date of this Order and shall file proof of such service within three business days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/18/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
7 7 service Certificate of Service Other Tue 07/05 1:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Court's May 31, 2022 Order, Docket No. 5 served on The Brownie Baker, Inc. on July 5, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Isabel Taveras..(Kroub, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/21 1:31 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Brownie Baker, Inc. served on 6/16/2022, answer due 7/7/2022. Service was accepted by Teri Recchio, Director of HR. Document filed by Isabel Taveras..(Kroub, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
5 5 3 pgs order Order Tue 05/31 5:34 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff alleges that Defendant's website is not accessible to blind and visually impaired customers and, thus, violates Title III of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. § 12181 et seq. In the Court's experience, the vast majority of cases involving such claims are resolved early - often without even an initial pretrial conference. Accordingly, no later than the earlier of 100 days from the date of this Order or two weeks after Defendant appears in the case, the parties shall file a joint letter (unless Defendant has not appeared, in which case Plaintiff shall file the letter individually), not to exceed two pages, including the following information in separately numbered paragraphs: As set forth herein. After reviewing the parties' submissions, the Court will decide if an initial pretrial conference is necessary. The parties' joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs: As set forth herein. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order aredirected (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and theCourt's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/31/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 05/31 3:33 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Brownie Baker, Inc...(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 05/31 3:07 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 05/31 3:08 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/31 3:08 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 29, 2022
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sun 05/29 10:13 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Brownie Baker, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Isabel Taveras..(Kroub, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sun 05/29 10:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 05/29 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT against The Brownie Baker, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26211638)Document filed by Isabel Taveras..(Kroub, Edward)
Related: [-]